Kansas District Court
Judge:Kathryn H Vratil
Referred: Gwynne E Birzer
Case #: 6:24-cv-01044
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 10, 2024 3:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Antony Blinken
Represented By
Steven W. Brookreson, II
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Robert P. Sanders
Represented By
Steven W. Brookreson, II
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Consulate in Montreal, Canada
Represented By
Steven W. Brookreson, II
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of State
Represented By
Steven W. Brookreson, II
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Nafiseh Lotfi
Represented By
James O. Hacking, III
Hacking Immigration Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 06/05 2:30 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (sz)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/03 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Nafiseh Lotfi (Hacking, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
3 3 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Mon 04/29 3:57 PM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/24/2024 for Defendants Antony Blinken, Robert P. Sanders, U.S. Consulate in Montreal, Canada, United States Department of State to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/29/2024. (nac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
2 2 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA Tue 04/16 8:54 PM
Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 4/10/2024 Antony Blinken served on 4/10/2024, answer due 6/10/2024; Robert P. Sanders served on 4/10/2024, answer due 6/10/2024; U.S. Consulate in Montreal, Canada served on 4/10/2024, answer due 6/10/2024; United States Department of State served on 4/10/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. Summons served on United States Attorney.(Hacking, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit USPS Receipts
Friday, March 15, 2024
service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 03/15 9:47 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Antony Blinken, Robert P. Sanders, U.S. Consulate in Montreal, Canada, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (nac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Thu 03/14 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6298442.), filed by Nafiseh Lotfi.(Hacking, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation of Place of Trial
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 03/14 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
Related: [-]