Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Referred: Kathleen L Desoto
Case #: 6:24-cv-00024
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Re-opened:Mar 03, 2025
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 4:44 AM MDT
Defendant
Gregory Gianforte
Represented By
Anita Y. Milanovich
Montana Governor'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Do No Harm
Represented By
Samantha Romero
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Caleb Randall Trotter
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info
Matthew G. Monforton
Monforton Law Offices
contact info
Ethan Blevins
Pacific Legal Foundation
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2024
ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Caleb R. Trotter. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/29/2024. (APP)
GPO Apr 26 2024
Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Judge Morris. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Judge DeSoto. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/26/2024. (APP)
GPO May 08 2024
ORDER granting 22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Samantha Romero. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/8/2024. (APP)
GPO Jan 10 2025
dge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/10/2025. (HMJ)FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gregory Gianforte, 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint filed by Gregory Gianforte. Signed by Magistrate Ju
GPO Feb 05 2025
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 32 IN FULL. Motion to Dismiss 26 is GRANTED. Do No Harm's Amended Complaint 25 is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Governor's Motion to Dismiss 19 the original Complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/5/2025. (MMS)
GPO Feb 05 2025
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (MMS)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 14, 2025
44 44 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM Fri 03/14 2:04 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE re43 Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by Do No Harm. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that proceedings in this case are STAYED to await the Legislature's action on H.B. 215. The parties shall file a status report no later than fourteen days after the end of this years legislative session. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/14/2025. (ACC)
Related: [-]
43 43 motion Stay Fri 03/14 1:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay . Samantha Romero appearing for Plaintiff Do No Harm. (Romero, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
42 42 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/07 3:05 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gregory Gianforte, filed by Do No Harm. (Romero, Samantha) Modified on 3/7/2025 to add "second" to docket text (MMS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
40 40 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 03/03 9:17 AM
TEXT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that37 Clerk's Judgment is hereby WITHDRAWN. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the38 MOTION to Clarify Pursuant to Rule 60(a), or in the Alternative, to Vacate Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) or 60(b) filed by Do No Harm is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/3/2025. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
39 39 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Fri 02/28 12:41 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re38 MOTION to Clarify Pursuant to Rule 60(a), or in the Alternative, to Vacate Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) or 60(b) filed by Do No Harm. (Romero, Samantha)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Clarify - MT Fri 02/28 12:39 PM
MOTION to Clarify Pursuant to Rule 60(a), or in the Alternative, to Vacate Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) or 60(b) . Samantha Romero appearing for Plaintiff Do No Harm. (Romero, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
37 37 misc Judgment - Clerk Wed 02/05 2:29 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (MMS)
Related: [-]
36 36 5 pgs order Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM Order on Findings and Recommendations Wed 02/05 1:29 PM
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS32 IN FULL. Motion to Dismiss26 is GRANTED. Do No Harm's Amended Complaint25 is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Governor's Motion to Dismiss19 the original Complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/5/2025. (MMS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT Tue 02/04 4:36 PM
ORDER re Unopposed34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Objections and for good cause shown, the Court finds the motion should be GRANTED. Defendant shall have to and including February 21, 2025, to file a response to Plaintiff's objections. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/4/2025. (ACC)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/04 4:11 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to33 Objection to Findings and Recommendations . Anita Y. Milanovich appearing for Defendant Gregory Gianforte. (Milanovich, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
33 33 respoth Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM Fri 01/24 5:32 PM
OBJECTION to32 Findings and Recommendations filed by Do No Harm. (Romero, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
32 32 motion Findings and Recommendations - SDM Fri 01/10 3:35 PM
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gregory Gianforte,26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint filed by Gregory Gianforte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/10/2025. (HMJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 07/26 1:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint filed by Gregory Gianforte. (Milanovich, Anita)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/11 2:10 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 7/11/2024. (TXB)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/11 9:18 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint . Anita Y. Milanovich appearing for Defendant Gregory Gianforte. (Milanovich, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, June 28, 2024
28 28 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/28 4:39 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint filed by Do No Harm. (Romero, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
27 27 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Fri 06/07 4:10 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint filed by Gregory Gianforte. (Milanovich, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A: Appointments,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B: HB 424 Introduced,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C: Sample Reports,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D: Plumbers Board
26 26 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM Fri 06/07 4:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint . Anita Y. Milanovich appearing for Defendant Gregory Gianforte. (Milanovich, Anita)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/24 7:50 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gregory Gianforte, filed by Do No Harm. (Blevins, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT Wed 05/15 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Do No Harm re23 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Romero, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT Wed 05/08 1:01 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Samantha Romero. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] . Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 5/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/8/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT Wed 05/08 8:01 AM
MOTION Samantha Romero to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3258063.). Caleb Randall Trotter appearing for Plaintiff Do No Harm. (Trotter, Caleb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Monday, May 06, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Vacating - MT Mon 05/06 9:25 AM
Order Vacating preliminary pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/6/2024. (TXB)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 05/06 9:28 AM
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings. (TXB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
20 20 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Fri 05/03 2:34 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gregory Gianforte. (Milanovich, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A: Appointments,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B: HB 424 Introduced,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C: Sample Reports,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D: Plumbers Board
19 19 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM Fri 05/03 2:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Anita Y. Milanovich appearing for Defendant Gregory Gianforte. (Milanovich, Anita)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Withholding Consent - MT Mon 04/29 2:39 PM
Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Judge Morris. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Judge DeSoto. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/26/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
17 17 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Wed 04/24 12:14 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
16 16 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Thu 04/18 3:11 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/17 11:34 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Second Extension) Gregory Gianforte answer due 5/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/17/2024. (TXB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/16 10:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint (Second Extension) . Anita Y. Milanovich appearing for Defendant Gregory Gianforte. (Milanovich, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
13 13 notice Mailing of Consent - MT Tue 04/09 3:57 PM
Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/23/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/04 10:39 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Gregory Gianforte answer due 4/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/4/2024. (TXB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/03 9:42 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint . Anita Y. Milanovich appearing for Defendant Gregory Gianforte. (Milanovich, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/03 9:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Y. Milanovich on behalf of Gregory Gianforte (Milanovich, Anita)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT Wed 04/03 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Do No Harm re8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Trotter, Caleb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT Fri 03/29 3:28 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Caleb R. Trotter. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] . Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/29/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT Thu 03/28 2:40 PM
MOTION Caleb R. Trotter to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3235391.). Matthew G. Monforton appearing for Plaintiff Do No Harm. (Monforton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Trotter Affidavit
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/28 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Monforton on behalf of Do No Harm (Monforton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 service Proof of Service - MT Tue 03/19 3:13 PM
Proof of Service filed by Do No Harm. Service by hand delivery on 03/14/2024. (Blevins, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/13 11:59 AM
NOTICE by Do No Harm Notice of Interested Parties (Blevins, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
3 3 order Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT Tue 03/12 4:30 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/5/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 6/5/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 6/5/2024. Zoom Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2024 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 3/12/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 03/12 2:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Gregory Gianforte. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (HEG)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - SDM Tue 03/12 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Gregory Gianforte, filed by Do No Harm. (HEG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 03/12 2:46 PM
Filing fee received: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3226615 (HEG)
Related: [-]