Zarco v. Book and Ladder, LLC
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | John W Broomes |
Referred: | Angel D Mitchell |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02091 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 3:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
Book and Ladder, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brittany Zarco
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Book and Ladder, LLC re:30 Motion for Summary Judgment,,,(Davey, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, February 21, 2025 | ||
31 | 31
![]() MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Brittany Zarco re30 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support (Todd, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Friday, January 31, 2025 | ||
30 | 30
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Book and Ladder, LLC(Davey, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 22, 2025 | ||
29 | 29
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED Dispositive motion deadline 1/31/2025. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2025 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom (Unknown) before District Judge John W. Broomes. Estimated trial time 4 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 1/21/2025. (sz) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answers and Objections to Defendant's Second Interrogatories by Brittany Zarco. (Todd, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Final ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 01/14 2:22 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE was held on 1/14/2025. As discussed in further detail on the record, the parties must resubmit their draft pretrial order in Word format as an attachment to an email sent to ksd_mitchell_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov, by January 21, 2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() NOTICE OF SERVICE by Book and Ladder, LLC of Second Set of Interrogatories (Davey, Danielle) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 11/19 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGED CONFERENCE CALL NUMBER FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES AND HEARINGS WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE ANGEL D. MITCHELL. Judge Mitchell's conference call number has changed. From this date on, please use only 913-423-1010, Conference ID 172 480 243 , for all telephonic conferences and hearings with Judge Mitchell. Previous orders have directed the parties to call 888-363-4749 for conferences and hearings. From this date, do NOT call 888-363-4749 for any conferences or hearings with Judge Mitchell. (alh) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE OF SERVICE by Brittany Zarco of Plaintiff's Second Requests for Production (Todd, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiff Brittany Zarco of taking deposition of Matt Peters on 11/13/2024(Todd, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 30, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() NOTICE by Defendant Book and Ladder, LLC of taking deposition of Brittany Zarco on November 7, 2024 (Davey, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE by Plaintiff Brittany Zarco of taking deposition of Matt Peters on November 8, 2024 (Todd, Kevin) |
|
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE by Plaintiff Brittany Zarco of taking deposition of Cayce Lay on November 8, 2024 (Todd, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Service by Brittany Zarco. (Todd, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 09/10 7:30 PM
ORDER regarding mediation. Having reviewed the parties' confidential settlement reports, the court finds that mediation is unlikely to be a productive use of time in the near term. The court therefore vacates the October 31 mediation deadline, but encourages the parties to continue to explore the possibility of settlement. The court revisit the issue of court-ordered mediation with the parties in connection with the pretrial conference if they have not resolved the case by then. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/10/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(alh) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE OF SERVICE by Book and Ladder, LLC of Discovery Responses (Davey, Danielle) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() PROTECTIVE ORDER granting15 Joint Motion for Protective Order. With minor, non-substantive revisions, the court enters the proposed order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/19/2024. (bal) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Brittany Zarco (Todd, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/12/2024. (kas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Protective Order
Fri 08/09 8:21 AM
Joint Motion Requesting the Entry of a Protective Order. In accordance with the Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders, the parties jointly moved for the entry of a protective order by emailing a copy of their proposed order to the Magistrate Judge's chambers on August 8, 2024. (alh) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE OF SERVICE by Book and Ladder, LLC of Discovery Requests (Davey, Danielle) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Service Plaintiff's 1st Interrogatories and RFP by Brittany Zarco. (Todd, Kevin) |
|
10 | 10
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 9/6/2024. Mediation deadline 10/31/2024. Discovery deadline 12/20/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2025 at 01:30 AM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Dispositive motion deadline 1/31/2025. The parties expect the jury trial of this case to take approximately 4-5 trial days. The court will subsequently set this case for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/25/2024. (ca) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 07/25 1:46 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE was held on 7/25/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2024 at 01:30 PM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/5/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/15/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 7/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/10/24. (msb) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Book and Ladder, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Davey, Danielle) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ANSWER to Complaint by Book and Ladder, LLC.(Davey, Danielle) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/22/2024 for Defendant Book and Ladder, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/8/2024. (jsh) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Danielle N. Davey on behalf of Book and Ladder, LLC. (Davey, Danielle) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Brittany Zarco upon Book and Ladder, LLC served on 3/18/2024, answer due 4/8/2024 (Todd, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Brittany Zarco. (Todd, Kevin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6297414.), filed by Brittany Zarco.(Todd, Kevin) |
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 03/13 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/13 11:46 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Book and Ladder, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac) |