Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Nancy G Edmunds
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-10658
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:May 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 10, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
JJ Marshall and Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff
Tonya R. Turner
Represented By
Ahmad T. Sulaiman
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info
Nathan C. Volheim
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 17, 2024
8 8 order Dismissing Case Fri 05/17 9:21 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (JCur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
7 7 notice Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/16 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tonya R. Turner with Prejudice (Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
6 6 notice Notice - Other Mon 04/29 7:09 PM
NOTICE by Tonya R. Turner of Settlement (Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 03/19 11:16 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. JJ Marshall and Associates, Inc. waiver sent on 3/19/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued* Thu 03/14 3:53 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *JJ Marshall and Associates, Inc. * (JPar)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance Thu 03/14 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ahmad T. Sulaiman on behalf of Tonya R. Turner. (Sulaiman, Ahmad)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Appearance Thu 03/14 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Volheim on behalf of Tonya R. Turner. (Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 03/14 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Tonya R. Turner against JJ Marshall and Associates, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9710996 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Macomb County - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb County. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 03/14 3:54 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (JPar)
Related: [-]