Montana District Court
Judge:Dana L Christensen
Referred: Kathleen L Desoto
Case #: 9:24-cv-00032
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 4:44 AM MDT
Defendant
BBNDD, LLC,
Defendant
Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Represented By
Fred Simpson
Hall & Evans, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
Plaintiff
First Montana Bank, Inc.
Represented By
Martin S. King
Worden Thane
contact info
Dillon Kato
Worden Thane PC
contact info

GPO Sep 03 2024
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/3/2024. (ASG)

Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 09/03 10:31 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/3/2024. (ASG)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
20 20 2 pgs motion Stipulation Motion - MT Fri 08/23 9:46 AM
Joint Stipulated Motion for Dismissal . Fred Simpson appearing for Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Simpson, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order
Thursday, August 15, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 08/15 11:33 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. IT IS ORDERED that on or before August 22, 2024, the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss together with a proposed order dismissing the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/15/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing - SDM Thu 08/15 11:34 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Dismissal Papers due by 8/22/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 08/14 4:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation and Proposed Order Dismissing This Case . Martin S. King appearing for Plaintiff First Montana Bank, Inc.. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (King, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Setting - MT Wed 07/17 9:53 AM
Order Setting: Dismissal Papers due by 8/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 7/17/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
16 16 2 pgs notice Notice of Settlement Tue 07/16 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by First Montana Bank, Inc. (King, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
15 15 11 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/25 2:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Remand and for an Award of Costs and Attorney's Fees filed by First Montana Bank, Inc.. (King, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/23 11:52 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. (Simpson, Fred)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/16 2:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re3 MOTION To Dismiss Party or in the Alternate to Realign Party filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. (Simpson, Fred)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
12 12 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/11 3:58 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION to Remand and for an Award of Costs and Attorney's Fees filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. (Simpson, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
11 11 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/09 2:54 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by First Montana Bank, Inc.. (King, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
10 10 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/02 1:57 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re3 MOTION To Dismiss Party or in the Alternate to Realign Party filed by First Montana Bank, Inc.. (King, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
9 9 18 pgs respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Thu 03/28 2:13 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re8 MOTION to Remand and for an Award of Costs and Attorney's Fees filed by First Montana Bank, Inc.. (King, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Martin S. King
8 8 motion Remand Thu 03/28 2:10 PM
MOTION to Remand and for an Award of Costs and Attorney's Fees . Martin S. King appearing for Plaintiff First Montana Bank, Inc.. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (King, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/19 3:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. (Simpson, Fred)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Tue 03/19 3:20 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. (Simpson, Fred)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/19 3:19 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Fred Simpson appearing for Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Simpson, Fred)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
4 4 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Tue 03/12 4:21 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re3 MOTION To Dismiss Party or in the Alternate to Realign Party filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. (Simpson, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Policy
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/12 4:16 PM
MOTION To Dismiss Party or in the Alternate to Realign Party . Fred Simpson appearing for Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Simpson, Fred)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/12 2:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London identifying Corporate Parent Munich Re Syndicate Limited, Corporate Parent Argenta Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Hardy Limited, Corporate Parent Hardy Underwriting Limited, Corporate Parent Hannover Rück SE, Corporate Parent Munich Re Capital Limited, for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London.. (Simpson, Fred)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal - SDM Tue 03/12 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Nineteenth Judicial District Court, Lincoln County, case number DV-23-221., filed Markel International Insurance Company Limited. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 39 pgs Exhibit Policy,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit Original Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit Certificate of Costs,
Att: 5 78 pgs Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 1 pgs Exhibit Docket sheet,
Att: 7 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 03/12 2:16 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3226616 (TAG)
Related: [-]