Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cv-00374
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 5:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Ralston Purina
Defendant
Linde Engineering North America
Defendant
M.J.M. Electric Cooperative
Defendant
Marathon Petroleum Corp.
Defendant
Menard Electric Cooperative
Defendant
Mississippi Lime Company
Defendant
National Grid USA Service Company
Defendant
New-Mac Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Defendant
Pemiscot-Dunklin Electric Cooperative
Defendant
Progress Energy
Defendant
KAGMO Electric Motor Co.
Defendant
Richards Electric Motor Co.
Defendant
Sachs Electric Company
Defendant
Siemens Industry, Inc.
Defendant
South Central Indiana REMC
Defendant
Southern Illinois Electric Cooperative
Defendant
Spectrum Brands, Inc.
CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company 221 Bolivar
Jefferson City, MO 65101
Defendant
Wayne County REMC
Defendant
Wayne-White Counties Electric Cooperative
Defendant
Department of the Air Force
Defendant
Barry Electric Cooperative
Defendant
Barton County Electric Cooperative
Defendant
Chevron Chemical Company
Defendant
Citizens Electric Corporation
Defendant
Citizens Utilities Company/Frontier Communication
Defendant
City of Fredericktown
KING KREHBIEL & HELLMICH LLC 2000 S Hanley Rd St. Louis
St. Louis, MO 63144
Defendant
City of Jackson
Defendant
City of Sikeston
Defendant
Defense Logistics Agency
Defendant
Ameren Corporation
Defendant
Department of the Army
Defendant
Doe Run Resources Company, Inc.
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co.
Defendant
Evansville Electric & Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Defendant
Farmers Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Defendant
Freeman United Coal Company
Defendant
Hancock County REMC
Plaintiff
State of Missouri
207 West High Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101
Represented By
Timothy P. Duggan
Office Of The Attorney General Of Missouri - Jefferson City
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
3 3 order Clerk's Order (administrative closing) Wed 03/13 11:28 AM
CLERK'S ORDER (NMG) - The above-styled and numbered case was opened in CM/ECF on March 12, 2024 and assigned to the Eastern Division. After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly and should have been assigned to the Southeastern Division. Accordingly, this matter is transferred to the Southeastern Division and assigned to the Honorable Abbie Crites-Leoni, United States Magistrate Judge, under cause number 1:24CV00048 ACL. Cause Number 4:24CV00374 UNA shall be administratively closed. (JWD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/12 3:05 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff State of Missouri of Waiver of Service by Defendants (Duggan, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 1:26 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant state of missouri with receipt number AMOEDC-10489481, in the amount of $405 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by state of missouri.(Duggan, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form