Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Catherine Henry
Case #: 5:24-cv-01112
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2003 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 10, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON
625 E KING ST
LANCASTER, PA 17602
Represented By
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
KELLY AUKER
1908 BOWMANSVILLE RD
MOHNTON, PA 17602
Represented By
JARED A. JACOBSON
Jared Jacobson Law LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
OFFICER ALBRIGHT
Terminated: 07/11/2024
50 N DUKE ST
LANCASTER, PA 17602
Represented By
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
OFFICER NICKLAS
Terminated: 07/11/2024
50 N DUKE ST
LANCASTER, PA 17602
Represented By
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
SARGEANT HAWK
Terminated: 07/11/2024
Represented By
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/08 12:51 PM
ORDER THAT THE CITY OF RALEIGH POLICE DEPARTMENT SHALL PRODUCE TO THE UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ALL RECORDS RELATING TO PLAINTIFF KELLY AUKERS EMPLOYMENT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A. APPLICATION FOR EMPLOYMENT; B. PAYROLL AND SALARY RECORDS; C. DISCIPLINARY RECORDS; D. RECORDS OF ABSENCES; E. RECORDS RELATING TO ANY WORKERS COMPENSATION CLAIMS; AND F. ANY OTHER RECORDS PERTAINING TO PLAINTIFFS EMPLOYMENT WITH THE CITY OF RALEIGH POLICE DEPARTMENT. THE RECORDS SHALL BE PRODUCED WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE RECORDS SHALL BE TREATED AS CONFIDENTIAL AND USED SOLELY FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED LITIGATION, SUBJECT TO ANY FURTHER PROTECTIVE ORDERS ISSUED BY THIS COURT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY ON 5/8/25. 5/8/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Stipulation Thu 05/08 9:34 AM
STIPULATION by COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA, LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON. (GONZALES, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Oral Motion Tue 04/01 9:55 AM
ORDER THAT THE E-MAIL BE CONSTRUED AS A MOTION AND THE 22 MOTION WAS GRANTED. THE CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED TO BE HELD IN PERSON ON MARCH 6, 2025, WAS RESCHEDULED TO A VIDEO CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY ON 3/31/25.4/1/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Oral Motion Tue 04/01 9:53 AM
E-mailed Oral Motion.(mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
21 21 minutes Status Conference Tue 03/11 10:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY Status Conference held on March 6, 2025. (dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
20 20 misc Status Report Fri 02/28 9:44 AM
STATUS REPORT by COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA, LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON. (GONZALES, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/20 4:50 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER OF 2/20/25 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES FILED BY THE PARTIES, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES ARE EXTENDED: THE DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO JUNE 10, 2025. ETC. ALL EXPERT DEPOSITIONS SHALL BE CONCLUDED NO LATER THAN JUNE 9, 2025. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED BY JUNE 23, 2025. RESPONSES SHALL BE BY JULY 7. SIGNED BY JUDGE: CATHERINE HENRY ON 2/20/25. 2/20/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 02/20 12:20 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA, LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON..(GONZALES, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
17 17 misc Praecipe/Request Wed 02/05 12:54 PM
to Withdraw Defendants' Motion to Compel by COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA, LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON.(GONZALES, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, February 03, 2025
16 16 motion Compel Mon 02/03 2:47 PM
MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Executed Authorizations for Release of Records filed by COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA, LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON.Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(GONZALES, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum,
Att: 3 Attorney Certification,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit G
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 01/22 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/6/2025 11:00 AM IN Holmes 4th Floor BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Status Report
Thursday, January 09, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 01/09 4:19 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER TO DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/9/25. 1/9/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
13 13 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 10/29 2:42 PM
ORDER THAT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/23/2025 09:30 AM IN Cahn 4B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/25/2025 10:00 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/10/2025; JURY SELECTION SET FOR 8/1/2025 09:00 AM IN Courtroom TBD BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; MOTIONS DUE BY 11/7/2024; MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 6/20/2025; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/24/2025; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/13/2025; DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/13/2025; TRIAL DATE SET FOR 8/4/2025 09:00 AM IN Cahn 4B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 10/29/24. 10/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
12 12 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Deadlines Thu 10/24 4:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Pretrial Conference held on 10/24/24. (mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Connor Warner on behalf of OFFICER ALBRIGHT, COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA, HAWK, LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON, OFFICER NICKLAS with Certificate of Service(Warner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/04 11:51 AM
Notice of Hearing: An Initial Rule 16 Pretrial Conference will be held before Judge: John M. Gallagher on Thursday, October 24, 2024 at 2:00pm in Judge's Chambers, 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pa. (DT)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/23 3:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA, LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON.(GONZALES, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 07/11 6:09 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION (ECF NO.6 ) IS GRANTED. ANY AND ALL CLAIMS ASSERTED IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AGAINST INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS OFFICER NICKLAS, OFFICER ALBRIGHT, AND SARGEANT HAWK ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS § 1983 CONSPIRACY CLAIM IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ANY CLAIM FOR MONETARY DAMAGES UNDER COUNT IX IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK DEFENDANTS OFFICER NICKLAS, OFFICER ALBRIGHT, AND SARGEANT HAWK AS TERMINATED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 7/11/24.7/11/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/25 12:50 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF, IF INTENDING TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS, SHALL DO SO BY NO LATER THAN JULY 9, 2024. PLAINTIFF IS ADVISED THAT FAILURE TO RESPOND MAY RESULT IN THE MOTION BEING GRANTED AS UNCONTESTED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 6/25/24. 6/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/17 5:31 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by OFFICER ALBRIGHT, COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA, HAWK, LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON, OFFICER NICKLAS.Memorandum, Order, Certificate of Service.(GONZALES, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/20 3:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OFFICER ALBRIGHT, LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON, COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA, HAWK, OFFICER NICKLAS. All Defendants. (GONZALES, JOHN)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/20 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. GONZALES on behalf of OFFICER ALBRIGHT, COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA, HAWK, LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON, OFFICER NICKLAS with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(GONZALES, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/14 1:33 PM
NOTICE by KELLY AUKER Case Designation Related [+] (JACOBSON, JARED)
Related: [-] vised
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/14 1:21 PM
Summons Issued as to OFFICER ALBRIGHT, COUNTY OF LANCASTER PENNSYLVANIA, HAWK, LANCASTER COUNTY PRISON, OFFICER NICKLAS. Forwarded To: Counsel on 3/14/24 (mas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 03/14 11:17 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17329436.), filed by KELLY AUKER.(JACOBSON, JARED)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, Case Mgt and Designation (combined)
misc Attorney Required Forms Thu 03/14 11:45 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Yes/No questions need to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]