Slivas Markets LLC
Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Carlota M Bohm |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-20602 |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2024 |
Debtor
Slivas Markets LLC
4306 Inland Ave
West Mifflin, PA 15122-2226 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Brian P. Cavanaugh
Turin, DeMatt & Cavanaugh, PC 115 North Main Street
Greensburg, PA 15601 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Docket last updated: 03/13/2024 12:03 AM EDT |
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 7
Tue 03/12 2:31 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Slivas Markets LLC Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 03/26/2024. Atty Disclosure Statement due 03/26/2024. Declaration of Schedules due 03/26/2024. Employee Income Record or a statement that there is no record due by 03/26/2024. Schedule A/B due 03/26/2024. Schedule E/F due 03/26/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/26/2024. Summary of schedules due 03/26/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 03/26/2024. (Frye, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29
Tue 03/12 2:32 PM
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Slivas Markets LLC (Frye, Christopher) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Tue 03/12 4:37 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 24-20602 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16664984, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
court
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Tue 03/12 4:48 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing . (dkam) |
|
5 | 5
utility
Update Other Deadlines -BK-
Tue 03/12 7:12 PM
Deadlines Updated . Government Proof of Claim due by 9/9/2024. (mgut) |