Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:Nancy J Rosenstengel
Case #: 3:24-cv-00704
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court - St. Clair County Illinois, 24-LA-0133
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 3:51 AM CDT
Defendant
La Terra Fina USA, LLC
Represented By
Amanda Catalano
Tabet Divito & Rothstein LLC
contact info
Steven Rosenbaum
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Dillon H. Grimm
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Daniel L. Stanner
Tabet Divito & Rothstein LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tricia Vineyard
Represented By
Matthew H. Armstrong
Armstrong Law Firm LLC
contact info
David C. Nelson
Nelson & Nelson
contact info
Robert L. King
Law Office Of Robert L. King
contact info
Stuart L. Cochran
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2025
ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant La Terra Fina USA, LLC. Plaintiff Vineyard's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. If she wishes to amend the allegations in her complaint in accordance with this Order, Vineyard shall file an amended complaint on or before April 21, 2025. Failure to file an amended complaint will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/31/2025. (kss)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
43 43 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 05/05 3:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by La Terra Fina USA, LLC. (Catalano, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
42 42 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/21 6:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against La Terra Fina USA, LLC, filed by Tricia Vineyard.(Armstrong, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
41 41 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 2:26 PM
ORDER granting40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew Leff on Behalf of La Terra Fina USA, LLC. Signed on 4/3/2025. (clw)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 11:30 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew Leff by on behalf of La Terra Fina USA, LLC. Paid $200.00, AILSDC-5623380. (Leff, Andrew)
Related: [-]
39 39 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 04/03 9:25 AM
ORDER GRANTING38 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Dillon H. Grimm is terminated from this action. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/3/2025. (kss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
38 38 motion Withdraw Wed 04/02 3:17 PM
MOTION to Withdraw UNOPPOSED by La Terra Fina USA, LLC. (Grimm, Dillon)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
37 37 17 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 03/31 9:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant La Terra Fina USA, LLC. Plaintiff Vineyard's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. If she wishes to amend the allegations in her complaint in accordance with this Order, Vineyard shall file an amended complaint on or before April 21, 2025. Failure to file an amended complaint will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/31/2025. (kss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
36 36 respm Response Thu 11/21 12:54 PM
RESPONSE to35 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by La Terra Fina USA, LLC. (Catalano, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/15 11:59 AM
NOTICE by Tricia Vineyard re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Supplemental Authority(King, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion and Order in Hayes v Kraft
Friday, May 24, 2024
34 34 11 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/24 5:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by La Terra Fina USA, LLC. (Catalano, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/21 10:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. King on behalf of Tricia Vineyard (King, Robert)
Related: [-]
32 32 24 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/21 7:26 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tricia Vineyard.(King, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit FDA Warning Letter Chiquita,
Att: 2 Exhibit FDA Warning Letter Hirzel
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/21 7:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. King on behalf of Tricia Vineyard (King, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/15 10:14 AM
ORDER granting29 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to18 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/21/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/15/2024. (dkb)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/15 8:57 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tricia Vineyard. (Armstrong, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
28 28 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/01 9:06 AM
ORDER GRANTING27 Plaintiff's Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to18 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff SHALL file a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before May 15, 2024. (Action due by 5/15/2024). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/1/2024. (dkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/30 2:56 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tricia Vineyard. (Armstrong, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
26 26 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 04/25 12:49 PM
ORDER GRANTING25 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Plaintiff may file a motion for excess pages in support of her response to18 Defendant's motion to dismiss, if needed to properly respond to Defendant's supplemental authority. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/25/2024. (dkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
25 25 motion Leave to File Document Wed 04/24 3:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by La Terra Fina USA, LLC.(Catalano, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/02 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart L. Cochran on behalf of Tricia Vineyard (Cochran, Stuart)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 04/02 10:47 AM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Tricia Vineyard. (Armstrong, Matthew)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/02 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Armstrong on behalf of Tricia Vineyard (Armstrong, Matthew)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Action Tue 04/02 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF ACTION re20 Notice of Appearance filed by Tricia Vineyard. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx] . (clw)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/02 8:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Nelson on behalf of Tricia Vineyard (Nelson, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
19 19 misc Exhibit Mon 04/01 12:35 PM
EXHIBIT by La Terra Fina USA, LLC. Exhibit to18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Catalano, Amanda)
Related: [-]
18 18 24 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/01 12:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by La Terra Fina USA, LLC. (Catalano, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
17 17 notice Notice Terminating Judge Assignment Thu 03/28 10:57 AM
NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 24-CV-704-NJR. (clw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
16 16 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/27 10:20 AM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Catalano, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/15 1:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is now due on or before April 1, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 3/15/2024. (scm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 2:21 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Steven Rosenbaum on behalf of La Terra Fina USA, LLC. Signed on 3/13/2024. (clw)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 2:20 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Dillon Grimm on behalf of La Terra Fina USA, LLC. Signed on 3/13/2024. (clw)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/13 1:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed) by La Terra Fina USA, LLC. (Catalano, Amanda)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 11:48 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven Rosenbaum $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-5336635 by on behalf of La Terra Fina USA, LLC. (Rosenbaum, Steven)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 11:35 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dillon Grimm $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-5336599 by on behalf of La Terra Fina USA, LLC. (Grimm, Dillon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
9 9 notice Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents Tue 03/12 9:55 AM
NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking3 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by La Terra Fina USA, LLC. Login information used and signature on document do not match. Document was re-filed using the appropriate credentials. (clw)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment Tue 03/12 8:41 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Parties. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 24-704. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 4/2/2024 (clw)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice Striking Electronically Filed Documents Tue 03/12 8:38 AM
NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking1 Notice of Removal, filed by La Terra Fina USA, LLC. Login information used and signature on document do not match. Document was re-filed using the appropriate credentials. (clw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 03/11 5:56 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by La Terra Fina USA, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Hawk Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Boreal Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Consolidated Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Kodiak Capital LLC, Other Affiliate NAK Capital LLC for La Terra Fina USA, LLC. (Stanner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Removal Mon 03/11 5:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (AMENDED) from Circuit Court - St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 24-LA-0133, filed by La Terra Fina USA, LLC.(Stanner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/11 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Catalano on behalf of La Terra Fina USA, LLC (Catalano, Amanda)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 03/11 4:58 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by La Terra Fina USA, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Hawk Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Boreal Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Consolidated Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Kodiak Capital LLC, Other Affiliate NAK Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Spruce Capital LLC for La Terra Fina USA, LLC. (Stanner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/11 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Stanner on behalf of La Terra Fina USA, LLC (Stanner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 03/11 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court - St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 24-LA-0133 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5334695), filed by La Terra Fina USA, LLC.(Stanner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet