Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:W Scott Hardy
Case #: 2:24-cv-00329
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:Jun 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
SURTERRA HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By
Joshua Horn
Fox Rothschild
contact info
Plaintiff
VITMORE BAUM HOLDINGS, LP
Represented By
Jason M. Yarbrough
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott LLP
contact info
Kate E. McCarthy
Meyer, Unkovic & Scott LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, June 13, 2024
18 18 order Judgment - Consent Thu 06/13 12:31 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT indicating that, upon consent of the parties, it is hereby ordered that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Vitmore Baum Holdings, LP, as successor-in-interest to Ollie PA 5522 Baum, LLC and against Defendant Surterra Holdings, Inc. in the amount of Two Million Sixteen Thousand Three Hundred and Sixty-Six Dollars and Seventy-Three Cents ($2,016,366.73). Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 6/13/24. (lwp)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Thu 06/13 10:53 AM
ORDER OF COURT indicating that the parties'16 Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment is hereby granted. Accordingly, the Consent Judgment submitted by the parties (Docket No. 16-1) will be entered in this matter. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 6/13/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lwp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Approve Consent Judgment Tue 06/11 3:27 PM
MOTION Judgment , Consent MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by VITMORE BAUM HOLDINGS, LP. (Yarbrough, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, May 30, 2024
15 15 order Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order Thu 05/30 1:52 PM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is set for 6/24/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge W. Scott Hardy. The Parties' Rule 26(f) Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting an ADR Process and Neutral are due on or before 6/17/2024. The parties shall refer to Docket No.14 for dial-in information. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 5/30/2024. (kas)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice - Telephonic Conference (Microsoft Teams) Thu 05/30 1:52 PM
MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted before Judge Hardy will be via a Microsoft Teams Audio Conferencing call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide a conference ID. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (kas)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Thu 05/30 9:15 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying SH PARENT, INC. as corporate parent or other affiliate by SURTERRA HOLDINGS, INC.. (Horn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Thu 05/30 9:12 AM
Disclosure Statement declaring citizenship by SURTERRA HOLDINGS, INC. (Horn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/29 3:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by SURTERRA HOLDINGS, INC.. (Horn, Joshua)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Request for Default Wed 05/29 12:50 PM
REQUEST by VITMORE BAUM HOLDINGS, LP for entry of DEFAULT against SURTERRA HOLDINGS, INC. . (Yarbrough, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit for Entry of Default
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/10 11:33 AM
ORDER on Motions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b). See Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 4/10/2024. (kas)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice of ADR Designation Wed 04/10 11:33 AM
NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. The Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the Stipulation of Selecting an ADR process and Neutral. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing Defendant(s)) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
7 7 order Order Reassigning Case Thu 04/04 2:43 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/4/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/04 2:55 PM
Judge W. Scott Hardy added. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/03 1:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VITMORE BAUM HOLDINGS, LP. (McCarthy, Kate)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Wed 04/03 1:07 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by VITMORE BAUM HOLDINGS, LP. SURTERRA HOLDINGS, INC. (McCarthy, Kate) Incorrect event used; refiled at6 and answer due date updated. Document hidden from public view. Modified text on 4/3/2024. (jkn)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 04/03 1:38 PM
Judge Joy Flowers Conti presiding. (cww)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 04/03 1:39 PM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from SURTERRA HOLDINGS, INC. on 5/28/2024 (cww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 03/19 9:46 AM
Disclosure Statement, declaring citizenship by VITMORE BAUM HOLDINGS, LP. (McCarthy, Kate)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Fri 03/15 9:11 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by VITMORE BAUM HOLDINGS, LP. (McCarthy, Kate)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/14 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kate E. McCarthy on behalf of VITMORE BAUM HOLDINGS, LP. (McCarthy, Kate)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Thu 03/14 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT against SURTERRA HOLDINGS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8161259), filed by VITMORE BAUM HOLDINGS, LP. (jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Thu 03/14 4:13 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re2 Notice of Appearance,1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying both all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public AND citizenship as required pursuant to both LR 7.1.A and FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 3/20/2024. (cel)
Related: [-]