Kast Media Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Martin R Barash |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10396 |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Kast Media Inc.
7111 Hayvenhurst Ave
Van Nuys, CA 91406-3807 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK Case)
Fri 04/26 4:45 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. . (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
43 | 43
motion
X - Motion (Generic) (motion)
Fri 04/26 4:41 PM
Motion Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Extending the Automatic Stay to Non-Debtor Defendant to Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Colin Thomson Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
42 | 42
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK Case)
Fri 04/26 4:11 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. . (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
41 | 41
motion
Assume Lease or Executory Contract (motion)
Fri 04/26 4:06 PM
Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Notice of Motion and Motion to Assume Executory Contract With Universal Content Productions LLC; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Colin Thomson Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK Case)
Fri 04/26 4:02 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. . (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 (motion)
Fri 04/26 3:52 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Notice of Motion and Motion to Approve Compromise Between the Debtor and Soundstack, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019; Declaration of Colin Thomson Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
answer
Reply
Tue 04/23 3:50 PM
Reply to Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Monthly Operating Report
Mon 04/22 4:56 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 1. For the Month Ending 03/31/2024 Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
trustee
Notice Appointing Trustee
Tue 04/16 3:54 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee and Acceptance of Sub Chapter V Trustee . Moriah Douglas Flahaut (TR) added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV). (Escobar, Eryk) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference
Tue 04/16 1:03 PM
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Proof of service
Tue 04/16 12:27 PM
Proof of service Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. . (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
trustee
Trustee withdrawal/resignation
Mon 04/15 3:42 PM
Trustee withdrawal/resignation Filed by Trustee Andrew W. Levin (TR). (Levin (TR), Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 04/10 9:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
order
Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF)
Mon 04/08 3:40 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/8/2024 (JC) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK Case)
Fri 04/05 4:37 PM
Notice of Hearing on Notice of Hearing on Notice of Setting Insider Compensation Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
29 | 29
court
Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Fri 04/05 7:28 AM
Hearing Set - hearing on notice of setting insider compensation [relates to doc#11 ] - The Hearing date is set for 4/30/2024 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Martin R. Barash (JC) |
|
28 | 28
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Fri 04/05 7:27 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - Notice of hearing is incomplete. Filer is required to file the [REVISED] Supplemental Notice Re: Availability of ZoomGov Audio and Video for Remote Appearance (September 2023). See Judge Barash's self-calendaring instructions for more information. (JC) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK Case)
Thu 04/04 3:30 PM
Notice of Hearing on Notice of Setting Insider Compensation Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
answer
Opposition
Wed 04/03 5:01 PM
Opposition to [Opposition By Creditor Arcadian Vanguard LLC To Notice Setting Insider Compensation] Filed by Creditor Arcadian Vanguard (Cashman-Kramer, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit [Declaration Of Brian Last In Support Of Opposition By Creditor Arcadian Vanguard Llc To Notice Setting Insider Compensation] | ||
Att: 2 List of 20 Largest Creditors Proof of Service including 20 Largest Creditors | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice
Tue 04/02 2:40 PM
Notice Voluntary Withdrawal of Motion Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. . (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK Case)
Tue 04/02 1:33 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. . (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Mon 04/01 5:16 PM
Hearing Set The Hearing date is set for 4/30/2024 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Martin R. Barash (LF1) |
|
22 | 22
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Mon 04/01 5:14 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - INCOMPLET NOTICE - THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF MOTION/HEARING ZOOM INFORMATION FORM. Filer is required to file the NEW (Sept/2023) Supplemental Notice of Hearing to be Held Remotely Using ZoomGov Audio and Video form. See Judge Barash's self-calendaring instructions for more information. FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO WITHDRAWAL DOCKET # 18 AS IT IS A DUPLICATE ENTRY. PLEASE WITHDRAWAL IT BY USING THE EVENT CODE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF MOTION. (LF1) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Amended List of Creditors (Fee)
Mon 04/01 4:56 PM
Amendment to List of Creditors. Fee Amount $34 Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Proof of service
Mon 04/01 3:35 PM
Proof of service Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Employ (motion)
Mon 04/01 3:13 PM
Application to Employ Leslie Cohen Law PC as Bankruptcy Counsel and Notice Thereof (corrected) Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
18 | 18
16
pgs
motion
Employ (motion)
Mon 04/01 3:08 PM
Application to Employ Leslie Cohen Law PC as Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Appear pro hac vice (motion)
Mon 04/01 11:07 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Stephen P. New, Esq. Filed by Creditor Arcadian Vanguard (Rudolph, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 04/01 4:57 PM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors (Fee)([LINK:1:24-bk-10396-MB] ) [misc,amdcm] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56686412. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 04/01 4:57 PM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors (Fee)([LINK:1:24-bk-10396-MB] ) [misc,amdcm] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56686412. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030)
Thu 03/28 12:53 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. . (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
15 | 15
court
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Thu 03/28 12:29 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) filed without electronic /s/ or holographic signature. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES. (TK) |
|
14 | 14
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Thu 03/28 10:19 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Maizel, Samuel. (Maizel, Samuel) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
30+
pgs
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 03/27 4:13 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed., List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc. . (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Request for special notice
Wed 03/27 3:58 PM
Request for special notice Filed by Creditor Arcadian Vanguard. (Rudolph, Gary) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice
Fri 03/22 3:17 PM
Notice Of Setting Insider Compensation Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 03/20 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 58. Notice Date 03/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2)
Mon 03/18 9:56 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 6/17/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 5/22/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/9/2024. (AG1) |
|
Sunday, March 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sun 03/17 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, March 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 03/16 9:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/16/2024. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sat 03/16 9:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/16/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
trustee
Notice Appointing Trustee
Fri 03/15 11:30 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee and Acceptance of Sub Chapter V Trustee . Andrew W. Levin (TR) added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV). (Escobar, Eryk) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Fri 03/15 7:36 AM
Hearing Set - Chapter 11 Subchapter V Scheduling and Case Management Conference Status hearing to be held on 4/30/2024 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Martin R. Barash (JC) |
|
3 | 3
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Fri 03/15 7:34 AM
Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/15/2024 . (JC) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Tax Documents
Wed 03/13 4:25 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 Filed by Debtor Kast Media Inc.. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
1 | 1
24
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 03/13 4:23 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Kast Media Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 03/27/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 03/27/2024. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 03/27/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 03/27/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 03/27/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 03/27/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 03/27/2024. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 03/27/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 03/27/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 03/27/2024. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 03/27/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 03/27/2024. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 03/27/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 03/27/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 03/27/2024. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/11/2024. (Cohen, Leslie) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 03/13 4:26 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1:24-bk-10396] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56606815. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |