Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Clifton L Corker
Referred: Jill E Mccook
Case #: 3:24-cv-00116
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 5:13 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory C Logue
Woolf, Mcclane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Lindy Degnan Harris
Woolf, Mcclane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Eternal Beverages, Inc.
Represented By
James R Stovall
Ritchie, Dillard, Davies & Johnson, P.C.
contact info
Wayne A Ritchie, II
Ritchie, Dillard, Davies & Johnson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory C Logue
Woolf, Mcclane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Lindy Degnan Harris
Woolf, Mcclane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eternal Beverages, Inc.
Represented By
James R Stovall
Ritchie, Dillard, Davies & Johnson, P.C.
contact info
Wayne A Ritchie, II
Ritchie, Dillard, Davies & Johnson, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
33 33 misc Transcript Tue 09/03 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 7, 2024, before Judge Corker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen Bradley, Telephone number (423)639-3918. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at[LINK:http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/24/2024 . Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2024 . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2024 . (KJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
32 32 7 pgs order Scheduling Order Tue 08/27 10:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 12/16/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker. The estimated length of trial is three (3) days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2025 01:30 PM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/27/24. (ABF) Modified on 8/27/2024 to add days of trial(KDO).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 08/14 2:46 PM
ORDER: The parties have filed their Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Report [Doc. 24]. A telephonic scheduling conference is hereby set for Tuesday, August 27, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. EST. The parties shall call the Courts conference line at 866-390-1828 and enter access code 4845352 at the appointed time.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/14/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
30 30 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Wed 08/14 2:43 PM
MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: Eternals Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. 17] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/14/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
29 29 trial Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY) Wed 08/07 3:18 PM
Exhibit and Witness List Custody of Exhibits: All exhibits that pertain to Motion hearing returned to the offering party at the conclusion of the proceeding. Advisory Notice - At the conclusion of the trial or proceedings, pursuant to LR43.3, the offering party shall retain custody of exhibits and be responsible to the Court for preserving them until any appeal is concluded or the time for appeal has expired . Related document:28 Motion Hearing.(KDO)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 08/07 3:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Clifton L Corker: Motion Hearing held on 8/7/2024 re17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Eternal Beverages, Inc. Advisory Notice: At the conclusion of the trial or proceedings, pursuant to LR43.3, the offering party shall retain custody of exhibits and be responsible to the Court for preserving them until any appeal is concluded or the time for appeal has expired . Order to enter. (Court Reporter Karen Bradley) (KDO)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/07 10:45 AM
NOTICE by Eternal Beverages, Inc. re26 Stipulation, of Corrected Exhibit 12 to Document 26 Joint Stipulation of Documents(Stovall, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/7/2024 to fix pdf error causing document to not open) (JCK). (JCK).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Corrected Version of Exhibit 12
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
26 26 2 pgs misc Stipulation Tue 08/06 8:07 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Documents: exhibits for evidentiary hearing on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction by Eternal Beverages, Inc..(Stovall, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 30 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 11 pgs Exhibit 12
Thursday, August 01, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 08/01 8:30 AM
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/1/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
24 24 5 pgs misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 06/12 5:33 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stovall, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
23 23 11 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/23 8:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Eternal Beverages, Inc.. (Stovall, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
22 22 24 pgs respm Response to Motion Thu 05/16 3:18 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc..(Harris, Lindy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Interim Water Supply Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Test Results,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-English Mountain correspondence February 7, 2024,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-English Mountain correspondence February 16, 2024,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-December 18, 2023 email correspondence between counsel,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6-February 2, 2024 correspondence redlined Long-Term Water Supply Agreement
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
21 21 5 pgs answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 05/15 7:36 PM
ANSWER to12 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Eternal Beverages, Inc..(Stovall, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
20 20 20 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 05/03 1:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Eternal Beverages, Inc.. (Stovall, James)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Fri 05/03 1:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Mark Hostetter filed by Eternal Beverages, Inc..(Stovall, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Resume,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Assured Bio Labs Reports,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Microbac Lab Reports
18 18 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Fri 05/03 1:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Trygve Morkemo filed by Eternal Beverages, Inc..(Stovall, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agreement
17 17 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 05/03 1:50 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Eternal Beverages, Inc.. (Stovall, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
16 16 2 pgs notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Tue 04/30 11:04 AM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc. (Harris, Lindy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
15 15 1 pgs misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Mon 04/29 11:05 AM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc.. (Harris, Lindy)
Related: [-]
14 14 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 04/29 8:41 AM
ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conference unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED : 1. As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 04/29/2024. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Fri 04/26 1:15 PM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 4/26/2024. (MKM)
Related: [-]
12 12 20 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 04/26 12:22 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Eternal Beverages, Inc. by English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc..(Harris, Lindy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 39 pgs Exhibit 1-EMSW correspondence 2-7-24,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit 2-EMSW correspondence 2-16-24,
Att: 3 9 pgs Exhibit 3-Interim Water Supply Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Long-Term Water Supply Agreement
notice Notice of Failure to File CCI Fri 04/26 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed (non-USA) Fri 03/22 2:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eternal Beverages, Inc.. English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc. served on 3/20/2024. (Stovall, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 03/21 11:09 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc.. (Logue, Gregory)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/21 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindy Degnan Harris on behalf of English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc. (Harris, Lindy)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/21 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Logue on behalf of English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc. (Logue, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Thu 03/14 3:02 PM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by Eternal Beverages, Inc. (KSH) (KSH)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Citizenship Thu 03/14 2:31 PM
Certificate of Citizenship by Eternal Beverages, Inc.. (Stovall, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Thu 03/14 12:30 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 3/14/24. (KSH)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Thu 03/14 12:29 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 3/14/24. (KSH)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Thu 03/14 12:28 PM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 3/14/24. (KSH)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/14 12:27 PM
Summons Issued as to English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc. (KSH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File Certificate of Citizenship Thu 03/14 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Eternal Beverages, Inc.. (KSH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 2:23 PM
COMPLAINT against English Mountain Spring Water Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5622226.), filed by Eternal Beverages, Inc..(Stovall, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Summons TO BE ISSUED,
Att: 3 Other Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 1 pgs Other Corporate Disclosure Statement
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/14 12:20 PM
District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (KSH)
Related: [-]