Davis v. Garland et al
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J Vilardo |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00223 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Middle, 4:24-cv-00421 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 4:52 AM EDT |
Petitioner
Damion G.V Davis
042256487 BUFFALO FEDERAL DETENTION FACILITY 4250 Federal Drive
Batavia, NY 14020 |
|
Respondent
Thomas Brophy
Buffalo Field Office U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement 130 Delaware Ave. Fl. 7
Buffalo, NY 14202 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
Merrick B Garland
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Jeffery Searls
4250 Federal Dr.
Batavia, NY 14020 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/22 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Barrie Moar on behalf of Thomas Brophy, Merrick B Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Jeffery Searls(Moar, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Mon 04/15 1:07 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Within 30 days of the date of this order, Respondent shall file and serve an answer and memorandum of law or a motion to dismiss; Petitioner shall have 25 days upon receipt of the answer or motion to dismiss to file a written response; the Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the petition and this order electronically via a Notice of Electronic Filing to the United States Attorney's Office, Western District of New York at USANYW-Immigration-Habeas@usdoj.gov. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/15/2024. (CGJ) |
|
Att: 1 Petition | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter-ProSe
Mon 03/25 1:54 PM
Letter from Petitioner, to Clerk of Court (CGJ) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 03/14 10:39 AM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 4:24-cv-00421. |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/14 10:15 AM
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - In accordance with the accompanying memorandum5 issued this same day, it is ORDERED that: (1) The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York, as venue does not lie in the Middle District of Pennsylvania. See 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). (2) The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. (3) Petitioners motion to appoint counsel and application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis will be left to the transferee court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 3/14/2024. (caw) |
|
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/14 10:12 AM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Damion G.V. Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 3/14/2024. (caw) |
|
utility
Remark
Thu 03/14 10:50 AM
Remark: Petitioner has been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and a civil case timeline. (CGJ) |
||
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (ea) [Transferred from pamd on 3/14/2024.] | |
3 | 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Damion G.V. Davis. (ea) [Transferred from pamd on 3/14/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1 PETITION for a Federal Court Bail Hearing lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Damion G.V. Davis. (ea) (ea). [Transferred from pamd on 3/14/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Att: 2 (3/12/2024) Proposed Order |