Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00048
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Monday, April 01, 2024
25 25 appeal USCA Order Wed 04/03 3:31 PM
USCA Order dismissing the14 Notice of Appeal, filed by William James Pye as moot. Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 24-10793 (dmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
24 24 appeal USCA Appeal Notice Thu 03/21 2:48 PM
USCA Notice of Supreme Court denying the Petition for Writ of Certiorari re:14 Notice of Appeal, filed by William James Pye. Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 24-10793 (dmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
23 23 appeal USCA Order Thu 03/21 1:09 PM
USCA Order Denying motion for panel reconsideration of the Courts3/19/2024, order denying appellants motion for a stay of execution re:14 Notice of Appeal, filed by William James Pye. Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 24-10793 (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
22 22 appeal USCA Order Thu 03/21 1:06 PM
USCA Order directing parties to file simultaneous supplemental letter briefs by 4 PM EDT today. The briefs shall be no more than five pages re:14 Notice of Appeal, filed by William James Pye. Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 24-10793 (dmb)
Related: [-]
21 21 appeal Notification of Transcript Filed in District Court Wed 03/20 3:15 PM
Notification of Transcript Filed in District Court re17 Transcript Order Form filed by William James Pye. All transcripts for this request are now on file. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
20 20 appeal USCA Order Tue 03/19 11:18 AM
USCA Order directing the Appellees to repsond to Appellant's motion and brief no later than 3/19/2024 re:14 Notice of Appeal, filed by William James Pye. Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 24-10793 (dmb)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Transcript Mon 03/18 7:24 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3 15-2024 before Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Keisha M. Crump RCR, RMR. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/8/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2024. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of filing transcript
17 17 appeal Transcript Order Form Mon 03/18 12:12 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on March 15, 2024 before Judge Judge Batten, re14 Notice of Appeal,. Court Reporter: Keisha Crump. (Potek, Nathan)
Related: [-]
16 16 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 03/18 9:27 AM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Clerk's Judgment, Motions, Order and Docket Sheet to USCA - 11th Circuit. re14 Notice of Appeal. (dmb)
Related: [-]
15 15 appeal USCA Appeal Transmission Mon 03/18 9:03 AM
USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to USCA 11th Circuit re:14 Notice of Appeal, filed by William James Pye. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
19 19 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Tue 03/19 11:15 AM
USCA Acknowledgment of14 Notice of Appeal, filed by William James Pye. Case Appealed to USCA 11th Circuit Case Number 24-10793 P (dmb)
Related: [-]
14 14 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 03/15 7:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to12 Order on Motion for TRO,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Amend, by William James Pye. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. Transcript Order Form due on 3/29/2024 (Potek, Nathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Judgment - Clerk Fri 03/15 6:08 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (dmb)
Related: [-]
12 12 30+ pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend Fri 03/15 6:02 PM
ORDER denying3 Motion for TRO and3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, denying as moot7 Motion to Dismiss and granting8 Motion to Amend. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/15/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 03/15 12:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr.: Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2024 re7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Christopher Carr, and3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by William James Pye. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Keisha Crump)(dmb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/15 6:10 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
10 10 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/14 5:56 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 First MOTION to Amend7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed by William James Pye. (Potek, Nathan)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Thu 03/14 3:35 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/14/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
8 8 motion Amend Wed 03/13 10:21 PM
First MOTION to Amend7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint by Christopher Carr.(Graham, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Pye's Order Denying Rehearing,
Att: 2 Exhibit Pye's Execution Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Order Denying Pye's Motion to Intervene,
Att: 4 Exhibit Pye's Appeal of Order Denying Intervention,
Att: 5 Exhibit Pye's Complaint for Breach of Contract,
Att: 6 Exhibit Affidavit of Jamie Bethune,
Att: 7 Exhibit Orders Denying Rehearing,
Att: 8 Exhibit Order Dismissing Complaint for Breach of Contract,
Att: 9 Exhibit Affidavit of Jill Benton,
Att: 10 Exhibit Emails Regarding COVID-19 Agreement,
Att: 11 Exhibit List of Inmates Party to COVID-19 Agreement,
Att: 12 Exhibit Death Penalty Report,
Att: 13 Exhibit Notice of Pardons and Paroles Hearing
7 7 motion Dismiss Wed 03/13 9:47 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint by Christopher Carr.(Graham, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Pye's Order Denying Rehearing,
Att: 2 Exhibit Pye's Execution Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Order Denying Pye's Motion to Intervene,
Att: 4 Exhibit Pye's Appeal of Order Denying Intervention,
Att: 5 Exhibit Pye's Complaint for Breach of Contract,
Att: 6 Exhibit Affidavit of Jamie Bethune,
Att: 7 Exhibit Orders Denying Rehearing,
Att: 8 Exhibit Order Dismissing Complaint for Breach of Contract,
Att: 9 Exhibit Affidavit of Jill Benton,
Att: 10 Exhibit Emails Regarding COVID-19 Agreement,
Att: 11 Exhibit List of Inmates Party to COVID-19 Agreement,
Att: 12 Exhibit Death Penalty Report,
Att: 13 Exhibit Notice of Pardons and Paroles Hearing
6 6 motion File Excess Pages Wed 03/13 9:36 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiffs Complaint by Christopher Carr. (Graham, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/11 3:23 PM
ORDER granting2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/11/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Mon 03/11 3:18 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2024 at 09:30 AM in NEWN 3rd Floor Courtroom before Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 3/11/2024. (dmb)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Mon 03/11 1:00 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by William James Pye. (jkb)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/11 12:59 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William James Pye.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order for IFP
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT Capital Case, Active Execution Warrant filed by William James Pye.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 03/11 1:01 PM
Submission of3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction,2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (jkb)
Related: [-]