New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 7:24-bk-22204
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Aug 12, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
AZG Sales Inc
6 Melnick Dr
Monsey, NY 10952-3370
Represented By
Charles Wertman
Charles Wertman, Esq.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
29 29 misc Certificate of Mailing - Order Discharging Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Thu 08/15 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Discharging Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Related [+] . Notice Date 08/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #27 )
Monday, August 12, 2024
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 08/12 10:32 AM
Case Closed. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 11, 2024
28 28 misc Certificate of Mailing - Order to Dismiss Mon 08/12 12:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order to Dismiss Related [+] . Notice Date 08/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #25 )
Friday, August 09, 2024
27 27 misc Order Discharging Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee (BNC) (ADI) Fri 08/09 5:20 PM
Order Discharging Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee. (adi)
Related: [-]
26 26 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd Fri 08/09 2:13 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 5 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $0.00, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Yann Geron on behalf of Yann Geron. (Geron, Yann)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
25 25 order Motion, Dismiss Case Thu 08/08 8:58 PM
Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case Signed On 8/8/2024 Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 12
24 24 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 08/08 1:35 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Lori Sapir on behalf of Citizens Bank, N.A.. (Sapir, Lori)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
23 23 notice Notice, Appearance Mon 07/15 3:01 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Michael J. Gearin on behalf of Amazon Capital Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Gearin, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Mon 07/15 2:56 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Michael J. Gearin on behalf of Amazon Capital Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Gearin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 notice Notice, Appearance Mon 07/15 2:51 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Honeywell on behalf of Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon Capital Services, Inc.. (Honeywell, Robert)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 07/15 2:58 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 24-22204 shl] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16713052. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #22
Thursday, July 11, 2024
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Thu 07/11 4:39 PM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Annie Wells on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/18/2024 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Wells, Annie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
20 20 misc Operating Report Thu 06/20 11:37 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of AZG Sales Inc.(Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 May 2024 Bank statement
19 19 misc Operating Report Thu 06/20 11:36 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of AZG Sales Inc.(Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 April 2024 Bank statement
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
18 18 misc Operating Report Tue 06/11 9:58 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of AZG Sales Inc.(Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 May 2024 Bank Statement
17 17 misc Operating Report Tue 06/11 9:57 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of AZG Sales Inc.(Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 April 2024 Bank Statement
16 16 misc Operating Report Tue 06/11 9:55 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of AZG Sales Inc. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
15 15 answer Response Fri 06/07 2:39 PM
Response to Motion to Dismiss Related [+] filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of AZG Sales Inc. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 12
14 14 misc Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Fri 06/07 12:39 PM
Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Related [+] Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of AZG Sales Inc. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, May 13, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 05/13 11:27 AM
Certificate of Service re: United States Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Related [+] filed by Annie Wells on behalf of United States Trustee. (Wells, Annie)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
12 12 motion Motion, Dismiss Case Wed 05/08 11:54 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b) with Notice filed by Annie Wells on behalf of United States Trustee with hearing to be held on 5/30/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) Responses due by 5/23/2024,. (Wells, Annie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Annie Wells in Support of United States Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
11 11 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 04/16 10:31 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by A. Albert Buonamici on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Buonamici, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
10 10 misc Cash Flow Statement Fri 04/12 1:25 PM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business September 12, 2023 to March 12, 2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of AZG Sales Inc. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Thu 04/11 4:09 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. Deficiencies Due: Statement of Operations DUE at Time of Filing. Cash Flow Statement DUE at Time of Filing. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit DUE at Time of Filing. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 04/10 9:14 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of AZG Sales Inc.(Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 corporate resolution
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
8 8 misc Balance Sheet Tue 04/09 10:43 AM
Balance Sheet Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of AZG Sales Inc. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Sat 04/06 12:10 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 04/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
6 6 order Case Management Order Re: Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case (BNC) Wed 04/03 2:49 PM
Case Management Order Signed On 4/3/2024, Regarding Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Scheduling Case Conference, and Setting Deadlines for Filing Plan. With status hearing to be held on 4/30/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) Pre-Status Report Due By 4/16/2024. Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
5 5 notice Notice, Meeting of Creditors Tue 04/02 11:19 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors With Telephonic Conference Dial-In Instructions Related [+] filed by Annie Wells on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/16/2024 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Wells, Annie)
Related: [-] 3 ,4
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Thu 03/21 12:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 03/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Monday, March 18, 2024
3 3 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Mon 03/18 4:20 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/16/2024 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs trustee Notice, Appointment of Trustee in a Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case Mon 03/18 1:25 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee in a Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case of Yann Geron as Subchapter V Trustee Filed by Annie Wells on behalf of United States Trustee.(Wells, Annie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Subchapter V Trustee's Verified Statement
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
misc Add Judge Tue 03/12 7:55 AM
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Case Association - Related Tue 03/12 7:57 AM
Case Related to: (Case Number: 24-22190 Baruch Spitzer and Malka Spitzer). (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Tue 03/12 8:59 AM
Deficiencies Set: Statement of Operations DUE at Time of Filing. Balance Sheet DUE at Time of Filing. Cash Flow Statement DUE at Time of Filing. Corporate Resolution DUE at Time of Filing Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit DUE at Time of Filing. Corporate Ownership Statement DUE at Time of Filing. Incomplete Filings due by 3/25/2024, (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
1 1 47 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 03/11 8:35 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/10/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Status Conference To Be Held Before 05/10/2024. Filed by Charles Wertman of Charles Wertman, Esq. on behalf of AZG Sales Inc. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 03/11 8:43 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-22204 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16545882. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1