Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-50022
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 12:20 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Nicole Lynn Hicks (1)
Terminated: 03/11/2024


Docket last updated: 03/13/2024 12:56 AM MST
Monday, March 11, 2024
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervision of Releasee Nicole Lynn Hicks. Copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet from District of Montana attached.(KAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket report,
Att: 2 Indictment,
Att: 3 Judgment