Colorado District Court
Judge:Daniel D Domenico
Case #: 1:24-cv-00685
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Case in other court:Boulder County District Court, 2023CV31135
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 2:17 AM MDT
Defendant
American National Red Cross Association, The
Represented By
Amy Theresa Johnson
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Trevor Schrader
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley
Represented By
Amy Theresa Johnson
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Trevor Schrader
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Peter C. Middleton
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Christopher Thomas Brousseau
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Ketter
Represented By
Jared Joseph Mazzei
Ramos Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 04/23 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance as Counsel for Plaintiff by Jessica McBryant on behalf of Mark KetterAttorney Jessica McBryant added to party Mark Ketter(pty:pla) (McBryant, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Wed 02/05 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Amy Theresa Johnson (Johnson, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 11/29 11:11 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 29 November 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines30 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order is amended to reflect the following deadlines: Discovery due by 5/13/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 6/12/2025.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
34 34 order Order Referring Motion Wed 11/20 12:59 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery Deadlines filed by The American National Red Cross Association and Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/20/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc10)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/20 12:24 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery Deadlines by Defendants American National Red Cross Association, The, Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley. (Schrader, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 09/19 3:55 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 19 September 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines30 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order is amended to reflect the following deadlines: Discovery due by 2/25/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2025.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
31 31 order Order Referring Motion Thu 09/19 11:11 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by American National Red Cross Association, The Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/19/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc10)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Extension of Time Thu 09/19 10:32 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Defendants American National Red Cross Association, The, Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley. (Schrader, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
29 29 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/04 4:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 6/4/24. (lgale, )
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 06/04 4:54 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for pScheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 6/4/2024. Discovery due by 2/4/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/6/2025. FTR: KAS Courtroom C204. (lgale, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/28 1:07 PM
PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 28 May 2024. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
26 26 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 05/22 3:54 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants American National Red Cross Association, The, Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley. (Johnson, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
25 25 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/15 10:33 AM
ORDER GRANTING24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate attorneys Peter C. Middleton and Christopher T. Brouseau as counsel of record, and to remove these names from the electronic certificate of mailing. Defendants YMCA of Boulder Valley will continue to be represented by attorneys Ms. Johnson and Mr. Shrader. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/15/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc8, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
24 24 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 05/14 11:40 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley. (Middleton, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 05/06 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Amy T. Johnson by Amy Theresa Johnson on behalf of Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley (Johnson, Amy)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 05/06 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Trevor R. Schrader by Trevor Schrader on behalf of Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder ValleyAttorney Trevor Schrader added to party Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley(pty:dft) (Schrader, Trevor)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order Appointing Counsel Mon 05/06 11:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER STRIKING16 Motion to Appoint filed by Defendants. Withdrawal of appearance may only be effected by a court order entered after service of a separate motion to withdraw showing good cause. Ms. Johnson and Mr. Shrader may file an Entry of Appearance that complies with Local Atty. R. 5(a), and Mr. Brousseau and Mr. Middleton may file a separate motion to withdraw that complies with Local Atty. R. 5(b). SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/6/2024. (dddlc8, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
20 20 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/03 10:03 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/3/2024. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 05/03 9:11 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2 May 2024. This case was assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c). The signed Consent/Non-Consent Form18 indicates that at least one party has declined to consent. Accordingly,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). Case randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings shall be designated as: 24-cv-00685-DDD. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 05/02 4:52 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants American National Red Cross Association, The, Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley All parties do not consent.. (Johnson, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
17 17 order Minute Order Wed 04/17 4:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#5] is May 21, 2024. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 04/17/2024. Text Only Entry (kaslc4, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
16 16 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 04/16 2:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Defendant American National Red Cross Association, The. (Johnson, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
15 15 8 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/12 1:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley.(Middleton, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order Fri 04/05 2:03 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 5 April 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/28/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/03 2:39 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Brousseau, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 04/01 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter C. Middleton on behalf of Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder ValleyAttorney Peter C. Middleton added to party Young Men's Christian Association of Boulder Valley(pty:dft) (Middleton, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 03/29 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Trevor Schrader on behalf of American National Red Cross Association, TheAttorney Trevor Schrader added to party American National Red Cross Association, The(pty:dft) (Schrader, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 03/28 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jared Joseph Mazzei on behalf of Mark KetterAttorney Jared Joseph Mazzei added to party Mark Ketter(pty:pla) (Mazzei, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/25 9:55 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Johnson, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/20 4:21 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 20 March 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than April 3, 2024, the parties shall file their Rule 7.1(a) disclosure statements. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/13 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal of State Action to U.S. District Court by Defendant American National Red Cross Association, The(Johnson, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C-1
6 6 7 pgs misc Exhibits Wed 03/13 4:40 PM
Exhibits in Support of1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant American National Red Cross Association, The.(Johnson, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit B-2 Ketter - Summons Red Cross,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-3 Ketter - Summons Young Mens Christian Assoc,
Att: 3 Exhibit B-4 Ketter - Civil case cover sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit B-5 AOS - The American National Red Cross Assoc Dir. of Legal,
Att: 5 Exhibit B-6 AOS The American National Red Cross Assoc - Business,
Att: 6 Exhibit B-7 AOS The American National Red Cross Assoc - U.S. Atty,
Att: 7 Exhibit B-8 AOS Young Mens Christian Assoc,
Att: 8 11 pgs Exhibit B-9 Ketter - Red Cross Answer,
Att: 9 Exhibit B-10 Def Young Men's Motion for Extension of Time
5 5 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Wed 03/13 2:31 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 03/13 2:30 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Wed 03/13 2:29 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Administrative Notice Wed 03/13 2:28 PM
Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. § 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 03/13 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American National Red Cross Association Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1441 and 1446 from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 2023CV31135. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9586113), filed by American National Red Cross Association.(Johnson, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavits of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Court Pleadings and Filings,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance