California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-01000
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 12, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 14, 2024 12:28 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
A black Apple iPhone, model A1660, FCC ID # BCG-E3085A (1)
Terminated: 03/12/2024


Docket last updated: 03/14/2024 1:32 AM PDT
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to A black Apple iPhone, model A1660, FCC ID # BCG-E3085A. (fjp)
Related: [-]