New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:24-cv-02625
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 7:26 AM EDT
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC
Defendant
KENVUE INC
Defendant
LLT MANAGEMENT LLC
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE BONCZEK
Represented By
JAMES G. ONDER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF SHERYL MOORE
Represented By
JAMES G. ONDER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/08 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON (SHARKO, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
mdl MDL Direct File Mon 03/18 11:40 AM
Member Case Direct File on 3/12/2024, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jxh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 03/13 2:36 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC, KENVUE INC, LLT MANAGEMENT LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 5:26 PM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC, KENVUE INC, LLT MANAGEMENT LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15168112) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ESTATE OF SHERYL MOORE, CHRISTINE BONCZEK.(ONDER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet