T.D. Bank, N.A. v. Arnowitz et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret R Guzman |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-40041 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | JS 44 Sec. IV - no matching citation currently in database |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 5:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jerrold N. Arnowitz
22 Oak Drive
Upton, MA 01568 |
|
Defendant
Keith H Arnowitz
7 Alcott Street
Alston, MA 02134 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
1680 Capital One Drive
McLean, VA 22102 |
|
Defendant
Charles River Bank
70 Main Street
Medway, MA 02053 |
|
Defendant
Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Massachusetts Department of Revenue
100 Cambridge Street
Boston, MA 02204 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
RCAP Solutions Financial Services, Inc.
191 May Street
Worcester, MA 01602 |
|
Defendant
Sherman Acquisition Limited Partnership
P.O. Box 10369
Greenville, SC 29603 |
|
Defendant
Suffolk Construction Co., Inc.
65 Allerton Street
Boston, MA 02119 |
|
Defendant
United States of America, Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Services
1 Courthouse Way, Ste. 9200
Boston, MA 02210 |
|
Defendant
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Not In Its Individual Capacity But as Owner Trustee of SCMC 2021-JR1 Trust
Controller's Office 500 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maria Kelleghan
|
|
Plaintiff
T.D. Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Town of Upton
Terminated: 04/23/2024
Collector/Treasurer One Main Street
Upton, MA 01568 |
|
Defendant
Town of Upton Department of Public Works
Terminated: 04/23/2024
One Main Street, Box 13
Upton, MA 01568 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/26 9:54 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Keith H Arnowitz.(Blumenthal, Richard) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/25 3:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Massachusetts Department of Revenue.(Parcellin, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/23 9:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed RCAP Solutions Financial Services, Inc. served on 4/5/2024, answer due 4/26/2024. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 04/22 1:29 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Parties in Interest, Town of Upton Collector/Treasurer and Town of Upton Department of Public Works by T.D. Bank, N.A.. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 1:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. served on 4/4/2024, answer due 4/25/2024. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 1:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Keith H Arnowitz served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Mon 04/22 1:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by T.D. Bank, N.A.. United States of America, Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Services served on 4/5/2024, answer due 6/4/2024. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 1:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Massachusetts Department of Revenue served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 1:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Charles River Bank served on 4/9/2024, answer due 4/30/2024. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 1:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Town of Upton Department of Public Works served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 1:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Town of Upton served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/10 6:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by T.D. Bank, N.A.. Suffolk Construction Co., Inc. waiver sent on 3/28/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/03 1:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Not In Its Individual Capacity But as Owner Trustee of SCMC 2021-JR1 Trust.(Marchifrazier, Lucas) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/01 2:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by T.D. Bank, N.A.. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Not In Its Individual Capacity But as Owner Trustee of SCMC 2021-JR1 Trust waiver sent on 3/28/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/01 2:35 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by T.D. Bank, N.A.. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company waiver sent on 3/28/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/01 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Willis on behalf of Fidelity National Title Insurance Company (Willis, John) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet
Mon 03/18 4:22 PM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by T.D. Bank, N.A.. (Williams, Stephanie) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/14 4:51 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/14 4:50 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 03/14 4:22 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/14 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number BMADC-10317532 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by T.D. Bank, N.A..(Williams, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 |