St. Liz Hospice, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barry Russell |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-11872 |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
St. Liz Hospice, Inc.
1910 W Sunset Blvd Ste 420
Los Angeles, CA 90026-7370 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
trustee
Appointment of Ombudsman
Thu 04/25 2:21 PM
Appointment of Health Care Ombudsman, Robert G. Splawn, MD, MPH Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). (Maroko, Ron) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice
Mon 04/22 12:07 PM
Notice of Scheduling Order on Subchapter V Case Following Status Conference, with proof of service Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc. . (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
Saturday, April 20, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 04/20 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 04/19 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
34 | 34
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 04/19 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
order
Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Thu 04/18 11:20 AM
Scheduling Order on subchapter v case following status conference (see order for details) relates to5 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/18/2024. (SF) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
order
Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Wed 04/17 11:11 AM
Order Granting Stipulation and ORDER thereon for the appointment of a patient care ombudsman (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/17/2024 (SF) |
|
31 | 31
order
Employ (BNC-PDF)
Wed 04/17 11:09 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ RHM LAW LLP as its general bankruptcy counsel(BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/17/2024. (SF) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Wed 04/17 8:22 AM
Stipulation By United States Trustee (LA) and Debtor directing the appointment of a patient care ombudsman Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) (Maroko, Ron) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3))
Mon 04/15 9:59 AM
Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) with proof of service Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc. . (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 04/15 7:40 AM
Receipt of Amending Schedules D and/or E/F (Official Form 106D, 106E/F, 206D, or 206E/F) (Fee)([LINK:2:24-bk-11872-BR] ) [misc,amdsch] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56736728. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Amendment - Amending Schedules D and/or E/F (Official Form 106D, 106E/F, 206D, or 206E/F) (Fee)
Thu 04/11 5:30 PM
Amending Schedules (E/F) with Proof of Service Fee Amount $34 Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc.. (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 04/10 2:55 PM
Notice of Change of Address for Creditor Requlatory Complianes, LLC Filed by John Forrest . (BT) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Wed 04/03 3:04 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing date/time/location was selected. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE STATUS REPORT WITH THE CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION- APRIL 16, 2024 AT 10 A.M. (SF) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status report
Tue 04/02 10:38 AM
Status report ;Supplement to Debtor's Status Report; Declaration of Ricardo Yao in Support Thereof, with proof of service Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc. . (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Declaration
Tue 04/02 8:58 AM
Declaration re: of Ricardo Yao re Small Business Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §1116(1)(B) Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc. . (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Balance Sheet
Mon 04/01 12:19 PM
Balance Sheet Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc.. (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Tax Documents
Mon 04/01 12:14 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc.. (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Proof of service
Fri 03/29 10:13 AM
Proof of service Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc. . (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 03/28 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/28/2024. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of motion/application
Thu 03/28 3:15 PM
Notice of motion/application with proof of service Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc. . (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
18 | 18
38
pgs
motion
Employ (motion)
Thu 03/28 3:14 PM
Application to Employ RHM Law, LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel with proof of service Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc. (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Amendment - Amending Schedules D and/or E/F (Official Form 106D, 106E/F, 206D, or 206E/F) (Fee)
Tue 03/26 11:20 AM
Amending Schedules (E/F) Fee Amount $34, List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc.. (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC)
Tue 03/26 8:39 AM
Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC) (LL) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 03/26 11:24 AM
Receipt of Amending Schedules D and/or E/F (Official Form 106D, 106E/F, 206D, or 206E/F) (Fee)([LINK:2:24-bk-11872-BR] ) [misc,amdsch] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56657747. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 03/25 6:49 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Statement of Corporate Ownership filed., Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc. . |
|
14 | 14
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Mon 03/25 9:07 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Healy, Brian. (Healy, Brian) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice
Thu 03/21 9:42 AM
Notice of: Order Setting Initial Status Conference, with proof of service Filed by Debtor St. Liz Hospice, Inc. . (Moradi-Brovia, Roksana) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 03/15 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/15/2024. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 03/15 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 153. Notice Date 03/15/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 03/14 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 03/14 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2)
Wed 03/13 5:01 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/1/2024 at 10:30 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/31/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 5/20/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/9/2024. (LL2) |
|
7 | 7
4
pgs
trustee
Notice Appointing Trustee
Wed 03/13 11:11 AM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee of John Patrick M. Fritz as subchapter V trustee . John-Patrick McGinnis Fritz (TR) added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). (Maroko, Ron) |
|
6 | 6
court
Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Wed 03/13 9:10 AM
Hearing Set Status hearing to be held on 4/16/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF) |
|
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF)
Wed 03/13 9:09 AM
Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/13/2024. Status hearing to be held on 4/16/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell Initial (SF) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Tue 03/12 1:07 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document of Mismatch between filed document and docket event. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL USING WITHDRAWAL DOCKET EVENT AND REFILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT DOCKET EVENT THAT MATCHES THE DOCUMENT. (SM) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC)
Tue 03/12 12:55 PM
Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) (LL) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 03/12 12:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael A Shakouri Filed by Creditor 1910 SUNSET BLVD (LA), L.P.. (Shakouri, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
33
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/11 7:07 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by St. Liz Hospice, Inc. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 03/25/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 03/25/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 03/25/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 03/25/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 03/25/2024. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 03/25/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 03/25/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 03/25/2024. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 03/25/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 03/25/2024. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/10/2024.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 04/10/2024 |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 03/11 7:09 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:24-bk-11872] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56597342. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco)
Tue 03/12 12:35 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 3/25/2024. (LL) |
||
misc
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn)
Tue 03/12 12:42 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 3/25/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 3/25/2024. (LL) |
||
misc
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco)
Tue 03/12 3:04 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 3/25/2024. (LL2) |