Oregon District Court
Judge:Stacie F Beckerman
Case #: 3:24-cv-00456
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 4:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Jason Caruth
Represented By
Tracy Ickes White
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Marc Abrams
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
David Farris
Represented By
Tracy Ickes White
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Marc Abrams
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Kathleen Harder
Represented By
Tracy Ickes White
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Marc Abrams
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Ali Mageehon
Represented By
Tracy Ickes White
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Marc Abrams
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Oregon Medical Board
Represented By
Tracy Ickes White
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Marc Abrams
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Jill Shaw
Represented By
Tracy Ickes White
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Marc Abrams
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven LaTulippe
Represented By
Stephen J. Joncus
Joncus Law P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Mon 05/12 3:12 PM
Corrected Notice of Supplemental Authority re Notice of Supplemental Authority30 Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority with Active Link Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (Abrams, Marc)
Related: [-] Notice of Supplemental Authority30 .
Thursday, May 08, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Thu 05/08 1:37 PM
Notice of Supplemental Authority re Notice of Supplemental Authority30 Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (Abrams, Marc)
Related: [-] Notice of Supplemental Authority30 .
30 30 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Thu 05/08 12:24 PM
Notice of Supplemental Authority re Memorandum in Opposition19 Filed by Steven LaTulippe. Related [+] (Joncus, Stephen)
Related: [-] Memorandum in Opposition19 .
Monday, March 31, 2025
29 29 resp Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation Mon 03/31 1:37 PM
Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Related document(s):28 Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Filed by All Defendants. (Abrams, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
28 28 resp Objections to Findings & Recommendation Tue 03/18 10:57 PM
Objections to Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (ECF No. 11) 15 should be GRANTED24 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Steven LaTulippe. (Joncus, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Objection to F & R Wed 03/12 11:26 AM
ORDER: Finding good cause, Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Findings and Recommendation, ECF26 , is GRANTED. Objections, if any, to the Findings and Recommendation, ECF24 , are due on or before March 18, 2025. If objections are filed, any response is due on or before April 14, 2025. If no objections are filed, the F&R will be taken under advisement on March 18, 2025. Ordered on March 12, 2025 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (gw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response to Objection to F & R Tue 03/11 4:10 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Objection to Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (ECF No. 11) 15 should be GRANTED24 . Filed by All Defendants. (Abrams, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
25 25 order Findings & Recommendation Referred Tue 03/04 4:48 PM
ORDER referring Findings and Recommendation (ECF No.24 ) and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (ECF No. 11) (ECF No.15 ) to Judge Immergut. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Findings & Recommendation Tue 03/04 4:45 PM
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons stated, the Court recommends that the district judge GRANT Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No.15 ), and DISMISS LaTulippe's amended complaint with leave to amend to the extent LaTulippe can in good faith cure the pleading deficiencies discussed above. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 3/18/2025. Signed on 3/4/2025 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
23 23 minute Motion Hearing Held Thu 01/16 4:41 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral Argument held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (ECF No.11 ) (ECF No.15 ) on 1/16/2025. The motion is argued and taken under advisement as of 1/16/2025. Stephen J. Joncus present as counsel for plaintiff. Marc Abrams present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway, (503) 326-8188. presiding. (gw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
22 22 order Order Mon 01/13 5:11 PM
ORDER instructing the parties to prepare to address at the January 16, 2025, oral argument (in addition to the issues briefed by the parties), any preclusive effect on this lawsuit of the plaintiff's state court proceedings in LaTulippe v. Oregon Medical Board. See, e.g., Holcombe v. Hosmer, 477 F.3d 1094, 1097 (9th Cir. 2007) ("It is now settled that a federal court must give to a state-court judgment the same preclusive effect as would be given that judgment under the law of the State in which the judgment was rendered under the Constitution's Full Faith and Credit Clause and under 28 U.S.C. § 1738.") (simplified); see also Brimstone Nat. Res. Co. v. Haight, No. 22-35187 2023 WL 4030191, at *1 (9th Cir. June 15, 2023) ("Under Oregon law, claim preclusion applies to administrative proceedings, and prevents a party from pursuing further litigation on a claim 'on any ground or theory of relief that the party could have litigated in the first instance[.]' ") (citations omitted). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
21 21 order 1 - Scheduling Tue 12/03 3:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (ECF No. 11 ) (ECF No.15 ): Oral Argument is set for Thursday, January 16, 2025 at 2:30 PM in Portland Courtroom 13B before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
20 20 resp Reply to Motion Fri 10/18 11:08 AM
Reply Memorandum of Law to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (ECF No. 11) 15 . Filed by All Defendants. (Abrams, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
19 19 28 pgs resp Memorandum in Opposition Tue 10/01 11:52 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (ECF No. 11) 15 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Steven LaTulippe. (Joncus, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Fri 09/20 12:12 PM
ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No.17 ). Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.15 ) is due by 10/1/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Thu 09/19 9:11 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (ECF No. 11) 15 . Filed by Steven LaTulippe. (Joncus, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
16 16 notice Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 09/10 4:23 PM
Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Tracy Ickes White Filed by All Defendants. (Abrams, Marc)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Tue 09/10 10:41 AM
Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (ECF No. 11) . Filed by All Defendants. (Abrams, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 08/22 9:55 AM
ORDER: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No.13 ). Answer or other responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint (ECF No.11 ) is due by 9/26/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time Wed 08/21 3:58 PM
Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by All Defendants. (White, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 08/19 2:26 PM
ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No.11 ), Finding as Moot Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.8 ) the original Complaint (ECF No.1 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES) Fri 08/16 10:07 PM
Amended Complaint . Filed by Steven LaTulippe against All Defendants. (Joncus, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Fri 07/26 9:07 AM
Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support 8 . Filed by All Defendants. (Abrams, Marc)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Fri 07/26 9:03 AM
Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support . Filed by Jill Shaw, David Farris, Kathleen Harder, Oregon Medical Board, Jason Caruth, Ali Mageehon. (Abrams, Marc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Fri 07/26 9:23 AM
ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No.9 ). Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.8 ) is due by 9/3/2024. Defendant's Reply is due by 9/18/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
7 7 service Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service Wed 06/05 4:04 PM
Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service of Complaint,1 on All Defendants Filed by All Defendants. (Abrams, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 06/04 3:26 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Jason Caruth, David Farris, Kathleen Harder, Ali Mageehon, Oregon Medical Board, Jill Shaw. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (dino)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed Summons Tue 06/04 11:59 AM
Proposed Summons Filed by Steven LaTulippe. (Joncus, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
4 4 oth_doc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/14 9:24 AM
Amended Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,1 . Filed by Steven LaTulippe. (Joncus, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
3 3 oth_doc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/13 6:23 PM
Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,1 . Filed by Steven LaTulippe. (Joncus, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Wed 03/13 8:50 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/11/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/12/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 8/12/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 7:51 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9319989 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Steven Arthur LaTulippe against All Defendants. (Joncus, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet