New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:24-cv-02389
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:23 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
BRYAN PETERS
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Meyerson Fox & Conte P.A.
contact info
Cross Defendant
RYAN H. HARRIS
Represented By
ANTHONY S. BOCCHI
Bocchi Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
RYAN H. HARRIS
Represented By
ANTHONY S. BOCCHI
Bocchi Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
BRYAN PETERS
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Meyerson Fox & Conte P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
MODE GLOBAL, LLC
Represented By
SEAN J. KIRBY
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER JOHN COLLINS
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton
contact info


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
40 40 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 05/12 10:33 AM
AMENDED TEXT ORDER: No later than May 2, 2025, Plaintiff and TSA were ordered to file a joint letter either (1) advising that the disputes have been resolved or (2) formally raising the remaining discovery disputes in the format specified within the Court's[LINK:Case Management Order] . See ECF Nos. 35 and 38. The parties failed to do so. A status conference is scheduled for June 11, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties and TSA shall appear in person at the Frank R. Lautenberg Post Office and U.S. Courthouse, 2 Federal Square, Courtroom 8, Newark, New Jersey. No later than June 4, 2025, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case and settlement discussions. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon counsel for TSA no later than May 19, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 5/12/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
39 39 order Text Order Fri 05/09 10:23 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint email correspondence dated May 2, 2025, requesting an adjournment of the May 9, 2025 settlement conference. The parties' request is GRANTED. The May 9, 2025 settlement conference is CANCELED. No later than June 2, 2025, the parties shall submit one joint letter, either via ECF or via email to jra_orders@njd.uscourts.gov, advising the Court as to the status of the matter and whether a fairness hearing is required. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 5/9/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
38 38 order Text Order Mon 04/14 2:13 PM
TEXT ORDER: No later than April 25, 2025, Plaintiff and non-party Transportation Services of America ("TSA") are ORDERED to meet and confer to discuss the issues raised within Plaintiff's deficiency letter at ECF No. 37, Ex. A. Thereafter, no later than May 2, 2025, Plaintiff and TSA shall submit a joint letter either (1) advising that the disputes have been resolved or (2) formally raising the remaining discovery disputes in the format specified within the Court's[LINK:Case Management Order] . The parties are strongly encouraged to continue settlement discussions in order to resolve the matter without Court intervention. Should the matter not resolve on its own, the Court will schedule settlement conferences following the May 9, 2025 status conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 4/11/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 04/14 1:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. A status conference was held on April 11, 2025. The Court discussed the status of the discovery disputes between Plaintiff and non-party Transportation Services of America ("TSA"), which are currently unripe for the Court's review. The Court advised Plaintiff and TSA that they are required to meet and confer prior to raising any formal discovery disputes. The Court also discussed the status of settlement discussions between the parties, which are ongoing. Should the parties not settle the matter by the next status conference, the Court will schedule settlement conferences with each defendant. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
37 37 misc Status Report Thu 04/10 6:25 PM
STATUS REPORT by MODE GLOBAL, LLC. (KIRBY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Letter Thu 04/10 4:18 PM
Letter from Steven Pontell, Esq.. (PONTELL, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
35 35 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 03/31 3:14 PM
TEXT ORDER: he Court is in receipt of the parties' joint letter dated March 27, 2025 at ECF No.32 , requesting an adjournment of the April 3, 2025 status conference due to the unavailability of counsel. The parties' request is GRANTED. The April 3, 2025 status conference is ADJOURNED to May 9, 2025 at 3:30 p.m. No later than May 2, 2025, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case and settlement discussions. To the extent the parties wish to raise a discovery dispute before the deadline set forth in the operative scheduling order, they shall do so consistent with the Court's[LINK:Case Management Order] . The Court thanks the parties for their efforts to resolve the matter without Court intervention. Further, discovery deadlines shall be extended pursuant to the Court's Second Amended Scheduling Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/31/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff Mon 03/31 3:16 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the text order attached to docket entry 35 filed by the Clerk's office on 3/31/2025 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
33 33 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/28 2:07 PM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/27/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
34 34 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 03/31 3:04 PM
TEXT ORDER: Discovery deadlines shall be extended pursuant to the Court's First Amended Scheduling Order. No later than April 10, 2025, Plaintiff and Defendant Peters shall submit a joint letter updating the Court as to the status of their settlement discussions. In light of the discovery dispute raised by Plaintiff regarding its third-party subpoena served upon party Transportation Services of America (TSA), a status conference is scheduled for April 11, 2025 at 11:30 pm. For the conference, please dial 973-437-5535 and enter Phone conference ID: 450 303 564#. Plaintiff and counsel for TSA must attend; however, all other parties may attend if they wish. Should the dispute between Plaintiff and TSA resolve, Plaintiff shall promptly update the Court. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon counsel for TSA no later than April 3, 2025. In the meantime, if possible, the Court encourages settlement discussions between Plaintiff and Defendant Harris. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/27/2025. (akw)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 03/31 2:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. A status conference was held on March 27, 2025. Defendant Harris confirmed he will be proceeding in the litigation pro se. The Court discussed the status of discovery and settlement discussions with the parties. The Court encouraged the parties to continue settlement discussions. Plaintiff and Defendant Peters shall submit a letter updating the Court as to the status of their settlement discussions within two weeks. Plaintiff raised a discovery dispute regarding its subpoena served upon third-party Transportation Services of America (TSA), which has delayed discovery and the deposition of Defendant Harris. The Court will schedule a status conference with Plaintiff and TSA to discuss the issue. (akw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
32 32 misc Status Report Thu 03/20 5:56 PM
STATUS REPORT by MODE GLOBAL, LLC. (KIRBY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
31 31 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 03/06 4:58 PM
AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/6/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/06 9:46 AM
Set Deadlines as to30 MOTION for Protective Order. Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
30 30 motion Protective Order Wed 03/05 4:43 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by MODE GLOBAL, LLC.(KIRBY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Confidentiality Order
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
29 29 misc Certification Wed 02/19 9:05 AM
Certification on behalf of RYAN H. HARRIS. (BOCCHI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
28 28 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 02/13 12:32 PM
TEXT ORDER finding as moot23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 2/15/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
27 27 order Text Order Fri 02/07 12:17 PM
TEXT ORDER: Bocchi Law LLC, Counsel for Defendant Ryan Harris, filed a motion to withdraw as counsel at ECF No.23 ; however, prior to the Court having to issue a decision, Defendant Ryan Harris terminated the attorney-client relationship with Bocchi Law. As a result, the motion to withdraw as counsel is MOOT. The Court ORDERS that the Clerk's Office terminate Bocchi Law LLC as counsel in this case and the firm is hereby relieved as counsel for Defendant Ryan Harris. No later than March 7, 2025, Defendant Harris shall hire new counsel, or otherwise advise the Court of his intention to proceed pro se. Bocchi Law shall serve Defendant Harris with a copy of this Order and shall upload a certificate of service confirming same no later than February 18, 2025. The discovery disputes raised within the parties' discovery dispute letter at ECF No.25 shall be held in abeyance pending Defendant Harris's resolution of the status of his representation. A status conference is scheduled for March 27, 2025, at 3:30 p.m. For the conference, please dial 973-437-5535 and enter Phone conference ID: 932 446 577#. No later than March 20, 2025, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case and, if necessary, the status of Defendant Harris's representation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 2/7/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
minutes Status Conference Fri 02/07 12:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. An in-person status conference was held on February 3, 2025. The Court heard Mr. Anthony Bocchi's ("Counsel") arguments as to his motion to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Harris at ECF No.23 ("the Motion"). The Court found the Motion MOOT as Counsel represented that Defendant Harris voluntarily terminated the attorney-client relationship with him and his firm. Mr. Bocchi and his firm are relieved as counsel for Defendant Harris. Defendant Harris shall have thirty days to hire new counsel or to advise the Court of his intention to proceed pro se. The discovery disputes raised within the parties' discovery dispute letter at ECF No.25 shall be held in abeyance pending Defendant Harris's resolution of the status of his representation. Plaintiff is authorized to contact Defendant Harris personally in furtherance of this matter. Counsel for Defendant Harris shall provide the most updated contact information for Defendant Harris to Plaintiff in short order. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
26 26 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/27 3:46 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint letter dated January 24, 2025 at ECF No.25 . In light of the fact that the parties raise discovery disputes, the February 3, 2025 status conference shall be held in person. Counsel shall appear at the Frank R. Lautenberg Post Office and U.S. Courthouse, 2 Federal Square, Courtroom 8, Newark, New Jersey. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/27/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
25 25 misc Status Report Fri 01/24 6:39 PM
STATUS REPORT by MODE GLOBAL, LLC.(KIRBY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, January 10, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/10 8:42 PM
Set Deadlines as to23 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
24 24 order Text Order Thu 01/09 9:41 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter dated January 7, 2025 at ECF No.22 , informally raising discovery disputes. Plaintiff has failed to follow the Court's preferences as outlined in Section 5 (a) of its[LINK:Case Management Order] . No later than January 17, 2025, the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding the disputes raised within Plaintiff's letter at ECF No.22 . Thereafter, on or before January 24, 2025, the parties shall submit ONE JOINT LETTER either advising that the dispute has resolved, or otherwise detailing the discovery dispute in accordance with the format specified within the Court's[LINK:Case Management Order] . If the discovery dispute does not resolve, the Court will promptly schedule an in-person dispute hearing. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/9/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
23 23 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 01/08 6:12 PM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by RYAN H. HARRIS.(BOCCHI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Anthony S. Bocchi, Esq.,
Att: 2 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,
Att: 3 Proposed form of Order
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
22 22 misc Letter Tue 01/07 9:08 PM
Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff. (KIRBY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
21 21 misc Status Report Wed 12/11 10:45 AM
STATUS REPORT by MODE GLOBAL, LLC. (KIRBY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
20 20 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 12/09 9:14 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' joint status letter, submitted without input of Plaintiff, at ECF No.19 dated December 5, 2024. Though the Court is concerned by Plaintiff's lack of input, in light of the status of discovery, the status conference scheduled for December 12, 2024 is ADJOURNED to February 3, 2025 at 2:30 p.m. For the conference, please dial 973-437-5535 and enter Phone conference ID:294 259 631#. No later than January 27, 2025, the parties shall file one joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case. Plaintiff MUST participate in this process. To the extent the parties wish to raise a discovery dispute, they shall do so consistent with the Court's[LINK:Case Management Order] . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 12/9/2024. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Thu 12/05 4:45 PM
STATUS REPORT by BRYAN PETERS. (PONTELL, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
18 18 misc Substitution of Attorney Thu 09/05 10:20 AM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney STEVEN PONTELL terminated. Attorney STEVEN PONTELL for BRYAN PETERS,STEVEN PONTELL for BRYAN PETERS added.. (PONTELL, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/21 12:31 PM
ORDER granting14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of STEPHEN E. FOX. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 8/21/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
16 16 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 08/12 10:57 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will enter a Pretrial Scheduling Order setting forth discovery deadlines. A status conference is scheduled for December 12, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. For the conference, please dial 973-437-5535 and enter Phone conference ID: 294 259 631#. No later than December 5, 2024, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case. To the extent the parties wish to raise a discovery dispute, they shall do so consistent with the Court's[LINK:Case Management Order] . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 8/8/2024. (akw, )
Related: [-]
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/08 4:11 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 8/8/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/08 3:03 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MODE GLOBAL, LLC.(KIRBY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Applicant Stephen E. Fox,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 08/12 10:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. An initial scheduling conference was held on August 8, 2024. The Court will enter a Pretrial Scheduling Order setting forth discovery deadlines.(akw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/01 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN J. KIRBY on behalf of MODE GLOBAL, LLC (KIRBY, SEAN)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 08/01 4:46 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by MODE GLOBAL, LLC.(COLLINS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Crossclaim Mon 05/20 2:13 PM
ANSWER to Crossclaim by RYAN H. HARRIS.(BOCCHI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 05/13 4:31 PM
LETTER ORDER Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.1. On 8/8/2024 at 3:00 PM there shall be an Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. The conference will be held telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 5/13/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Tue 04/16 2:39 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against RYAN H. HARRIS by BRYAN PETERS.(PONTELL, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/16 2:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by RYAN H. HARRIS.(BOCCHI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 03/26 9:42 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BRYAN PETERS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/16/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 03/26 9:43 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by RYAN H. HARRIS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/16/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
7 7 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 03/25 12:58 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Ryan H. Harris.. (BOCCHI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 03/25 12:05 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Bryan Peters. Attorney STEVEN PONTELL for BRYAN PETERS added. (PONTELL, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/19 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY S. BOCCHI on behalf of RYAN H. HARRIS (BOCCHI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/18 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN PONTELL on behalf of BRYAN PETERS (PONTELL, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/12 12:35 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to RYAN H. HARRIS, BRYAN PETERS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 03/12 9:08 AM
Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 03/11 5:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MODE GLOBAL, LLC. (COLLINS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT against RYAN H. HARRIS, BRYAN PETERS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15163231) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MODE GLOBAL, LLC.(COLLINS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet