Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Mia Roberts Perez
Case #: 2:24-cv-01094
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
RUDOLPH MANAGEMENT, LTD.
Represented By
Armin Ghiam
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CLARK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.
Represented By
MELANIE A. MILLER
Cozen O'Connor
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/02 10:42 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by CLARK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.. (MILLER, MELANIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 06/12 8:42 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME,10 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN JULY 3, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 6/12/24.6/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 06/11 9:34 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by RUDOLPH MANAGEMENT, LTD..Letter.(Ghiam, Armin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/14 8:21 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED LETTER MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME,8 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN JUNE 13, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 5/13/24. 5/14/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 12, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Sun 05/12 8:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by RUDOLPH MANAGEMENT, LTD..Letter Motion.(Ghiam, Armin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 04/22 6:43 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by RUDOLPH MANAGEMENT, LTD., RUDOLPH MANAGEMENT, LTD..(Ghiam, Armin)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/22 6:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Armin Ghiam on behalf of RUDOLPH MANAGEMENT, LTD., RUDOLPH MANAGEMENT, LTD. (Ghiam, Armin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/15 5:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CLARK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.. RUDOLPH MANAGEMENT, LTD. waiver sent on 3/15/2024, answer due 5/14/2024. (MILLER, MELANIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/14 10:09 AM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. THE PARTIES SHALL CONDUCT SUBSTANTIVE VERBAL COMMUNICATIONS. EXCHANGES OF LETTERS OR EMAILS ARE INSUFFICIENT. A REPORT THAT OPPOSING COUNSEL WAS NOT AVAILABLE OR THAT THE PARTIES MADE REASONABLE EFFORTS IS LIKEWISE INSUFFICIENT. IF THE PARTIES CANNOT REACH A RESOLUTION THAT ELIMINATES THE NEED FOR ANY OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED MOTIONS, COUNSEL FOR THE MOVING PARTY SHALL INCLUDE, ALONG WITH THE MOTION, A CERTIFICATION THAT THE PARTIES MET AND CONFERRED REGARDING THE ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR MATTER SOUGHT TO BE STRICKEN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 3/14/24. 3/14/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP.(bw)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 03/14 7:52 AM
Summons Issued as to RUDOLPH MANAGEMENT, LTD.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/14/24 (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 03/13 2:26 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CLARK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC..(MILLER, MELANIE)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 03/13 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT against RUDOLPH MANAGEMENT, LTD. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17327069.), filed by CLARK CAPITAL MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC..(MILLER, MELANIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Designation Form