Grimmett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01151 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
notice
(SSA 3) Clerk's Final Notice Re: General Order 22-04
Thu 03/28 12:56 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to[LINK:S.D. Ohio General Order 22-04] , there is no unanimous consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to randomly assign this case to a resident District Judge. (jmb) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 03/28 12:58 PM
Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry added. (jmb) |
||
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/14 8:18 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Amy M. Grimmett. (jmb) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/14 8:17 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . In accordance with the Southern District of Ohio Civil Rule 8.1, the Commissioner shall file and serve a certified copy of the administrative record within sixty (60) days after filing of the Social Security Identification Form, which copy shall function as the Answer. Plaintiff must file a Statement of Errors within forty-five (45) days after filing of the administrative record setting forth the bases upon which reversal or remand is sought. The Commissioner must file and serve a Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of Errors within forty-five (45) days after service of the Statement of Errors. Plaintiff's Reply, if any, must be filed fifteen (15) days after the memorandum in opposition is filed. All briefing must include references to the administrative record. All documents filed electronically must be filed in optical character recognition (OCR) text-searchable PDF format. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 03/14/2024. (jmb) |
|
4 | 4
notice
(SSA 2) Statement As To MJ Jurisdiction Form
Thu 03/14 8:08 AM
Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Jurisdiction Form shall be completed and emailed to the Court's Social Security Case Coordinator at, SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov or mailed to: Office of the Clerk Walter H. Rice Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse Room 712 Attn: Social Security Coordinator 200 W. Second Street Dayton, Ohio 45402 DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE THIS DOCUMENT, IT MUST BE MAILED TO THE ABOVE ADDRESS OR EMAILED TO SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov . The completed Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form due by 4/15/2024 (jmb) |
|
3 | 3
notice
(SSA 1) Clerk's Notice Re: General Order 22-04
Thu 03/14 8:06 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE and GENERAL ORDER 22-04: Pursuant to[LINK:S.D. Ohio General Order 22-04] , if no party indicates that they are withholding their consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will remain with the assigned Magistrate Judge for all matters, including entry of a final judgment. Further, the filing of a party's statement of errors or memorandum in opposition without first filing an executed copy of the Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form will also be deemed as consent by that party to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction over all aspects of the litigation, including entry of a final judgment. (jmb) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 03/14 8:20 AM
Set Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security shall file the electronic certified administrative record and answer or respond to the Complaint by 5/13/2024. (jmb) |
||
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/13 4:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Amy M. Grimmett. (Farrell, Clifford) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint |