Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Referred: David L Horan
Case #: 3:24-cv-00595
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:16 AM CDT
Defendant
Chrysler Capital
Represented By
Brent William Martinelli
Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Eli Weingarden
Plaintiff
Monterio Wesco
1137 Harvest Hill Cir
Desoto, TX 75115


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
8 8 order Judgment Wed 11/06 3:18 PM
JUDGMENT - This action came on for consideration by the Court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the motion to dismiss [Dkt. No. 5] is GRANTED and the complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/6/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/06 3:17 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/6/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
6 6 motion Findings and Recommendations Fri 10/18 10:03 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re:5 Motion to Dismiss. The Court should grant the motion to dismiss and, unless Plaintiff Monterio Wesco shows through timely objections a basis to amend the complaint to allege a plausible claim, the Court should dismiss this lawsuit with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/17/2024) (cfk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss Thu 04/18 4:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Chrysler Capital Attorney Brent William Martinelli added to party Chrysler Capital(pty:dft) (Martinelli, Brent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 03/13 3:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Chrysler Capital. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
3 3 cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Chrysler Capital, Eli Weingarden filed by Monterio J Wesco. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number 300010781) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (kcr)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Tue 03/12 9:46 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (kcr)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Kinkeade Tue 03/12 9:46 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]