Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-25443

Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Rachel M Blise
Case #: 2:24-ap-02036
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Amy Christine Isbell
21200 West Barton Road
New Berlin, WI 53146
Represented By
Michael J. Watton
contact info
Plaintiff
State Of Wisconsin
Department Of Workforce Development 201 East Washington Avenue P.O. Box 8942
Madison, WI 53708
Represented By
Christine L. Galinat
Wisconsin Department Of Workforce Development
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Friday, March 29, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/29 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 03/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Stipulation
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/29 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 03/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Judgment
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/27 4:34 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2036 Closed. (jah, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 03/27 4:30 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-2036 Order on Stipulation. (jah, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Judgment Wed 03/27 4:28 PM
Entry of Judgment. (jah, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 03/27 4:26 PM
Order for Judgment Related [+]. (jah, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 03/27/2024)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
6 6 misc Proposed Order Wed 03/27 12:40 PM
Proposed Order (Agreed to by the Parties) RE:5 - Stipulation filed by Attorney Christine L. Galinat of Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development on behalf of State Of Wisconsin. (Galinat, Christine)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 03/27 12:38 PM
Stipulation By State Of Wisconsin and Amy Christine Isbell Filed by State Of Wisconsin Related [+] (Galinat, Christine)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff State Of Wisconsin
Thursday, March 14, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/14 4:40 PM
Summons Service Executed on Atty. Michael J. Watton and Amy Christine Isbell 3/14/2024 Related [+] (Galinat, Christine)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Electronic Summons Issued
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
3 3 court Electronic Summons Issued Wed 03/13 10:21 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004, and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer Due by 4/12/2024. United States and its offices and agencies answer due by 4/17/2024. (abg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 03/12 2:16 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-02036 rmb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22603046. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+] . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 2:13 PM
Adversary case 24-02036 Complaint by State Of Wisconsin (attorney Christine L. Galinat) against Amy Christine Isbell. Fee Amount $350 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud))(Galinat, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C