State of Connecticut v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01217 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Connecticut, 3:24-cv-00234 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 7:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
RTX Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
EIDP Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ofc. John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corporation
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
State of Connecticut
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 03/13 2:42 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Connecticut (associated as of 3/12/2024), 3:24-cv-00234, State of Connecticut v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-01217-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:24-cv-00234. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER granting17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after a final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation for all Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/28/2024. (Barry, L.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/13/2024.] | |
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Answer deadline updated for 3M Company to 3/29/2024. (Barry, L.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/13/2024.] | ||
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
5 | 5 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/24.(Hushin, Z.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/13/2024.] | |
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 3/13/2024.] |