La Loba De Wall St LLC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Vincent P Zurzolo |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-11898 |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
La Loba De Wall St LLC
624 S Grand Ave Ste 1711
Los Angeles, CA 90017-3318 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Fri 04/26 8:48 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Hearing to be held on 06/13/2024 at 10:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1368 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for10 , (NV) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Statement
Thu 04/25 11:12 PM
Statement of disinterestedness w pos Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC. (Totaro, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Mon 04/22 11:24 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Notice of Mismatch between filed document and docket event. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (TJ) |
|
36 | 36
11
pgs
motion
For Order Employing Professional (Ch 11)-(LBR 2014-1) (motion)
Mon 04/22 9:56 AM
Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Ch 11 Case for Order Employing Professional (LBR 2014-1): Michael R. Totaro, Maureen J. Shanahan & Totaro & Shanahan, LLP as General Insolvency Counsel w pos Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC (Totaro, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Declaration
Fri 04/12 9:36 PM
Declaration re: Budget re Professional Fees Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC . (Totaro, Michael) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference
Thu 04/11 10:22 PM
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference w pos Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC. (Totaro, Michael) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Statement of Operations for Small Business
Thu 04/11 9:58 PM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC. (Totaro, Michael) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference
Thu 04/11 3:51 PM
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference Subchapter V Trustees Status Report Statement Filed by Trustee Gregory Kent Jones (TR). (Jones (TR), Gregory) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
court
Process Paid Request for Certified Copy
Mon 04/08 8:30 AM
|
|
30 | 30
misc
Request for a Certified Copy
Sun 04/07 5:35 PM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $12. The document will be sent via email to :Mtotaro@aol.com: Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC . (Totaro, Michael) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Request for a Certified Copy
Sun 04/07 5:26 PM
Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $12. The document will be sent via email to :Mtotaro@aol.com: Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC . (Totaro, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sun 04/07 5:27 PM
Receipt of Request for a Certified Copy([LINK:2:24-bk-11898-VZ] ) [misc,paycert] ( 12.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56709622. Fee amount 12.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sun 04/07 5:39 PM
Receipt of Request for a Certified Copy([LINK:2:24-bk-11898-VZ] ) [misc,paycert] ( 12.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56709625. Fee amount 12.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
trustee
Notice Appointing Trustee
Fri 04/05 12:53 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee with proof of service . Gregory Kent Jones (TR) added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). (Morrison, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Notice to Pay Court Costs Due (BNC Option)
Thu 04/04 11:09 AM
Notice to Pay Court Costs Due Sent To: Michael R Totaro, Total Amount Due $0 . (SC2) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Tue 04/02 3:41 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Docket event was incorrectly selected for filings requiring no filing fee, however, the document filed indicates that a filing fee is due. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT FEE DOCKET EVENT. (SC2) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B)
Tue 04/02 11:54 AM
Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC. (Totaro, Michael) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030)
Tue 04/02 11:46 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC. (Totaro, Michael) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207)
Tue 04/02 11:43 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC. (Totaro, Michael) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Tue 04/02 11:33 AM
Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , List of Equity Security Holders , Notice of Available Chapters (Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor) (Official Form B201) , Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC. (Totaro, Michael) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Tue 04/02 10:54 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2024 Filed by. (Totaro, Michael) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Addendum to Vol Pet
Tue 04/02 10:38 AM
Addendum to voluntary petition Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC. (Totaro, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Thu 03/28 8:18 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Other: CORRECTION: Notice of Mismatch between filed document and docket event. CORRECTION: Document not related - THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (TJ) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Reply
Thu 03/28 12:20 AM
Reply to w pos Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC (Totaro, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK Case)
Thu 03/28 12:10 AM
Notice of Hearing on Status Conference w pos Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC. (Totaro, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Wed 03/27 2:11 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document filed without holographic signature. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES ON DOCUMENTS THAT REQUIRE A SIGNATURE ONLY. (SC2) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 03/27 11:18 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC . (Totaro, Michael) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Addendum to Vol Pet
Wed 03/27 10:59 AM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) W POS , Addendum to voluntary petition W POS , Amending Schedules (D) (E/F) W POS Fee Amount $34, Statement of Corporate Ownership filed., Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) W POS , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) W POS , Notice of Available Chapters (Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor) (Official Form B201) W POS , Amended Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) W POS , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) W POS Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC . (Totaro, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Substitution of attorney
Wed 03/27 12:11 AM
Substitution of attorney w pos Filed by Debtor La Loba De Wall St LLC. (Totaro, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 03/27 11:19 AM
Receipt of Amending Schedules D and/or E/F (Official Form 106D, 106E/F, 206D, or 206E/F) (Fee)([LINK:2:24-bk-11898-VZ] ) [misc,amdsch] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56663167. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Saturday, March 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 03/23 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 03/23 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Thu 03/21 4:29 PM
Order: (1) Setting Conference on Status of Reorganization Case; (2) Requiring Debtor-in Possession to Appear at Status Conference And File Report on Status of Reorganization Case, or Face Possible (A) Conversion of Case to Chapter 7; (B) Dismissal of Case; or (c) Appointment of Trustee; (3) Requiring Compliance With Standards Re Employment And Fee Applications; (4) Giving Notice of Probable Use of Court-Appointed Expert Witness For Contested Valuation Requests; (5) Mandating Use of Forms For Disclosure Statement And Plan; And (6) Establishing Procedure For (A) Motion For Order Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement; And (B) Motion For Order Confirming Plan (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/21/2024 (SC2) |
|
9 | 9
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Thu 03/21 4:23 PM
Order to Appear And File Written Explanation Why Bankruptcy Case Should Not be Dismissed For Being Filed Without Attorney Representation Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9011-2(a) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/21/2024 (SC2) |
|
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Thu 03/21 4:58 PM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 04/25/2024 at 10:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1368 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Vincent Zurzolo (NV) |
||
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Thu 03/21 5:01 PM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 04/25/2024 at 10:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1368 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Vincent Zurzolo (NV) |
||
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 03/15 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/15/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 03/14 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 03/14 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Wed 03/13 3:45 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/19/2024 at 09:00 AM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 6/18/2024. (LL2) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
court
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)
Tue 03/12 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by KC. Receipt Number 22001377. (admin) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 03/12 4:24 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by La Loba De Wall St LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 3/26/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 3/26/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 3/26/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 3/26/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 3/26/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 3/26/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 3/26/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 3/26/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 3/26/2024. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 3/26/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 3/26/2024. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 3/26/2024. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 3/26/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 3/26/2024. (KC2) |