Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Case #: 3:24-cv-00601
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 04, 2024
Case in other court:193rd Judicial District Court of Dallas County TX, DC-24-00865
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 6:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Expro Holdings UK 4 Limited
Represented By
Steven C Lockhart
Foley Gardere / Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Terrell R Miller
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Jason Paul Sharp
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Craig D Dillard
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MCR Oil Tools LLC
Represented By
Meredith Nicole Palmer
Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP
contact info
Benjamin L Riemer
Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 04, 2024
25 25 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Thu 04/04 4:23 PM
The Court finds that Defendant contractually waived its right of removal and, because removal was improper, remand is required. The Court grants Plaintiff's8 Motion to Remand. Because the Court cannot conclude that Defendant lacked an objectively reasonable basis for removing this case, plaintiff's request to file an application for attorneys' fees and costs is denied. This case is remanded to the 193rd Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/4/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
24 24 respm Response/Objection Mon 04/01 3:24 PM
RESPONSE filed by MCR Oil Tools LLC re:23 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Riemer, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, March 30, 2024
23 23 motion Leave to File Sat 03/30 10:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Expro Holdings UK 4 Limited with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Lockhart, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
22 22 respm Reply Wed 03/27 10:02 PM
REPLY filed by MCR Oil Tools LLC re:8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Riemer, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
21 21 respm Response/Objection Fri 03/22 5:20 PM
RESPONSE filed by Expro Holdings UK 4 Limited re:8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Lockhart, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
20 20 respm Reply Thu 03/21 7:12 PM
REPLY filed by MCR Oil Tools LLC re:16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Riemer, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
19 19 respm Appendix in Support Tue 03/19 10:21 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Expro Holdings UK 4 Limited re18 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Lockhart, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) I,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) J
18 18 respm Response/Objection Tue 03/19 10:16 PM
RESPONSE filed by Expro Holdings UK 4 Limited re:16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Lockhart, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
17 17 order Order Fri 03/15 5:54 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff filed a Verified Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. 16). The Court EXPEDITES the briefing related to Plaintiff's application for temporary restraining order ("TRO"). Defendant shall file its response by March 19, 2024. Plaintiff shall file its reply by March 21, 2024. There shall be no extensions of these deadlines. By expediting the briefing, the Court is in no way indicating that it considers this TRO application to be an emergency or that the TRO application will be determined on an expedited basis. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/15/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 03/15 5:13 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MCR Oil Tools LLC (Riemer, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit(s),
Att: 4 Exhibit(s),
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 14, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion to Expedite Thu 03/14 2:07 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Expedited Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (the "Motion for Hearing") (Doc. No. 13). The Court DENIES without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing. The Court will decide the pending Motion to Remand (Doc. No. 8) on the parties' briefing without oral argument, unless the Court determines a hearing would be helpful or is necessary. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). The Court hereby EXPEDITES sua sponte the responsive briefing to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand only . Defendant shall file its response to the Motion to Remand by March 22, 2024. Plaintiff may file a reply by March 27, 2024. If Defendant fails to timely respond, the Court will construe the Motion to Remand as unopposed. The Court STAYS Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue or Stay under the First-to-File Rule (Doc. No. 10) and any related responsive briefing until the Court has determined, as a threshold matter, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/14/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Thu 03/14 1:17 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by MCR Oil Tools LLC re13 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Palmer, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C
13 13 motion Expedite Thu 03/14 1:12 PM
Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by MCR Oil Tools LLC (Palmer, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document Thu 03/14 10:46 AM
(Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information Filed Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by MCR Oil Tools LLC (Palmer, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
11 11 respm Appendix in Support Wed 03/13 7:37 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Expro Holdings UK 4 Limited re10 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division or Stay (Lockhart, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
10 10 motion Transfer Case Out of District/Division Wed 03/13 7:35 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division or Stay filed by Expro Holdings UK 4 Limited with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Lockhart, Steven)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Wed 03/13 6:50 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by MCR Oil Tools LLC re8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Palmer, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B
8 8 motion Remand to State Court Wed 03/13 6:45 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MCR Oil Tools LLC (Palmer, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document Wed 03/13 6:36 PM
(Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information Filed Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Expro Holdings UK 4 Limited (Lockhart, Steven)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/13 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meredith Nicole Palmer on behalf of MCR Oil Tools LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Palmer, Meredith)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/13 5:42 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven C Lockhart on behalf of Expro Holdings UK 4 Limited. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lockhart, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Wed 03/13 3:19 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where the attorney of record for a party does not reside or maintain their principal office in this district. Further, pursuant to the undersigned's Judge Specific Requirements, local counsel must sign all documents filed with this Court. Defendant lists a local attorney in the signature block of its Notice of Removal, but local counsel did not sign the Notice of Removal. See Doc. No. 1 at 6. At this time, the only attorney of record for Defendant is located outside of this District. By March 20, 2024 , Defendant shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.10(a). Also, any filings after the entry of this Order which do not include local counsel's signature will be immediately unfiled regardless of any related deadline. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/13/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
3 3 qcref Kinkeade Tue 03/12 4:17 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs order Order Tue 03/12 3:38 PM
ORDER: This Order governs requests to file materials in this case under seal. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/12/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 03/12 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Expro Holdings UK 4 Limited. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-14458184) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dillard, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 4,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) 5,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) 6,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) 7,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) 8,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) 9,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) 10,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) 11,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) 12