Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-01053
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 13, 2024 2:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Jorge Camacho-Olivas (1)
Represented By
Edgar H. Holguin
Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/13/2024 3:11 AM CDT
Saturday, March 09, 2024
Arrest of Jorge Camacho-Olivas (bot4)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
1 1 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Patricia Aguayo appearing for USA. . Attorney Patricia Aguayo added to party USA(pty:pla) (Aguayo, Patricia)
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower as to Jorge Camacho-Olivas. (bot4)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jorge Camacho-Olivas. (bot4)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jorge Camacho-Olivas. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (bot4)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Jorge Camacho-Olivas. Signed by Judge Leon Schydlower. (bot4)
Related: [-]
6 6 Proceedings held before Judge Leon Schydlower:Initial Appearance as to Jorge Camacho-Olivas held on 3/11/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 3/25/2024 08:30AM before Judge Leon Schydlower, SPANISH Language Interpreter (L. Quevedo) required as to Jorge Camacho-Olivas (Court Reporter ERO.) (bot4)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Jorge Camacho-Olivas. By Judge Leon Schydlower. (bot4)
Related: [-]