Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 2:24-cv-01076
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 6:54 AM EDT
Defendant
LUCKY BRANDS
Represented By
Michael A. Oropallo
Barclay Damon, LLP
contact info
REX T. REEVES
The Karlin Law Firm LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREW WILKINS
Represented By
DANIEL ZEMEL
Zemel Law LLC
contact info
NICHOLAS J. LINKER
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 09/24 4:33 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/24/24. 9/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/24 1:36 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Lucky Brand by ANDREW WILKINS. (ZEMEL, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 06/18 11:02 AM
ORDER THAT A VIDEO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/25/2024 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 6/17/24. 6/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 05/29 4:11 PM
ORDER THAT THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/7/2024 AT 3:00 PM WILL BE HELD IN ROOM 9613. TRIAL SHALL COMMENCE WITH JURY SELECTION ON 11/20/2024 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 9B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 5/29/24. 5/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 05/23 10:28 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE LATE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/23/24. 5/23/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Fri 05/17 7:38 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. FACT DISCOVERY WILL BE SERVED, NOTICED AND COMPLETED BY 9/30/24. ANY MOTION UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 702 SHALL BE FILED BY 10/15/24. SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION SHALL BE FILED 10/15/24. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ARE DUE BY 10/25/24. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ARE DUE BY 11/1/24. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 11/7/24 AT 3:00 P.M. IN CHAMBERS. THE CASE WILL BE PLACED ON THE COURT'S TRIAL LIST ON 11/15/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/16/24. 5/17/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes Telephone Conference Thu 05/16 11:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON Telephone Conference held on 5/16/24 (JL)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/16 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS J. LINKER on behalf of ANDREW WILKINS (LINKER, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/08 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/16/2024 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON.(mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 04/26 3:00 PM
ORDER THAT THE ORIGINAL MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF REX T. REEVES (DOC NO. 4) IS DENIED AS MOOT, THE RENEWED MOTION (DOC NO. 6) IS GRANTED AND REX T. REEVES, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED IN THIS CASE PRO HAC VICE FOR LUCKY BRANDS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/26/24. 4/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 12:33 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by LUCKY BRANDS.Motion for Admission of Pro Hac Vice.(Oropallo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Reeves Pro Hac Vice Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Pro Hac Vice Order
Monday, March 25, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/25 11:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 7/12/24. ANY MOTION UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 702 SHALL BE FILED BY 9/27/24. ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 9/27/24. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 10/25/24. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE PRETRIAL MEMORANDA BY 11/1/24. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 11/7/24 AT 3:00 PM IN CHAMBERS. THIS CASE WILL BE PLACED ON THE COURT'S TRIAL POOL LIST ON 11/12/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/25/24. 3/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 03/21 5:19 PM
First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17347589.) filed by LUCKY BRANDS.Pro Hac Vice Application.(Oropallo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/19 6:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by LUCKY BRANDS.(Oropallo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/13 5:54 PM
NOTICE by LUCKY BRANDS (Oropallo, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Wed 03/13 9:45 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Both forms are missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Tue 03/12 6:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lucky Brands (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17324829), filed by Lucky Brands.(Oropallo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons Complaint