California Central District Court
Judge:Cynthia Valenzuela
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:24-cv-01959
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 1:52 AM PDT
Defendant
County of Los Angeles
Represented By
Faraz Kevin Rashidi
Hurrell Cantrall LLP
contact info
Thomas C. Hurrell
Hurrell Cantrall LLP
contact info
Janet Hur
Hurrell Cantrall LLP
contact info
Defendant
Adam Villalobos
Represented By
Gilbert M Nishimura
Seki Nishimura And Watase LLP
contact info
Janet L Keuper
Seki Nishimura And Watase LLP
contact info
Defendant
Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department
Represented By
Faraz Kevin Rashidi
Hurrell Cantrall LLP
contact info
Thomas C. Hurrell
Hurrell Cantrall LLP
contact info
Janet Hur
Hurrell Cantrall LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
April Herrera
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Edwin Stuart Salguero
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
38 38 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/24 11:40 PM
SCHEDULING AND TRIAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE VALENZUELA by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela: Jury Trial set for 10/14/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 9/26/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. Fact Discovery cut-off 6/13/2025. Last Date to Hear Motions 7/25/2025. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 7/30/2025. Trial Filings (first round): Motions in Limine, Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Witness Lists, Joint Exhibit List, Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement due by 8/29/2025. Trial Filings (second round): Oppositions to Motions in Limine, Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 9/12/2025. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
37 37 stip Continue Thu 04/10 2:50 PM
STIPULATION to Continue PRE-TRIAL RELATED DEADLINES from April 14, 2025 to June 13, 2025 filed by defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department.(Hur, Janet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order GRANTING THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND THE COURTS ORDER RE PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES
Thursday, April 03, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 04/03 1:42 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sara Marie Greco counsel for Defendant Adam Villalobos. Adding Sara M. Greco as counsel of record for Defendant Adam Villalobos for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Adam Villalobos. (Attorney Sara Marie Greco added to party Adam Villalobos(pty:dft))(Greco, Sara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
35 35 misc Statement Thu 02/20 3:21 PM
STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiff April Herrera re: Order32 . (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 02/19 8:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND THE COURT'S ORDER RE JURY TRIAL AND CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela, re Stipulation to Continue,31 . This Court GRANTS that Parties' request and orders the Order re Jury Trial be amended as follows: Discovery cut-off is 4/14/2025, Motions due by 4/28/2025, Last date to conduct settlement conference is 5/30/2025. [See Order for further details.] (san)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
33 33 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 02/14 10:17 AM
STANDING ORDER For Civil Cases upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
32 32 4 pgs order Order Thu 02/06 11:24 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
31 31 stip Continue Mon 02/03 2:13 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue THE TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL RELATED DEADLINES IN THIS MATTER from June 16, 2025 to July 21, 2025 filed by defendants Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, County of Los Angeles.(Rashidi, Faraz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order GRANTING THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND THE COURTS ORDER RE JURY TRIAL AND CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
30 30 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 01/29 11:42 AM
Judge Cynthia Valenzuela's designated initials are CV. On all documents filed in this case on or after January 29, 2025, substitute the initials CV after the case number in place of CVD. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
29 29 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Tue 01/28 4:03 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#25-030) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Cynthia Valenzuela, this case is transferred from Judge Wesley L. Hsu to the calendar of Judge Cynthia Valenzuela for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-01959-CVD (PDx). (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
28 28 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Mon 12/30 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Richard T. Copeland has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
27 27 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Fri 12/27 5:09 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff April Herrera(Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
26 26 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Fri 12/27 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) James DeRoche has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 12/02 3:54 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edwin Stuart Salguero counsel for Plaintiff April Herrera. Edwin S. Salguero is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff April Herrera. (Salguero, Edwin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
24 24 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Wed 09/11 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Philip E Cook has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
23 23 order Protective Order Fri 07/26 9:38 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER22 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
22 22 stip Protective Order Wed 07/24 1:56 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department.(Rashidi, Faraz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
21 21 13 pgs order Order Wed 06/12 9:55 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
20 20 22 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/12 9:53 AM
CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The Scheduling Conference scheduled for 6/14/2024 is hereby VACATED. The pretrial schedule governing this case is set forth in the far right column labeled "Court Order" located on the parties' Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, which accompanies this Order. Jury Trial: 6/16/25 at 9:00 a.m., Final Pretrial Conference: 5/23/25 at 3:00 p.m. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Wed 06/12 8:11 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/18/2025. (hc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
18 18 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 05/30 10:29 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 days, filed by Plaintiff April Herrera..(Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule of Dates
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
17 17 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 05/28 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Adam Villalobos, identifying April Herrera, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, County of Los Angeles, Adam Villalobos. (Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/28 5:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANT Adam Villalobos.(Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 05/01 1:12 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Faraz Kevin Rashidi counsel for Defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department. Adding Kevin Faraz Rashidi as counsel of record for COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department. (Rashidi, Faraz)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 05/01 8:56 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. A Scheduling Conference is set for 6/14/2024 at 01:00 PM. See Attached Order for Details. (hc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
13 13 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/29 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, identifying Plaintiff, April Herrera; Defendants, County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department and Adam Villalobos. (Hurrell, Thomas)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/29 2:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department.(Attorney Thomas C. Hurrell added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas C. Hurrell added to party Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department(pty:dft))(Hurrell, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 04/29 9:19 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Adam Villalobos answer now due 5/29/2024, filed by DEFENDANT Adam Villalobos.(Attorney Janet L Keuper added to party Adam Villalobos(pty:dft))(Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/18 1:21 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 03/15 12:23 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, Adam Villalobos. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
8 8 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Thu 03/14 1:12 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-01959 WLH(PDx). (rn)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Summons Request Wed 03/13 4:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff April Herrera. (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/12 4:36 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/12 4:36 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/12 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/11 10:41 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff April Herrera, (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/11 10:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff April Herrera. (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/11 10:35 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37072946 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff April Herrera. (Attorney Christian M. Contreras added to party April Herrera(pty:pla))(Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]