New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jamel K Semper
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:24-cv-02896
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:Apr 29, 2024
Case in other court:District of Columbia, 1:23-cv-03793
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 10, 2024 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
ATTORNEY GENERAL MERRICK B. GARLAND
Represented By
SIAN JONES
contact info
SOPHIE KAISER
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
UR M. JADDOU
Represented By
SIAN JONES
contact info
SOPHIE KAISER
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS
Represented By
SIAN JONES
contact info
SOPHIE KAISER
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
NASIR L. KAMBO
Represented By
TAMUNOTONTE FENNY
Jeelani Law Firm PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 29, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 04/29 12:40 PM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 4/29/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Thu 04/25 12:46 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NASIR L. KAMBO (FENNY, TAMUNOTONTE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/11 4:39 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the16 Government's Request for a 60-day extension of time, until June 17, 2024, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 4/11/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Letter Thu 04/11 10:26 AM
Letter from Parties Joint re Status Update re 15 Order,,. (KAISER, SOPHIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Wed 04/10 4:50 PM
Letter from Defendants seeking Extension. (KAISER, SOPHIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
15 15 order Order Tue 04/02 5:26 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter was recently reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. By April 12, 2024, the parties shall file a joint letter: (1) providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims and defenses; (2) advising the Court of the status of discovery, including any status conferences that are presently scheduled; (3) identifying any pending motions; and (4) informing the Court whether the parties seek a settlement conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 4/2/2024. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/01 4:03 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Magistrate Judge E. S. Kiel no longer assigned to the case. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order Mon 03/18 12:07 PM
ORDER granting the12 Application for a Clerk's Extension. The due date for the Federal Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to April 18, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 3/18/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 03/18 11:53 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by NASIR L. KAMBO. (FENNY, TAMUNOTONTE) Modified on 3/18/2024 (qa, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 03/18 12:09 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/18/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
12 12 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 03/15 6:53 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants. Attorney SOPHIE KAISER for MERRICK B. GARLAND,SOPHIE KAISER for UR M. JADDOU,SOPHIE KAISER for ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS added. (KAISER, SOPHIE)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Letter: Attorney Not Admitted Fri 03/15 11:43 AM
Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer Thu 03/14 11:50 AM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:23-cv-03793. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/14 3:19 PM
Judge Jamel K. Semper and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
9 9 ORDER granting Defendants'8 Consent Motion to Transfer and Extend. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/4/24. (lcapm2)
Related: [-]
8 8 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS.(Jones, Sian). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 3/5/2024 (mg).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
6 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 1/12/2024; ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS served on 1/12/2024 (Ahmed, Sadaf)
Related: [-]
5 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/12/2024. (Ahmed, Sadaf)
Related: [-]
4 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/3/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/3/2024. (Ahmed, Sadaf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 11, 2024
3 3 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sadaf F. Ahmed on behalf of NASIR L. KAMBO Substituting for attorney Brian J. Kholodovsky (Ahmed, Sadaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
2 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zrtw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10577000) filed by NASIR L KAMBO.(Kholodovsky, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet
Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zrtw)
Related: [-]