Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tana Lin
Case #: 2:24-cv-00342
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 10, 2024 1:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Paula's Choice LLC
Represented By
Michael Duvall
Dentons Us Llp (ca)
contact info
Grant Ankrom
Dentons Us Llp (mo)
contact info
Vivian Sandoval
Dentons Us Llp (il)
contact info
Spencer McCandless
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Chanell Botshekan
Dentons Us Llp (ca)
contact info
Emily J Harris
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Alice Aten
Dentons Us Llp (mo)
contact info
Michael Harriss
Dentons Us Llp (mo)
contact info
Defendant
Sephora USA Inc
Defendant
THG Beauty USA LLC
Plaintiff
Rachael Forbis
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesse Vargison
Represented By
Michella A Kras
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (az)
contact info
Alisa V Sherbow
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (az)
contact info
Robert B. Carey
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (az)
contact info
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheza Admani
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Crystal Akemon
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kirsten Andelman
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Elise Angelich
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Marissa Angelich
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Meredith Bachrach
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiffany Baker
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Barak
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kara Bare
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Barnett
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Julia Bartholomew-King
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynette Bell
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Brankamp
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Bravo
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Paige Bridges
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Charlotte Campbell
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Therese Capriglione
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Mariana Casillas
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca Chesshir
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Dawny Chin
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Dalit Cohen
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Esperanza De Lara
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Demkovich
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Narjes Deris
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Megan Dodd
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Haley Dresser
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Joella Erriquez
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Farthing
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Nellie Featherstone
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Shana Fix
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Frazier
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
April Friga
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Bridget Froelich
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Caylee Griffis
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Griswold
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Margaret Groh
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tara Grohowski
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Gross
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Donita Hammond-Grant
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Audra Harris
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Soraya Heydari
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tania Hinton
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Autumn Hood
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Housey-Gantt
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Humaira Iffath
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jada Jefferson
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Savannah Jenkins
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Jones
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jasmin Kaset
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Keum
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Robyn Khanjian
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Crystal Kirby
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilfred Knapp
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Christine Knight
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Samantha Kotcher
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tracy Lamar
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Lathan
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Layman
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Taylor Lenane
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Michele Leppert
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lauren LoPrete
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcy Luiz
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Paige Marlowe
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Dawn Martin
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Maura McCartan
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Emmarose McCoig
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Autumn Mckay
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Dorothy Muldoon
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Maura Murphy
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Neica Murray
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Cecille Nguyen
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexandra Nicholas-Dancy
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandi Nichols
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Caitlin Orozco
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Abbygail Parker
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Catherine Pasternack
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly Pettus
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Stacey Pino
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Vale Rae Dahl
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Ramirez
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Rivera
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ruby Rorty
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Roz Saedi
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Rema Sayge
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Autumn Sharp
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Rabia Sheikh
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Samantha Simmons
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Cheryl Simonton
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Destiny Smith
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine Sorensen
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Mallory Suhling
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Surawski
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Vickie Taylor
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Grace Toy
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lauren Trotter
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Watanabe
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Weisman
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Charisse Wheby
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lakeisha Whipe
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Alicia Wright
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristiana Wright
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Gail Yeh
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Brooke Young
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Gloria Yousif
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Dawn van der Steeg
Represented By
Sean R Matt
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
80 80 4 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Tue 04/22 11:07 AM
ORDER granting Parties'79 Stipulated Motion. All proceedings on Paula's Choice's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. No.48 ), including the deadlines set by the Court's 2/18/2025 Scheduling Order (Dkt. No.68 ), are stayed pending resolution of the appeal of the Court's Order on Motion for Clarification, in accordance with Coinbase, Inc. v. Bielski , 599 U.S. 736, 143 S. Ct. 1915, 216 L. Ed. 2d 671 (2023). Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
Related: [-]
79 79 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 04/22 9:40 AM
Stipulated MOTION Regarding Automatic Stay Pending Appeal , filed by All Parties. Noting Date 4/22/2025, (Harris, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
78 78 appeal Time Schedule Order Appeal Number from USCA Thu 04/17 8:52 AM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/USCA CASE NUMBER 25-2452 as to77 Notice of Appeal filed by THG Beauty USA LLC, Paula's Choice LLC, Sephora USA Inc. (RE)
Related: [-]