Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Barry W Ashe
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:24-cv-00615
Nature of Suit462 Immigration - Naturalization Application
Cause08:1447 Review of Denial of Naturalization Application
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 5:59 AM CDT
Defendant
Eureka Arties
Defendant
Denise Frazier
Defendant
Attorney General of the United States
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff
Ibrahim O Rabee
Represented By
Marco Balducci
Pelton And Balducci, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, August 02, 2024
17 17 motion Dismiss Case Fri 08/02 1:16 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Case by Ibrahim O Rabee. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/2/2024. (Balducci, Marco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA Wed 06/26 7:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 6/24/2024, answer due 8/23/2024. (Balducci, Marco)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA Wed 06/26 7:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Department of Homeland Security served on 6/24/2024, answer due 8/23/2024. (Balducci, Marco)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA Wed 06/26 7:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Eureka Arties served on 6/24/2024, answer due 8/23/2024. (Balducci, Marco)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA Wed 06/26 6:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Denise Frazier served on 6/24/2024, answer due 8/23/2024. (Balducci, Marco)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA Wed 06/26 6:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Attorney General of the United States served on 6/24/2024, answer due 8/23/2024. (Balducci, Marco)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
11 11 service Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:14 PM
**DEFICIENT**CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ibrahim O Rabee DHS Mayorkas . (Balducci, Marco) Modified on 6/24/2024 (clc)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:14 PM
**DEFICIENT**CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ibrahim O Rabee DHS GC . (Balducci, Marco) Modified on 6/24/2024 (clc)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:13 PM
**DEFICIENT**CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ibrahim O Rabee USCIS Jaddou . (Balducci, Marco) Modified on 6/24/2024 (clc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:12 PM
**DEFICIENT**CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ibrahim O Rabee USCIS ATL Dist . (Balducci, Marco) Modified on 6/24/2024 (clc)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:11 PM
**DEFICIENT**CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ibrahim O Rabee USCIS NOL . (Balducci, Marco) Modified on 6/24/2024 (clc)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:09 PM
**DEFICIENT**CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ibrahim O Rabee Attorney General . (Balducci, Marco) Modified on 6/24/2024 (clc)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service Mon 06/24 4:06 PM
**DEFICIENT** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ibrahim O Rabee Civil Process Clerk USA EDLA . (Balducci, Marco) Modified on 6/24/2024 (clc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 03/19 12:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Eureka Arties, Attorney General of the United States, Department of Homeland Security, Denise Frazier, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.(gla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons
3 3 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 03/19 11:34 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint - Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (gla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 03/12 4:29 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (meb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10438219) filed by Ibrahim O Rabee.Attorney Marco Balducci added to party Ibrahim O Rabee(pty:pla).(Balducci, Marco)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit I551 permanent resident card,
Att: 3 Exhibit Naturalization Application Receipt,
Att: 4 Exhibit Naturalization Interview Notice,
Att: 5 Exhibit Infopass confirmation notice,
Att: 6 Exhibit Application for Naturalization,
Att: 7 Exhibit Response to request for evidence Application for Naturalization,
Att: 8 Summons Mayorkas,
Att: 9 Summons Jaddou,
Att: 10 Summons Frazier,
Att: 11 Summons Arties,
Att: 12 Summons Garland,
Att: 13 Summons USCIS,
Att: 14 Summons USA