Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 1:24-cv-00020
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 6:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Affordable Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Bethany M. Vanhooser
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Arthur D. Goldman
Law Office Of Arthur D. Goldman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
William Steven Gilliam
Represented By
Anthony I. Paronich
Paronich Law, P.C.
contact info
Scott Alan Lanzon
The Lanzon Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 06, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 03/06 4:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Status Report (Doc No.22 ), seeking dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's claims against Defendant. Accordingly, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/6/2025. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
22 22 misc Status Report Wed 03/05 8:06 AM
STATUS REPORT by William Steven Gilliam. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/04 2:56 PM
ORDER: By no later than March 14, 2025, Plaintiff must file a status report of its intentions regarding prosecution and disposition of this case. Alternatively, Plaintiff may, by this same date, file a motion for entry of default or for other relief from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/4/2025. (xc:Pro se party by email at Harry Slater.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) Modified on 3/4/2025 (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/14 4:32 PM
ORDER: Defendant is PUT ON NOTICE that a corporation cannot appear in federal court except through an attorney. Defendant must therefore secure new counsel, who MUST ENTER AN APPEARANCE on Defendant's behalf by no later than JANUARY 23, 2025. Defendant Affordable Health Solutions, Inc. is therefore cautioned that failure to retain counsel as directed may result in entry of default and default judgment against it. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to by email to Defendant Affordable Health Solutions, Inc. c/o Harry Slater at the following email address: harryprotects@gmail.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/14/2025. (xc: Pro se party by email.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) Modified on 1/14/2025 (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 12/02 2:53 PM
ORDER:17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant filed by Affordable Health Solutions Inc. is GRANTED. Attorney Arthur D. Goldman and Bethany M. Vanhooser terminated. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/2/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/27 9:25 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant filed by William Steven Gilliam. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
17 17 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 11/21 1:16 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant by Affordable Health Solutions Inc..(Vanhooser, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letter to H. Slater
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
16 16 misc Joint Case Resolution Status Report Tue 11/05 2:36 PM
Joint Case Resolution Status Report by Affordable Health Solutions Inc.. (Vanhooser, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 06/14 11:46 AM
PA State Bar status verified as active for Arthur D. Goldman not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
15 15 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/13 8:31 AM
ORDER granting14 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Arthur David Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/13/2024. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/12 1:02 PM
MOTION for attorney Arthur David Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4098956) by Affordable Health Solutions Inc..(Vanhooser, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
13 13 order Case Management Order Tue 06/11 3:20 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2024. Discovery due by 2/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/11/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference by Telephone Tue 06/11 1:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 6/11/2024.(Hearing lasted 0:33)(mcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
12 12 misc Proposed Case Management Order Tue 06/04 10:51 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by William Steven Gilliam. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/26 3:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Affordable Health Solutions Inc..(Vanhooser, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Affidavit of Service Wed 03/20 3:04 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by William Steven Gilliam. Affordable Health Solutions Inc. served on 3/19/2024., AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Harry Slater, Registered Agent on March 19, 2024, filed by William Steven Gilliam. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/18 12:30 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/18/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 11:57 AM
ORDER granting7 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Anthony Paronich to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 03/18/2024. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 03/14 9:41 AM
MA State Bar status verified as active for Anthony I. Paronich not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 7:23 AM
First MOTION for attorney Anthony Paronich to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4032721) by William Steven Gilliam.(Lanzon, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 03/12 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/11/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (af)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 03/12 3:37 PM
Summons issued as to Affordable Health Solutions Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (af)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 03/12 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (af)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 03/12 3:35 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (af)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Tue 03/12 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (af)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Affordable Health Solutions Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4032378), filed by William Steven Gilliam.(af)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 03/12 3:39 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Scott Alan Lanzon admitted to this court . (af)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 03/12 3:43 PM
MA State Bar status verified as active for Anthony I. Paronich not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (af)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - PHV Tue 03/12 3:44 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Anthony I. Paronich: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/2/2024. (af)
Related: [-]