California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-02041
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:Jan 17, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 24STCV03425
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 1:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Vestis Services, LLC
Represented By
Mark Franklin Lovell
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Vanoohi Torossian
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Aramark Uniform and Career Apparel, LLC
Represented By
Mark Franklin Lovell
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Vanoohi Torossian
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Eric Sutton
Represented By
Zachariah E Moura
Loyr Apc
contact info
Harley Macondray Phleger
Loyr Apc
contact info
Kee Seok Mah
Loyr, Apc
contact info
Young W Ryu
Loyr Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 17, 2025
25 25 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/17 2:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL24 . The parties stipulate to dismiss the case pursuant to a settlement agreement. They ask the Court to retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement. The stipulation is DENIED. Federal courts have no inherent power to enforce settlement agreements after dismissal. On its own motion, the Court dismisses the action without prejudice based on the parties' representation that the case has settled. All hearings and deadlines are vacated. The Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and reopen the action within 45 days upon a request supported by a showing of good cause why the settlement cannot be completed within the 45-day period, explaining what further settlement processes are necessary and when the party or parties making the request reasonably expect the process to be concluded. This Order does not preclude the parties from filing a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, which does not require the approval of the Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A). Such a stipulation shall be filed within 45 days unless otherwise ordered by the Court pursuant to a stipulation of the parties supported by good cause. Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
24 24 stip Dismiss Case Wed 01/15 9:40 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to case settled filed by Defendant Vestis Services, LLC.(Torossian, Vanoohi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/15 5:44 PM
Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Designation of Expert Witnesses filed by Plaintiff Eric Sutton. (Mah, Kee Seok)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
20 20 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 10/01 3:06 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Stipulation for Protective Order19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Judge Kim requires a redline version in Microsoft Word format to be emailed to Chambers. The parties are directed to provide the required redline as soon as possible. Further details regarding Judge Kim's procedures can be found here: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-steve-kim. (hr)
Related: [-]
19 19 stip Protective Order Tue 10/01 9:22 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Aramark Uniform and Career Apparel, LLC, Vestis Services, LLC.(Torossian, Vanoohi)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
18 18 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Mon 05/20 11:59 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 27, 2025. (gga)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Mon 05/20 11:56 AM
ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2025 at 2:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 4/22/2025 at 8:30 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. See document for additional pretrial dates and deadlines. (gga)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form Mon 05/20 11:22 AM
MINUTES of Scheduling Conference held before Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court confers with counsel regarding the status of the case. The Court has reviewed the parties' April 29, 2024 Joint Report is inclined to adopt their proposed pretrial and trial schedule. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Young Ryu. Attorney for Defendant(s): Mark Lovell. Courtroom Deputy: Lynnie Fahey. Time in Court: 06 mins. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (gga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
15 15 order For Order Wed 05/08 3:53 PM
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR CO-COUNSEL TO APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IN LIEU OF LEAD COUNSEL12 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc)
Related: [-]
14 14 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 05/08 3:36 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Due to the Court's unavailability on May 13, 2024, the Court continues the Scheduling Conference to May 20, 2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 05/08 9:32 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document12 by Defendant Vestis Services, LLC. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request: Order. The incorrect event does NOT seek the relief sought..."request for co-counsel to appear at scheduling conference in lieu of lead counsel". Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
12 12 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 05/07 12:35 PM
Request for Co-Counsel to Appear at Scheduling Conference in Lieu of Lead Counsel filed by Defendant Vestis Services, LLC(Torossian, Vanoohi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 29, 2024
11 11 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 04/29 3:07 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Eric Sutton.. (Phleger, Harley)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
10 10 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 03/18 10:51 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Aramark Uniform and Career Apparel, LLC, Vestis Services, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 , Notice of Related Case(s)4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,2 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form6 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only8 served on March 15, 2024. (Torossian, Vanoohi)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 03/15 8:12 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 03/15 8:10 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 03/14 5:53 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 03/14 5:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 03/14 5:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Wed 03/13 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC, Vestis Services, LLC. Related Case(s): None (Torossian, Vanoohi)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/13 2:41 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC, Vestis Services, LLC identifying Vestis Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Torossian, Vanoohi)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/13 2:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC, Vestis Services, LLC, identifying Eric Sutton, Vestis Services, LLC, formerly known as Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC; Vestis Group, Inc.; Vestis Corporation. (Torossian, Vanoohi)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/13 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV03425 Receipt No: ACACDC-37087397 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendants Vestis Services, LLC, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. (Attorney Vanoohi Torossian added to party Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Vanoohi Torossian added to party Vestis Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Torossian, Vanoohi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Answer,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Declaration of Mark F. Lovell,
Att: 5 Declaration of Mikaela Davis,
Att: 6 Declaration of James Harrison
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 03/14 6:01 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aramark Uniform and Career Apparel, LLC, Does, Vestis Services, LLC, Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Eric Sutton. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/9/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ]. (et)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Thu 03/14 6:03 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Vestis Services, LLC formerly known as Aramark Uniform and Career Apparel, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/12/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ]. (et)
Related: [-]