Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:24-cv-01056
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause38:4301 U.S. Services Employment/Reemployment Act of 1994
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Federal Express Corporation
Represented By
Timothy Brandon Waddell
Caplan Cobb LLP
contact info
Colleen Wilson
Federal Express Corporation
contact info
M. Tristan Morales
O'Melveny & Myers-Dc
contact info
Emily Carden Snow
Caplan Cobb LLC
contact info
Colleen Hitch Wilson
Federal Express Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Charlinda Williams
Represented By
Matthew Zachary Crotty
Riverside Nw Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Colin M. Downes
Barton & Downes LLP
contact info
Robert Joseph Barton
Barton & Downes LLP
contact info
Thomas Gregory Jarrard
Law Office Of Thomas G. Jarrard, PLLC
contact info
Stephen J. Anderson
Kenneth S. Nugent, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 5:39 PM
NOTICE by Charlinda Williams Notice of Change of Firm of R. Joseph Barton (Barton, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 03/04 9:33 AM
ORDER: The Joint Motion to Stay the Case for an Additional 120 days [Doc. 35] is GRANTED. In order to facilitate settlement discussions, this case is stayed through and including July 1, 2025. Any party is permitted, no earlier than 30 days from the date of this order, to terminate the stay by giving seven days written notice to the other party and the Court. The parties shall file a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan no later than thirty days of the expiration or termination of the stay. The case shall remain administratively closed while the case is pending. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 3/4/25. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
35 35 motion Stay Mon 03/03 5:04 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Reopen the Case & Then Stay the Case for an Additional 120-Days to Facilitate Settlement Discussions by Charlinda Williams. (Barton, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 09/03 10:23 AM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Doc.33 . For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is stayed through and including March 3, 2025. Given the length of the stay, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for docket management purposes. If settlement negotiations fail, the parties need only file a motion to reopen the case before the stay expires. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/3/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 09/03 10:24 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (gww)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
33 33 motion Stay Fri 08/30 4:58 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings to Facilitate Settlement Discussions by Charlinda Williams.(Barton, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 13, 2024
32 32 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/13 10:44 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:28 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 1/13/2025. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/13/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/31 5:34 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Federal Express Corporation. Discovery ends on 10/28/2024.(Waddell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 05/24 1:37 PM
Submission of19 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
30 30 respm Reply Brief Thu 05/23 4:03 PM
REPLY BRIEF re19 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware in Support Thereof filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Waddell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
29 29 discov Certificate of Service Wed 05/22 5:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Defendant's Rule 26(a) Disclosures by Federal Express Corporation.(Waddell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 05/22 5:05 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Waddell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/15 4:26 PM
NOTICE by Charlinda Williams Joint L.R. 23(C)(2) Report (Downes, Colin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/09 4:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware filed by Charlinda Williams.(Downes, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Colin M. Downes,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Travers Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of FedEx Form 10-K,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Ds Responses to 1st Set of Rogs in Travers,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of FedEx People Manual,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of US DC Statistics,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts of Depo Transcript of Oliver from Travers,
Att: 8 Affidavit Declaration of Charlinda Williams
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Wed 05/08 12:26 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Federal Express Corporation.(Waddell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/08 2:51 PM
The25 Consent Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through and including June 12, 2024. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on May 8, 2024. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 05/02 1:59 PM
Clerk's Notation re20 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 05/01 11:56 AM
Plaintiff's24 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue is extended through and including May 9, 2024. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on May 1, 2024. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time Tue 04/30 5:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue with Brief In Support by Charlinda Williams.(Downes, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Colin M. Downes,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/24 12:55 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney Colleen Wilson re Order on Application for Admission PHV. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
23 23 7 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/23 1:24 PM
Consent MOTION Stay Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification Consent Motion Regarding Deadline for Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Charlinda Williams.(Barton, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Tue 04/23 2:39 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:21 APPLICATION for Admission of M. Tristan Morales Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13380744). Attorney M. Tristan Morales added appearing on behalf of Federal Express Corporation. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/23 2:43 PM
The23 Consent Motion Regarding Deadline for Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to file the motion is stayed until after Defendant has answered or otherwise responded to the Complaint and the Court issues a scheduling order. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on April 23, 2024. (jkl)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Tue 04/23 2:47 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:22 APPLICATION for Admission of Colleen Hitch Wilson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13380745).. Attorney Colleen Wilson added appearing on behalf of Federal Express Corporation. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/23 3:01 PM
ORDER granting22 Application for Admission of of Colleen Hitch Wilson Pro Hac Vice and21 Application for Admission of M. Tristan Morales Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on April 23, 2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
22 22 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/22 7:54 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Colleen Hitch Wilson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13380745).by Federal Express Corporation. (Waddell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/22 7:53 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of M. Tristan Morales Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13380744).by Federal Express Corporation. (Waddell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/22 7:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Express Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Fedex Corporation for Federal Express Corporation. (Waddell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Transfer Case Mon 04/22 7:46 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware with Brief In Support by Federal Express Corporation.(Waddell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue,
Att: 2 Declaration of Colleen Hitch Wilson
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/22 7:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Carden Snow on behalf of Federal Express Corporation (Snow, Emily)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/22 7:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Brandon Waddell on behalf of Federal Express Corporation (Waddell, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 03/28 10:37 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charlinda Williams. Federal Express Corporation waiver mailed on 3/13/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Barton, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 03/20 9:13 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:15 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Gregory Jarrard Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13288088). Attorney Thomas Gregory Jarrard added appearing on behalf of Charlinda Williams. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/20 3:41 PM
ORDER granting15 Application for Admission of Thomas Gregory Jarrard Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 3/20/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
15 15 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 1:48 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Gregory Jarrard Pro Hac Vice.by Charlinda Williams. (Anderson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/18 8:48 AM
ORDER granting13 Application for Admission of Matthew Zachary Crotty Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on March 18, 2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Fri 03/15 11:08 AM
RETURN of14 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Gregory Jarrard Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Applicant listed incorrect division on first page of application. Gainesville is listed, but case is in the Atlanta district. (cpp)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 03/15 11:11 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:13 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Zachary Crotty Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13288163).by Charlinda Williams. (Anderson, Stephen). Attorney Matthew Zachary Crotty added appearing on behalf of Charlinda Williams. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
14 14 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 11:27 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Gregory Jarrard Pro Hac Vice.by Charlinda Williams. (Anderson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 11:25 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Zachary Crotty Pro Hac Vice.by Charlinda Williams. (Anderson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 8:26 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Colin M. Downes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13289475).by Charlinda Williams. (Anderson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 8:24 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Joseph Barton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13289458).by Charlinda Williams. (Anderson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Thu 03/14 9:08 AM
RETURN of9 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Gregory Jarrard Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13288088) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Applicant listed incorrect division on first page of application. Please correct and resubmit. (cpp)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Thu 03/14 9:27 AM
RETURN of10 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Zachary Crotty Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13288163) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Applicant listed incorrect case number. Please correct and resubmit. (cpp)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 03/14 9:31 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:11 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Joseph Barton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13289458). Attorney Robert Joseph Barton added appearing on behalf of Charlinda Williams. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 03/14 10:03 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:12 APPLICATION for Admission of Colin M. Downes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13289475). Attorney Colin M. Downes added appearing on behalf of Charlinda Williams. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 3:30 PM
ORDER granting11 Application for Admission of Robert Joseph Barton Pro Hac Vice; granting12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Colin M. Downes. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on March 14, 2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
10 10 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 2:16 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Zachary Crotty Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13288163).by Charlinda Williams. (Anderson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 2:09 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Gregory Jarrard Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13288088).by Charlinda Williams. (Anderson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 03/13 12:18 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Federal Express Corporation. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
7 7 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 03/12 4:20 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Thomas Gregory Jarrard. Clerk to follow-up by 3/22/2024. (esr)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 03/12 4:13 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Robert Joseph Barton. Clerk to follow-up by 3/22/2024. (esr)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 03/12 4:03 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Matthew Zachary Crotty. Clerk to follow-up by 3/22/2024. (esr)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed Summons Tue 03/12 3:50 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Charlinda Williams (Anderson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 03/12 3:20 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Colin M. Downes. Clerk to follow-up by 3/22/2024. (esr)
Related: [-]
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Tue 03/12 10:00 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on March 12, 2024. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 8:29 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13282513) filed by Charlinda Williams.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet