California Southern District Court
Judge:Todd W Robinson
Referred: Allison H Goddard
Case #: 3:24-cv-00479
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Creation of a Remedy - Declaration of Rights
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 1:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Francisco Alvarez, III
Defendant
Boar's Cross'n, Inc.
Defendant
Does 1-25
Defendant
Jon Patrick Jones
Defendant
Darwin Lipscomb
Plaintiff
Trisura Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Philip M. Woog
Cooksey Toolen Gage Duffy & Woog
contact info
Phil Woog
Cooksey Toolen Gage Duffy & Woog
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Santiago Hernandez
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Defendant
Adam Spilessmith
Terminated: 08/29/2024


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/06 12:13 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 2/6/2025.(sjt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
15 15 misc Declaration Tue 09/10 1:50 PM
DECLARATION Declaration in Response to OSC As To Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed by Plaintiff Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. (Woog, Philip) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 08/29 4:10 PM
ORDER Dismissing Defendants; for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why the action should not be dismissed as to remaining defendants. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 8/29/2024.(sjt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 07/16 3:52 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why action should not be dismissed as to unserved Defendants for failure to timely effect service of process; for Plaintiff to serve this order on served Defendants; Allowing served Defendants to respond. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 7/16/2024.(sjt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
12 12 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Mon 07/15 2:24 PM
Notice of Stipulation and Order to be Bound by Judgment Entered in Declaratory Relief Action as to Defendant Patrick Jones by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. (Woog, Philip) Modified on 7/15/2024 (sjt)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Miscellaneous (Other 1) Mon 07/15 2:20 PM
Notice of Stipulation and Order to be Bound by Judgment (Lipscomb/Alvarez) ,10 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, Stipulation and Order to be Bound by Judgment Entered in Declaratory Relief Action as to Defendants Darwin Lipscomb and Francisco Alvarez III by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. (Woog, Philip) Modified on 7/15/2024 (sjt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Thu 07/11 11:52 AM
ORDER granting8 ,9 Motions for Leave to File Stipulations and Order to be Bound by Judgment. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 7/11/2024. (sjt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
9 9 motion Leave to File Document Mon 06/17 2:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Stipulation and Order to be Bound by Judgment (Jones) by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. (Woog, Philip)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Leave to File Document Mon 06/17 2:42 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Stipulation and Order to be Bound by Judgment (Lipscomb/Alvarez) by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. (Woog, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/29 4:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. Boar's Cross'n, Inc. served. (Woog, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/16 11:50 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, as to Jon Patrick Jones. (Woog, Philip) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/09 2:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, as to Francisco Alvarez, III, Darwin Lipscomb. (Woog, Philip) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
4 4 misc Declaration Mon 04/01 2:42 PM
DECLARATION re3 Order to Show Cause as to Why Action Should Not be Stayed or Dismissed Under Brillhart by Plaintiff Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. (Woog, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
3 3 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/18 1:53 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Stayed or Dismissed. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 3/18/2024.(sjt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 03/11 4:42 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Francisco Alvarez, III, Boar's Cross'n, Inc., Does 1-25, Santiago Hernandez, Jon Patrick Jones, Darwin Lipscomb, Adam Spilessmith ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18658139.), filed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. The new case number is 3:24-cv-479-TWR-AHG. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Woog, Philip)(ggv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet