Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:24-cv-00267
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:41 AM CDT
Defendant
Travis County, Texas
Represented By
Anthony J. Nelson
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cynthia W. Veidt
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Sameer Singh Birring
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Mark Waszczak
Represented By
Anthony J. Nelson
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ivan Sanchez
Represented By
Anthony J. Nelson
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Brandon Massey
Represented By
Anthony J. Nelson
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Trey Long
Represented By
Anthony J. Nelson
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Johanna Kemp
Represented By
Anthony J. Nelson
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
James Hill
Represented By
Anthony J. Nelson
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Natasha Wells
Defendant
Unidentified Officers of Travis County Jail
Defendant
Travis County Sheriff's Deputy 4662
Defendant
R. Sustalta #4452
Represented By
Anthony J. Nelson
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Vivian Pan
Represented By
Anthony J. Nelson
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Officer S. Creamer #8527
Defendant
Officer Contreras
Defendant
MW 4774
Defendant
MH 5650
Defendant
Lauren Jones
Defendant
Amber Jones
Defendant
H. Sanchez
Defendant
Foulser
Defendant
City of Austin
Plaintiff
Jason Walker
13301 Center Lake Dr, #3114
Austin, TX 78753
Represented By
Jordan E. Marsh
Law Office Of Jordan Marsh
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
47 47 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/08 5:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by James Hill, Johanna Kemp, Trey Long, Brandon Massey, R. Sustalta #4452, Ivan Sanchez, Travis County, Texas.(Casas, Elaine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
46 46 24 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 04/24 10:13 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART28 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). The motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Mark Waszczak ("MW 4774"), Anjelica Martinez-Hernandez ("MH 5650"), Lauren Jones, and Dr. Vivian Pan, and they are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; DENYING29 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Jason Walker's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
45 45 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/09 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susana Naranjo-Padron on behalf of James Hill, Lauren Jones, Johanna Kemp, Trey Long, Anjelica Martinez-Hernandez, Brandon Massey, Vivian Pan, R. Sustalta #4452, Ivan Sanchez, Mark Waszczak. Attorney Susana Naranjo-Padron added to party James Hill(pty:dft), Attorney Susana Naranjo-Padron added to party Lauren Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Susana Naranjo-Padron added to party Johanna Kemp(pty:dft), Attorney Susana Naranjo-Padron added to party Trey Long(pty:dft), Attorney Susana Naranjo-Padron added to party Anjelica Martinez-Hernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Susana Naranjo-Padron added to party Brandon Massey(pty:dft), Attorney Susana Naranjo-Padron added to party Vivian Pan(pty:dft), Attorney Susana Naranjo-Padron added to party R. Sustalta #4452(pty:dft), Attorney Susana Naranjo-Padron added to party Ivan Sanchez(pty:dft), Attorney Susana Naranjo-Padron added to party Mark Waszczak(pty:dft) (Naranjo-Padron, Susana)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 03/17 11:37 AM
Text Order GRANTING44 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
44 44 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 03/12 2:52 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by James Hill, Lauren Jones, Johanna Kemp, Trey Long, Anjelica Martinez-Hernandez, Brandon Massey, Vivian Pan, R. Sustalta #4452, Ivan Sanchez, Travis County, Texas, Mark Waszczak.(Casas, Elaine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
43 43 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 01/21 1:40 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Mark Waszczak, Ivan Sanchez, Anjelica Martinez-Hernandez, Vivian Pan, R. Sustalta #4452, Lauren Jones, Johanna Kemp, James Hill, Brandon Massey, Trey Long, re28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Brandon Massey, Defendant Travis County, Texas, Defendant R. Sustalta #4452, Defendant Ivan Sanchez, Defendant Anjelica Martinez-Hernandez, Defendant Trey Long, Defendant Lauren Jones, Defendant Vivian Pan, Defendant Mark Waszczak, Defendant James Hill, Defendant Johanna Kemp(Veidt, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
42 42 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 01/21 12:28 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Travis County, Texas, re29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Travis County, Texas(Veidt, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, January 10, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/10 9:38 AM
Text Order GRANTING41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendant Travis County Defendants shall file their Replies to Plaintiffs Responses with the Court on or before January 21, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
41 41 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/08 5:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to40 Response to Motion,39 Response to Motion,, by Mark Waszczak, Ivan Sanchez, Anjelica Martinez-Hernandez, Travis County, Texas, Vivian Pan, R. Sustalta #4452, Lauren Jones, Johanna Kemp, James Hill, Brandon Massey, Trey Long.(Veidt, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 30, 2024
40 40 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/30 5:39 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jason Walker, re29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Travis County, Texas(Marsh, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
39 39 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/30 5:32 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jason Walker, re28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Brandon Massey, Defendant Travis County, Texas, Defendant R. Sustalta #4452, Defendant Ivan Sanchez, Defendant Anjelica Martinez-Hernandez, Defendant Trey Long, Defendant Lauren Jones, Defendant Vivian Pan, Defendant Mark Waszczak, Defendant James Hill, Defendant Johanna Kemp(Marsh, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, December 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/16 10:34 AM
Text Order GRANTING38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due on or before Dec. 30, 2024. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
38 38 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/13 12:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6) ,28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Jason Walker. (Marsh, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
37 37 adr ADR Report - Other Mon 12/02 4:52 PM
ADR Report Filed - Joint by Mark Waszczak, Ivan Sanchez, Anjelica Martinez-Hernandez, Travis County, Texas, Vivian Pan, R. Sustalta #4452, Lauren Jones, Johanna Kemp, James Hill, Brandon Massey, Trey Long(Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
36 36 notice Notice Wed 11/20 3:55 PM
NOTICE CONCERNING REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by City of Austin (Barton, Monte)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
35 35 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/18 4:15 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Mark Waszczak, Ivan Sanchez, Anjelica Martinez-Hernandez, Travis County, Texas, Vivian Pan, R. Sustalta #4452, Lauren Jones, Johanna Kemp, James Hill, Brandon Massey, Trey Long. (Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
34 34 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/13 11:53 AM
JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 11/18/2024, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/2/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 6/27/2025, Discovery due by 12/31/2025, Joinder of Parties due by 6/27/2025, DipositiveMotions due by 2/2/2026. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 11/07 5:28 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
32 32 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 11/04 2:44 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by Jason Walker. (Marsh, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/28 4:19 PM
Text Order GRANTING31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his responses to Defendants' motions to dismiss on or before December 13, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/25 4:38 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6) ,28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Jason Walker. (Marsh, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Mon 10/21 3:18 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/4/2024. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
29 29 motion Dismiss Fri 10/11 4:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6) by Travis County, Texas.(Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
28 28 motion Dismiss Fri 10/11 3:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by James Hill, Lauren Jones, Johanna Kemp, Trey Long, Brandon Massey, Vivian Pan, R. Sustalta #4452, Ivan Sanchez, Travis County, Texas, Mark Waszczak, Anjelica Martinez-Hernandez.(Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
27 27 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/11 9:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MH 5650 as to MH 5650. Waiver sent on 8/9/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. (Nelson, Anthony) (Main Document 27 replaced on 10/11/2024) (pg)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/11 9:50 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lauren Jones as to Lauren Jones. Waiver sent on 8/9/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. (Nelson, Anthony) (Main Document 26 replaced on 10/11/2024) (pg)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Correction Fri 10/11 4:03 PM
Notice of Correction: re26 Waiver of Service Executed,27 Waiver of Service Executed. These filings include a fillable form. Fillable Forms must be flattened to permanently affix any signatures, or other items added to the document to include the case style, party names, dates, etc. These steps should be performed prior to filing your documents through CM/ECF. Instructions are on the Courts website on the CM/ECF page under Training, Printing to PDF. The Clerks Office has flattened these forms. No further action required. Please take note for future filing purposes. Thank you. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/08 5:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney Monte L. Barton, Jr added to party Officer Contreras(pty:dft), Attorney Monte L. Barton, Jr added to party Officer S. Creamer #8527(pty:dft), Attorney Monte L. Barton, Jr added to party Natasha Wells (pty:dft) by Foulser, H. Sanchez, James Hill, Amber Jones, Lauren Jones, Johanna Kemp, Trey Long, MH 5650, MW 4774, Brandon Massey, Officer Contreras, Officer S. Creamer #8527, Vivian Pan, R. Sustalta #4452, Ivan Sanchez, Travis County Sheriff's Deputy 4662, Travis County, Texas, Unidentified Officers of Travis County Jail, Mark Waszczak, Natasha Wells.(Barton, Monte)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 10/08 5:09 PM
City of Austin ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint, . Attorney Monte L. Barton, Jr added to party City of Austin(pty:dft) by City of Austin.(Barton, Monte)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/08 10:15 AM
Text Order GRANTING23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Travis County Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's second amended complaint on or before October 11, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/07 3:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Amended Complaint, by James Hill, Johanna Kemp, Trey Long, Brandon Massey, Vivian Pan, R. Sustalta #4452, Ivan Sanchez, Travis County, Texas, Mark Waszczak.(Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 09, 2024
22 22 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/09 5:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ivan Sanchez as to Ivan Sanchez. Waiver sent on 8/9/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. (Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/09 5:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Waszczak as to Mark Waszczak. Waiver sent on 8/9/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. (Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/09 4:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Sustalta #4452 as to R. Sustalta #4452. Waiver sent on 8/9/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. (Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/09 4:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Hill as to James Hill. Waiver sent on 8/9/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. (Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/09 4:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Johanna Kemp as to Johanna Kemp. Waiver sent on 8/9/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. (Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/09 4:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vivian Pan as to Vivian Pan. Waiver sent on 8/9/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. (Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/09 4:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Massey as to Brandon Massey. Waiver sent on 8/9/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. (Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/09 4:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trey Long as to Trey Long. Waiver sent on 8/9/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. (Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/02 11:43 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Austin, Foulser, H. Sanchez, Amber Jones, Lauren Jones, MH 5650, MW 4774, Officer Contreras, Officer S. Creamer #8527, Vivian Pan, R. Sustalta #4452, Travis County Sheriff's Deputy 4662, Travis County, Texas, Unidentified Officers of Travis County Jail, Natasha Wells, Johanna Kemp, James Hill, Brandon Massey amending6 Amended Complaint, filed by Jason Walker.(pg)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 08/01 9:24 AM
Text Order GRANTING11 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, (Dkt. 11-1). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 07/31 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cynthia W. Veidt on behalf of Travis County, Texas. Attorney Cynthia W. Veidt added to party Travis County, Texas(pty:dft) (Veidt, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 07/31 9:40 AM
Text Order GRANTING12 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Sameer Singh Birring is WITHDRAWN as counsel for Defendant. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
12 12 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 07/30 4:34 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Travis County, Texas.(Birring, Sameer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
11 11 motion Leave to File Document Wed 07/17 3:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Jason Walker.(Marsh, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint
notice Deficiency Notice Wed 07/17 11:55 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 10 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . This document is a Motion for Leave to File. Filing user must include for the Court's review the document for which leave to file is requested as a PDF attachment to the motion. That attachment is NOT to be filed as a separate document on the docket until the motion for leave to file is granted. Please re-file this motion with the proper attachments. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
10 10 motion Leave to File Document Tue 07/16 10:36 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Jason Walker. (Marsh, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 07/15 3:49 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Jason Walker.( Show Cause Response due by 7/29/2024) The5 MOTION to Compel filed by Jason Walker. is DENIED without prejudice due to lack of service. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 01, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Sat 06/01 7:26 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan E. Marsh on behalf of Jason Walker. Attorney Jordan E. Marsh added to party Jason Walker(pty:pla) (Marsh, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 05/07 9:13 AM
Text Order GRANTING7 Unopposed Motion to Stay Answer Deadline entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Travis County, Texas need not answer until after the other Defendants have been served or waived service. Therefore, Defendant Travis County's deadline to answer shall be the same deadline to answer as the other Defendants. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
7 7 motion Stay Mon 05/06 5:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadline to File an Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Travis County, Texas.(Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 02, 2024
notice Deficiency Notice Thu 05/02 10:21 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 5 MOTION to Compel. Your Certificate of Service indicates service via CM/ECF upon Counsel of Record but the Defendants have yet to make an appearance therefore not registered to receive electronic notification in this case. Please file an Amended Certificate of Service in Pleading Format stating the alternate means of service employed. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/17 4:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Travis County, Texas, Amber Jones, Vivian Pan, H. Sanchez, R. Sustalta #4452, Foulser, MH 5650, MW 4774, Lauren Jones, Travis County Sheriff's Deputy 4662, City of Austin, Officer S. Creamer #8527, Officer Contreras, Natasha Wells, Unidentified Officers of Travis County Jail amending1 Complaint., filed by Jason Walker.(pg)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Compel Wed 04/17 4:34 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION to Compel Limited Discovery by Jason Walker. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/08 9:13 AM
Text Order GRANTING4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before May 8, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 04/08 10:45 AM
Reset Deadlines: Travis County, Texas answer due 4/8/2024. (pg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 04/12 11:56 AM
Reset Deadlines: Travis County, Texas answer due 5/8/2024. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/05 4:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Travis County, Texas.(Nelson, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
3 3 misc Filing Fee Received Thu 03/21 4:45 PM
Filing fee received in the amount of $405, receipt number 1578 (pg)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/19 10:33 AM
ORDER, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff must submit either the filing fee of $405.00 or a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis and financial affidavit1 in full by April 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee DUE), filed by Jason Walker.(cr5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/13 5:09 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 03/13 5:10 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Wed 03/13 5:11 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jason Walker. (cr5)
Related: [-]