Oregon District Court
Judge:Jolie A Russo
Case #: 3:24-cv-00448
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 2:11 AM PDT
Defendant
Loren Calkins
Represented By
Nathaniel Aggrey
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Juan Chavez
Represented By
Nathaniel Aggrey
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Emily Echtenkamp
8775 SW Illahee Ct. B 214
Wilsonville, OR 97070
Defendant
Kevin Mills
Represented By
Nathaniel Aggrey
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Theron Segar
Represented By
Nathaniel Aggrey
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Antonio Vargas
Represented By
Nathaniel Aggrey
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
S. Q.
Represented By
Jesse A. Merrithew
Levi Merrithew Horst PC
contact info
Norah Van Dusen
Levi Merrithew Horst PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
38 38 service Waiver of Service Summons Tue 05/13 4:38 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Raymond Byrd waiver sent on 5/12/2025. Filed by Raymond Byrd. (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
37 37 cmp Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES) Mon 05/12 10:05 AM
Third Amended Complaint . Filed by S. Q. against All Defendants. (Van Dusen, Norah)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
36 36 order 1 - Scheduling Mon 04/14 5:30 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Adopting the deadlines as outlined in the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan35 as follows and as modified: File all pleadings and join all claims, remedies and parties to be completed by 12/5/2025. Fact Discovery is to be completed by 12/5/2025. Written consents, if any, should be submitted by 12/5/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/20/2026. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/20/2026. Pretrial Order is due by 3/23/2026 or 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. Expert reports to be exchanged 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions. Rebuttal expert reports to be exchanged 60 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions. Expert discovery to be completed 90 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/15/25.) (gm)
Related: [-]
35 35 oth_doc Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan Mon 04/14 2:27 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by S. Q.. (Van Dusen, Norah)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
34 34 order 1 - Scheduling Mon 03/17 5:28 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: The Court Vacates the forthcoming 5/12/2025 Joint Status Report deadline. Instead, the parties shall confer and submit proposed revised case management deadlines by 4/14/2025. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/18/25.) (gm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
33 33 oth_doc Joint Status Report Fri 03/14 2:51 PM
Joint Status Report . Filed by S. Q.. (Van Dusen, Norah)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
32 32 order 1 - Scheduling Mon 02/10 5:43 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: The parties shall file another formal Joint Status Report on or before 5/12/2025. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 2/11/25.) (gm)
Related: [-]
31 31 oth_doc Joint Status Report Mon 02/10 3:07 PM
Joint Status Report . Filed by Joseph O'Leary, Dan Berger, Oregon Youth Authority, Loren Calkins, Juan Chavez, Theron Segar, Kevin Mills, Antonio Vargas. (Aggrey, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
30 30 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Thu 11/21 12:19 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Consolidate20 is Denied. Signed on 11/21/24 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/21/24.) (gm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
29 29 order 1 - Scheduling Tue 11/12 4:15 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: The parties shall file another formal Joint Status Report on or before 2/10/2025. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/12/24.) (gm)
Related: [-]
28 28 resp Reply to Motion Tue 11/12 3:48 PM
Reply to Amended Motion to Consolidate 20 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
Related: [-]
27 27 oth_doc Joint Status Report Tue 11/12 3:38 PM
Joint Status Report . Filed by Joseph O'Leary, Dan Berger, Oregon Youth Authority, Loren Calkins, Juan Chavez, Theron Segar, Kevin Mills, Antonio Vargas. (Aggrey, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
26 26 service Waiver of Service Summons Tue 11/05 4:29 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Joseph O'Leary waiver sent on 11/5/2024; Oregon Youth Authority waiver sent on 11/5/2024; Dan Berger waiver sent on 11/5/2024. Filed by Joseph O'Leary; Oregon Youth Authority; Dan Berger. (Aggrey, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
25 25 order 1 - Scheduling Thu 10/31 4:08 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: This Court's earlier Order 24 is Vacated. Order: Resetting Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Consolidate Related Cases20 on the under advisement calendar of 11/18/2024. Replies to responses to motion due by 11/12/2024. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/31/24.) (gm)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order on Motion to Consolidate Thu 10/31 2:22 PM
***VACATED*** ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Consolidate20 solely for the purposes of discovery is Granted as unopposed. However, discovery shall not commence until coverage issues are resolved and any relevant case stays are lifted. The parties shall continue to file Joint Status Reports every 90 days (with the next report due on or before 11/12/2024) apprising the Court of the status of both the underlying criminal proceedings and coverage issues. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/31/24.) (gm) Modified on 10/31/2024. (gm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
23 23 oth_sup Declaration Tue 10/29 4:33 PM
Declaration of Nathaniel Aggrey in Support of State Defendants' Response to Motion to Consolidate . Filed by Joseph O'Leary, Dan Berger, Oregon Youth Authority, Loren Calkins, Juan Chavez, Theron Segar, Kevin Mills, Antonio Vargas. Related [+] (Aggrey, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] Response to Motion22 .
22 22 resp Response to Motion Tue 10/29 4:30 PM
Response to Amended Motion to Consolidate 20 . Filed by Joseph O'Leary, Dan Berger, Oregon Youth Authority, Loren Calkins, Juan Chavez, Theron Segar, Kevin Mills, Antonio Vargas. (Aggrey, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
order 1 - Scheduling Wed 10/16 10:23 AM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Consolidate Related Cases20 on the under advisement calendar of 11/18/2024. Responses to motion due by 10/29/2024. Replies to responses to motion due by 11/12/2024. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/16/24.) (gm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
20 20 motion Consolidate Tue 10/15 4:47 PM
Amended Motion to Consolidate . Filed by S. Q.. (Merrithew, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
order Order on Motion to Consolidate Thu 10/03 11:00 AM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Related Cases17 is Denied, with leave to renew, pursuant to Local Rule 7-1(a)(3). Any amended Motion to Consolidate Related Cases must be filed within 14 days and comply with Local Rule 7-1(a)(1). (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/3/24.) (gm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES) Wed 10/02 11:42 AM
Second Amended Complaint . Filed by S. Q. against All Defendants. (Merrithew, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
17 17 motion Consolidate Wed 09/18 9:55 AM
Motion to Consolidate Related Cases . Filed by S. Q.. (Merrithew, Jesse)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES) Wed 09/18 9:22 AM
First Amended Complaint . Filed by S. Q. against Loren Calkins, Juan Chavez, Emily Echtenkamp, Kevin Mills, Theron Segar, Antonio Vargas, Joseph O'Leary, Dan Berger. (Merrithew, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
14 14 oth_doc Joint Status Report Mon 08/12 2:48 PM
Joint Status Report . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Scheduling Mon 08/12 4:28 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: The parties shall file another formal Joint Status Report on or before 11/12/2024. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/12/24.) (gm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
order 1 - Scheduling Mon 05/13 11:50 AM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: On 4/17/2024, pro se defendant Emily Echtenkamp sought a stay in this matter to allow for the resolution of her related criminal proceedings. See Pl.'s Resp. to Compl. 15 . The remaining defendants take no position as to Echtenkamp's request. And plaintiff acknowledges "[t]he Fifth Amendment is clearly implicated as the civil allegations overlap with the criminal allegations." Pl.'s Opp'n 112 . Plaintiff, however, requests that certain limitations be placed on the stay in light of Echtenkamp's pro se status and the fact that she is the only defendant facing criminal proceedings. In particular, plaintiff requests Echtenkamp be ordered to preserve evidence, and that discovery be allowed to proceed in regard to her cell phone(s) and against the remaining five defendants (all of whom are associated with the Oregon Youth Authority ("OYA")). The Court does not find the latter appropriate; while the Fifth Amendment is not implicated in regard to these defendants, discovery in civil proceedings is broader than in criminal proceedings and the remaining defendants could potentially be called as witnesses in those criminal proceedings, or proffer evidence in these proceedings that could bear on her criminal case. The remainder of plaintiff's objections appear well-taken. The Accordingly, given that Echtenkamp's ongoing criminal proceedings are based on the same nucleus of facts, the Court concludes that a stay is warranted. See Smith v. Grant Cnty. , 2021 WL 5876694, *1 (D. Or. May 11, 2021) (staying civil proceedings, including all discovery, to allow for the resolution of related criminal proceedings pursuant to the Keating factors). All pretrial deadlines and discovery in this matter are STAYED pending resolution of Marion County Circuit Court Case No. 23CR58946. The parties shall file formal Joint Status Reports every ninety (90) days with the first report due by 8/12/2024. In addition, the parties are directed to notify the Court within fourteen (14) days of the resolution of the criminal matter. Within forty-five (45) days of the resolution of the criminal matter, the parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule for discovery and other pretrial matters. In the interim, Echtenkamp shall preserve any and all discoverable evidence in her possession, custody, or control, including but not limited: (1) notes, journals, or other writings that document or describe her work experiences or interactions with any youth at MacLaren; (2) the contents of the personal cell phone(s) used while she was employed with the OYA, including data held by third party apps; and (3) communications in any form with any youth/staff or former youth/staff at the OYA, or concerning her time at the OYA and/or her relationships with any youth/staff; (4) the contents of any social media accounts; and (5) any other documents relating to her time at OYA or any relationships with youth/staff at OYA. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/13/24.) (gm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
12 12 resp Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/10 8:22 AM
Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay to Motion for Appointment of Counsel6 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
order Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel Tue 05/07 11:59 AM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Defendant Emily Echtenkamp's Motion for Appointment of Counsel6 is Denied. There is generally no right to counsel in a civil case; yet the court may request pro bono counsel pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(1) if the party is unable to afford an attorney and "exceptional circumstances" are present. Palmer v. Valdez , 560 F.3d 965, 970 (9th Cir. 2009) (citations omitted); see also United States v. McQuade , 647 F.2d 938, 940 (9th Cir. 1981) ("[a] person who can afford to retain counsel has no constitutional right to have counsel appointed"). Here, defendant indicates access to nearly $9000 in liquid assets and ongoing employment (although her amount of monthly income is not specified). In contrast, she identifies approximately $2800 in monthly expenses ($450 of which is for a car payment), and a relatively low amount of debt (the vast majority of which is in the form of a college loan). And defendant acknowledges these funds are sufficient to pay for private defense counsel in her related criminal proceedings. Even assuming defendant's financial status qualifies her for pro bono counsel, the requisite exceptional circumstances are not present. The complaint alleges two claims - for cruel and unusual punishment and professional negligence - and reflects no dispute surrounding the existence of an improper sexual relationship insofar as it alleges "Echtenkamp was caught having sex with Plaintiff [during the time he was incarcerated] at MacLaren [Youth Correctional Facility]." Compl. para. 39 (doc.1 ). In other words, the case boils down to a straightforward effort by plaintiff to hold defendant responsible civilly for criminal activity that she is currently being prosecuted for. Id. at paras. 44-45. Accordingly, defendant's likelihood of success as to the merits is questionable and she appears able to defend herself against plaintiff's claims in light of the complexity of the legal issues involved. (gm)
Related: [-]
service Clerks Notice of Mailing Tue 05/07 12:02 PM
Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Defendant Emily Echtenkamp regarding Order 10 . (gm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
9 9 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Fri 04/26 4:06 PM
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice Fri 04/26 4:05 PM
Notice of Representation of Calkins, Segar and Vargas Filed by Loren Calkins, Theron Segar, Antonio Vargas. (Aggrey, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Summons Fri 04/26 4:01 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed Filed by Kevin Mills, Juan Chavez. (Aggrey, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 04/18 1:10 PM
Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Emily Echtenkamp. (sb)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/18 1:09 PM
Response to1 Complaint. Filed by Emily Echtenkamp. (sb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 03/13 3:41 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Loren Calkins, Juan Chavez, Emily Echtenkamp, Kevin Mills, Theron Segar, Antonio Vargas. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (gd)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Wed 03/13 3:06 PM
Proposed Summons Filed by S. Q.. (Merrithew, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Tue 03/12 8:48 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/10/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/9/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 8/9/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/11 7:35 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9317718 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by S. Q. against All Defendants. (Merrithew, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet