Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-33730

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott W Everett
Case #: 3:24-ap-03015
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jeffery Mims
Represented By
Jeffery Mims
contact info
Defendant
MEDarc LLC
Represented By
MEDarc LLC
contact info
Defendant
Joyce W. Lindauer, PLLC
Represented By
Joyce W. Lindauer, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Merlin Law Group, PA
Represented By
Merlin Law Group, PA
contact info
Defendant
Medical Billing Company, LLC
Represented By
Medical Billing Company, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MCBIOM, LLC
Represented By
MCBIOM, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Tonya Gilliam
Represented By
Tonya Gilliam
contact info
Defendant
William Camp Law Group
Represented By
William Camp Law Group
contact info
Defendant
William W. Camp, PC
Represented By
William W. Camp, PC
contact info
Defendant
Medical Practice Solutions
Represented By
Medical Practice Solutions
contact info
Defendant
Adrianna Villareal
Represented By
Adrianna Villareal
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremiah Vance
6437 Southpoint Dr.
Dallas, TX 75248
Represented By
Jeremiah Vance
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
court Close adversary case Thu 05/08 12:53 PM
Adversary case 3:24-ap-3015 closed (Noble, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
35 35 appeal Notice of docketing notice of appeal/record Tue 11/19 9:57 AM
Notice of docketing COMPLETE record on appeal. 3:24-cv-02503-B Related [+] (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of appeal . filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (RE: related document(s)9 Order to dismiss adversary proceeding).
34 34 appeal Transmittal of record on appeal Tue 11/19 9:44 AM
Transmittal of record on appeal to U.S. District Court . Complete record on appeal . ,Transmitted: Mini Record. Number of appellant volumes: 1 Number of appellee volumes: 2. Civil Case Number: 3:24-cv-02503-B Related [+] (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of appeal . filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (RE: related document(s)9 Order to dismiss adversary proceeding). Appellant Designation due by 9/24/2024. (Ecker, C.)
Friday, November 15, 2024
32 32 court Transcript Fri 11/15 3:56 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 8/26/24 RE: The Court's rulings on plaintiff's motion for a continuance and dismissing the adversary complaint. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 02/13/2025. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Palmer Reporting Services, Susan Palmer, Telephone number (209) 915-3065, palmerrptg@aol.com. Related [+]. Transcript to be made available to the public on 02/13/2025. (Palmer, Susan)
Related: [-] 7 Hearing held on 8/26/2024 re:1 Complaint by Jeremiah Vance against Jeffery Mims, MEDarc LLC, Joyce W. Lindauer, PLLC, Merlin Law Group, PA, Medical Billing Company, LLC, MCBIOM, LLC, Tonya Gilliam, William Camp Law Group, William W. Camp, PC, Medical Practice Solutions, Adrianna Villareal. (MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE DENIED. CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SUA SPONTE.)
Friday, October 11, 2024
31 31 appeal Appellant designation Fri 10/11 3:25 PM
First Amended appellant designation of contents for inclusion in record on appeal and statement of issues on appeal. filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance Related [+]. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 21 Appellant designation
Thursday, October 10, 2024
30 30 court BNC certificate of mailing Thu 10/10 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+]
Related: [-] 28 Notice regarding the record for a bankruptcy appeal to the U.S. District Court. (RE: related document(s)12 Notice of appeal . Fee Amount $298 filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (RE: related document(s)9 Order to dismiss adversary proceeding).) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/10/2024. (Admin.
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
29 29 appeal Notice regarding the record for a bankruptcy appeal Tue 10/08 3:09 PM
DUPLICATE. See document 28. Notice regarding the record for a bankruptcy appeal to the U.S. District Court. Related [+]
Related: [-] 12 Notice of appeal .filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (RE: related document(s)9 Order to dismiss adversary proceeding). (Whitaker, Sheniqua) Modified on 10/8/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
28 28 appeal Notice regarding the record for a bankruptcy appeal Tue 10/08 2:59 PM
Notice regarding the record for a bankruptcy appeal to the U.S. District Court. Related [+]
Related: [-] 12 Notice of appeal . Fee Amount $298 filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (RE: related document(s)9 Order to dismiss adversary proceeding). (Whitaker, Sheniqua
27 27 appeal Appellee designation Tue 10/08 1:45 PM
Appellee designation of contents for inclusion in record of appeal filed by Defendant Jeffery Mims Related [+]. (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of appeal
Friday, October 04, 2024
26 26 appeal Notice of docketing notice of appeal/record Fri 10/04 12:43 PM
Notice of docketing notice of appeal. Civil Action Number: 3:24-cv-02503-B. Related [+] (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of appeal . filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (RE: related document(s)9 Order to dismiss adversary proceeding). Appellant Designation due by 9/24/2024. (Ecker, C.)
Saturday, September 28, 2024
24 24 court BNC certificate of mailing Sat 09/28 11:20 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Clerk's correspondence requesting file an amended designation from the plaintiff. (RE: related document(s)21 Appellant designation of contents for inclusion in record on appeal and statement of issues on appeal. filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (RE: related document(s)12 Notice of appeal). Appellee designation due by 10/8/2024.) Responses due by 10/4/2024. (Blanco, J.)
Thursday, September 26, 2024
23 23 court Clerk's correspondence Thu 09/26 8:25 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting file an amended designation from the plaintiff. Related [+] Responses due by 10/4/2024. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 21 Appellant designation of contents for inclusion in record on appeal and statement of issues on appeal. filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (RE: related document(s)12 Notice of appeal). Appellee designation due by 10/8/2024.
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
22 22 court Request for transcript Thu 09/26 7:35 AM
Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 8/26/2024. The requested turn-around time is ordinary 30 day (Ferrufino, Sara) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2024 (Ferrufino, Sara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
21 21 appeal Appellant designation Wed 09/25 12:42 PM
Appellant designation of contents for inclusion in record on appeal and statement of issues on appeal. filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance Related [+]. Appellee designation due by 10/8/2024. (Dugan, Sue)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of appeal
Sunday, September 22, 2024
20 20 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sun 09/22 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order denying motion to reconsider (related document14 ), denying motion to amend order by Jeremiah Vance (related document15 ) Entered on 9/20/2024.
Friday, September 20, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order (on a generic motion) Fri 09/20 5:02 PM
Order denying motion to reconsider Related [+], denying motion to amend order by Jeremiah Vance Entered on 9/20/2024. (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-] 14 15
Thursday, September 12, 2024
18 18 court BNC certificate of mailing Thu 09/12 11:20 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Clerk's notice of fees due in the amount of $298.00 for filing fee filed by Jeremiah Vance. (RE: related document(s)12 Notice of appeal . Fee Amount $298 filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (RE: related document(s)9 Order to dismiss adversary proceeding). Appellant Designation due by 9/24/2024. (Ecker, C.) filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance) (Ecker, C.)
17 17 appeal Certificate of mailing regarding appeal Thu 09/12 1:06 PM
Certificate of mailing regarding appeal Related [+] (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of appeal . filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (RE: related document(s)9 Order to dismiss adversary proceeding). Appellant Designation due by 9/24/2024. (Ecker, C.) filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance
Att: 1 Service List
court Receipt of filing fee for notice of appeal Thu 09/12 8:55 PM
Receipt of Adversary Direct Appeal Filing Fee - $298.00 by SW. Receipt Number 3000473. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
15 15 motion Generic motion Wed 09/11 8:09 AM
Motion to amend order by Jeremiah Vance . Related [+] (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-] 9 Order dismissing case with prejudice (related document # []). Entered on 8/28/2024
14 14 motion Reconsider Wed 09/11 8:07 AM
Motion to Reconside Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-] 9 Order to dismiss adversary proceeding
13 13 court Clerk's notice of fees due Tue 09/10 4:39 PM
Clerk's notice of fees due in the amount of $298.00 for filing fee filed by Jeremiah Vance. Related [+] (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of appeal . Fee Amount $298 filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (RE: related document(s)9 Order to dismiss adversary proceeding). Appellant Designation due by 9/24/2024. (Ecker, C.) filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance
12 12 appeal Notice of appeal Tue 09/10 4:33 PM
Notice of appeal . Fee Amount $298 filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance Related [+]. Appellant Designation due by 9/24/2024. (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-] 9 Order to dismiss adversary proceeding
Friday, August 30, 2024
11 11 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 08/30 11:19 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order denying motion to continue hearing on (related document5 ) Entered on 8/28/2024.
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 08/30 11:19 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order dismissing case with prejudice (related document # []). Entered on 8/28/2024
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
9 9 order Dismiss adversary case Wed 08/28 11:31 AM
Order dismissing case with prejudice Related [+]. Entered on 8/28/2024 (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-] []
8 8 order Continue Wed 08/28 11:29 AM
Order denying motion to continue hearing on Related [+] Entered on 8/28/2024. (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, August 26, 2024
7 7 court Hearing held Tue 08/27 2:45 PM
Hearing held on 8/26/2024 re:1 Complaint by Jeremiah Vance against Jeffery Mims , MEDarc LLC , Joyce W. Lindauer, PLLC , Merlin Law Group, PA , Medical Billing Company, LLC , MCBIOM, LLC , Tonya Gilliam , William Camp Law Group , William W. Camp, PC , Medical Practice Solutions , Adrianna Villareal . (MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE DENIED. CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SUA SPONTE.) (Ferrufino, Sara)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Mon 08/26 9:06 AM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Jeffery Mims (Holmes, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
5 5 motion Continue Thu 08/22 4:35 PM
Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance of Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance (Tello, Chris)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, March 15, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of service Fri 03/15 1:24 PM
Certificate of service re: Summons and Scheduling Order Related [+]. (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-] 2 Summons issued,3 Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Fri 03/15 12:19 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 8/26/2024 at 09:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/everett. Entered on 3/15/2024 (Ellison, Traci)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jeremiah Vance
2 2 court Summons issued Fri 03/15 11:59 AM
Summons issued on Tonya Gilliam Answer Due 4/15/2024; Joyce W. Lindauer, PLLC Answer Due 4/15/2024; MCBIOM, LLC Answer Due 4/15/2024; MEDarc LLC Answer Due 4/15/2024; Medical Billing Company, LLC Answer Due 4/15/2024; Medical Practice Solutions Answer Due 4/15/2024; Merlin Law Group, PA Answer Due 4/15/2024; Jeffery Mims Answer Due 4/15/2024; Adrianna Villareal Answer Due 4/15/2024; William Camp Law Group Answer Due 4/15/2024; William W. Camp, PC Answer Due 4/15/2024 (Ellison, Traci)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 46 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/13 3:49 PM
Adversary case 24-03015 Complaint by Jeremiah Vance against Jeffery Mims , MEDarc LLC , Joyce W. Lindauer, PLLC , Merlin Law Group, PA , Medical Billing Company, LLC , MCBIOM, LLC , Tonya Gilliam , William Camp Law Group , William W. Camp, PC , Medical Practice Solutions , Adrianna Villareal . Fee Amount $350 . Nature(s) of suit: 14 Related [+]. 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud). 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny). 65 (Dischargeability - other). (Whitaker, Sheniqua) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other