Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael S Nachmanoff
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:24-cv-00398
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024
Case in other court:Fairfax County Circuit Court, CL-24-02268
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Joshua Moser
Fairfax, VA 22033
Represented By
Kimberly Pace Baucom
Fairfax County Office Of The County Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffery Payne
3063 Patrick Henry Drive Apt 202
Falls Church, VA 22044
Represented By
Andrew Omar Clarke
District Legal Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
59 59 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 12/18 12:34 PM
USCA Case Number 24-2237 Fourth Circuit, Case Manager Shari A. Batchleor for57 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffery Payne. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
58 58 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA Tue 12/17 3:40 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re57 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
57 57 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 12/13 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jeffery Payne. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AVAEDC-9901312. (Clarke, Andrew)
Related: [-]