Original Case: 1:22-cv-00058

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvpri-07030
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 4:16 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Zimbabwe Mining Development Corporation
Represented By
Rodney Quinn Smith II
Gst LLP
contact info
Bethel Kassa
GST LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Chief Mining Commissioner, Ministry of Mines of Zimbabwe
Represented By
Rodney Quinn Smith II
Gst LLP
contact info
Bethel Kassa
GST LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Republic of Zimbabwe
Represented By
Rodney Quinn Smith II
Gst LLP
contact info
Bethel Kassa
GST LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Amaplat Mauritius Ltd.
Represented By
Steven K. Davidson
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Amari Nickel Holdings Zimbabwe Ltd.
Represented By
Steven K. Davidson
Steptoe LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/12/2024 4:16 AM EDT
Monday, March 11, 2024
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 24-7030
Related: [-]
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2044339] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-00058-CRC filed by Chief Mining Commissioner, Ministry Of Mines Of Zimbabwe, Republic of Zimbabwe and Zimbabwe Mining Development Corporation. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-7030 24-7030
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2044345] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/10/2024. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/10/2024. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/10/2024. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/10/2024. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/10/2024. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 04/10/2024. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/10/2024. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/10/2024. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 04/25/2024. APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/10/2024. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/10/2024. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/10/2024. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 04/25/2024 24-7030
Related: [-]