EAE Contracting LLC
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Suzanne H Bauknight |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-30403 |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Debtor
EAE Contracting LLC
PO Box 31284
Knoxville, TN 37930-1284 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
M. Aaron Spencer
P. O. Box 900
Knoxville, TN 37901 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
800 Market Street, Suite 114 Howard H. Baker Jr. U.S. Courthouse
Knoxville, TN 37902 |
Docket last updated: 03/14/2024 12:03 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 03/13 4:52 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by William E. Maddox Jr. on behalf of EAE Contracting LLC. (Maddox, William) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Wed 03/13 4:52 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by William E. Maddox Jr. on behalf of Debtor EAE Contracting LLC. (Maddox, William) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Debtor Electronic Noticing Election (DeBN)
Wed 03/13 4:52 PM
Debtor Declines Participation in Debtor Electronic Noticing Filed by William E. Maddox Jr. on behalf of Debtor EAE Contracting LLC. (Maddox, William) |
|
4 | 4
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 03/13 4:55 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:3:24-bk-30403] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24000487. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
5 | 5
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Wed 03/13 4:55 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/16/2024 at 09:00 AM via Zoom meeting - Aaron Spencer: Meeting ID 893 829 0516, Passcode 4130588304, (865) 224-8017. (Maddox, William) |