Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:24-mc-00279
Cause28:1782 Letter rogatory - appointment
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2024
Terminated:Jun 12, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 06/12 10:21 AM
ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 06/11 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America (Stanford, Krysta)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/12 10:20 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to the case. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
3 3 order Status Report Order Fri 06/07 10:04 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER; due by 7/9/2024. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/04 12:57 PM
ORDER re1 Application for Letter Rogatory filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
1 1 misccs Application for Letter Rogatory Wed 03/13 3:20 PM
APPLICATION for Letter Rogatory ( Filing fee waived), filed by United States of America.(cr5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Krysta M. Stanford,
Att: 3 Memo in Support,
Att: 4 Envelope,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/13 3:34 PM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 03/13 3:45 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell. (cr5)
Related: [-]