Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Kezia OL Taylor
Case #: 2:24-cv-00315
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 7:04 AM EDT
Defendant
UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH
Represented By
Mariah L Passarelli
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Mediator
Hon. Lisa Lenihan
Represented By
Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Judge Lenihan Adr (ret.)
contact info
Plaintiff
LARETTE HILL-CASTLEBERRY
Represented By
Massimo A. Terzigni
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
Elizabeth Tuttle
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
Joel S. Sansone
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
24 24 order Order Tue 05/13 4:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING the23 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by LARETTE HILL-CASTLEBERRY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 05/13/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Mon 05/12 10:44 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by LARETTE HILL-CASTLEBERRY. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 11/05 4:25 PM
ORDER that the Clerk of Court mark this case CLOSED. Nothing contained in this order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this action. Should further proceedings be required, either party may file a motion to re-open and this case will proceed as if this order had not been entered. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized including, but not limited to, enforcing settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 11/05/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
21 21 adr Report of Mediation Mon 10/28 9:51 AM
REPORT of Mediation: Mediation held on 10/24/2024. Case has been resolved. Lisa Lenihan terminated. Attorney Lisa Pupo Lenihan terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The online questionnaire can be accessed on [LINK:the court's website] . (Lenihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 07/24 11:53 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Lisa Pupo Lenihan is appointed as mediator. Party Lisa Lenihan added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 07/24/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Case Management Order Wed 07/24 2:41 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Compliance with provisions of Rule 16 shall be completed as follows: Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) shall be made by August 7, 2024. Amendments to the pleadings and joinder of additional parties will be completed by September 9, 2024. The ADR process will be completed no later than October 24, 2024. A telephone status conference is scheduled for November 6, 2024 at 10:00 AM. Counsel are to call into the conference by dialing (412) 547-0144 and entering the Phone Conference ID 192 447 550#. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. The parties shall complete fact discovery by December 20, 2024. A status/settlement conference will be held on January 10, 2025 at 10:00 AM. Trial counsel shall attend and the parties shall be available by telephone. No later than 5 business days prior to the conference any party intending to file a motion for summary judgment shall file a statement, no longer than 3 pages, setting forth the grounds on which the motion will be filed. All parties are to be prepared to discuss this at the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 07/24/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference Wed 07/24 2:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference was held on 7/24/2024. An appropriate order will be entered. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
17 17 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Thu 07/18 3:01 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Passarelli, Mariah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 07/16 3:36 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Passarelli, Mariah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 06/20 6:40 PM
ORDER that the Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference in this matter will be held July 24, 2024, at 10:00 AM, before Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor. All participants are to call into the conference by dialing (412) 547-0144 and entering the Phone Conference ID 192 447 550#. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, at least seven (7) days prior to the Initial Scheduling Conference, the parties shall prepare and file a report pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), the form of which is set forth in LCvR 16.1.A. in the Local Rules. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, at least three (3) business days prior to the Initial Scheduling Conference, the parties must also file the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process, which is attached to this order as Exhibit A. Counsel must familiarize themselves with the Practices and Procedures of the undersigned on the Court's website: https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Taylor_Practices_Procedures.pdfCounsel will be held responsible for complying with such practices and procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 06/20/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ADR Form
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/18 3:36 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Additional Defenses by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Passarelli, Mariah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 06/11 10:57 AM
ORDER granting12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. Defendant UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH shall file a responsive pleading to the Complaint by 6/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on June 11, 2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 06/10 12:14 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by LARETTE HILL-CASTLEBERRY by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Passarelli, Mariah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 05/28 1:31 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH Answer due from UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH on 6/11/2024. (Passarelli, Mariah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/24 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Massimo A. Terzigni on behalf of LARETTE HILL-CASTLEBERRY. (Terzigni, Massimo)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/24 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of LARETTE HILL-CASTLEBERRY. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/24 1:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LARETTE HILL-CASTLEBERRY. UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH waiver sent on 3/29/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
7 7 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Tue 04/16 1:00 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Passarelli, Mariah)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/16 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of LARETTE HILL-CASTLEBERRY. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Tue 04/16 12:51 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by LARETTE HILL-CASTLEBERRY. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/26 5:55 PM
ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge, or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge, no later than April 16, 2024. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect the District Judge Option, Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Any party who has filed a Consent to Trial by a Magistrate Judge or District Judge form does not need to refile it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 03/26/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Form
Monday, March 25, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/25 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mariah L Passarelli on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Passarelli, Mariah)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/22 5:47 PM
ORDER that the parties must meet and confer at least 5 business days prior to the filing of such a motion to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made good faith efforts to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. The certificate should include when and how the meet and confer took place. The Court will strike any motion to dismiss that does not contain the required certification. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: (1) as soon as is practicable, Plaintiff(s) promptly shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s); (2) all counsel and unrepresented parties must read, know and understand the Local Rules of this Court (see web page at: https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/lrmanual20181101.pdf); and (3) all counsel and unrepresented parties must familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (see https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Taylor_Practices_Procedures.pdf ) and they will be held responsible for complying with the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor on 03/22/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/14 4:18 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to the case. (elt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Thu 03/14 8:43 AM
COMPLAINT against UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8158836), filed by LARETTE HILL-CASTLEBERRY. (elt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/14 8:38 AM
Judge David S. Cercone added. (elt)
Related: [-]