Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-15251

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:24-ap-01063
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express National Bank
Represented By
American Express National Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Simon E. Rodriguez
Represented By
Kevin S. Neiman
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 04/23 11:46 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 24-01063 MER. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 5/7/2025. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Trial) Tue 04/22 4:53 PM
Joint Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez Related [+]. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, March 03, 2025
14 14 order File Mon 03/03 11:35 AM
Order on Status Report Related [+]. Document due by 5/2/2025 for13 , (jss)
Related: [-] 13 Status Report
Friday, February 28, 2025
13 13 misc Status Report Fri 02/28 11:59 AM
Status Report Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez Related [+]. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-] 12 Order to File
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, December 27, 2024
12 12 order File Fri 12/27 1:20 PM
Order on Status Report Related [+]. Document due by 2/27/2025. (mjb)
Related: [-] 11 Status Report
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
11 11 misc Status Report Tue 12/24 7:05 AM
Status Report Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez Related [+]. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
10 10 order Abeyance Tue 10/01 9:17 AM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion by Plaintiff to Hold Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance Related [+]. Status Report due by 12/30/2024 for9 , (jc)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Monday, September 30, 2024
9 9 motion Abeyance Mon 09/30 12:47 PM
Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, May 03, 2024
8 8 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Fri 05/03 11:39 AM
Order Regarding Discovery Schedule Pursuant To Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7016 (Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(B)) Related [+]. Discovery due by 10/31/2024 for7 , Dispositive Motion due 3/10/2025 for7 , (jss)
Related: [-] 7 7026f Report
Thursday, May 02, 2024
7 7 misc 7026 (f) Report Thu 05/02 3:42 PM
Joint F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez Related [+]. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-] 6 Order to File
Thursday, April 11, 2024
6 6 order File Thu 04/11 1:28 PM
Order Related [+]. Document due by 5/16/2024 for1 and for5 , (jss)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/10 11:00 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Paul G. Urtz on behalf of American Express National Bank Related [+]. (Urtz, Paul)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 03/13 6:06 PM
Summons Service Executed On: American Express National Bank; 3/13/24 Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 03/12 6:49 PM
Summons Issued on American Express National Bank Answer Due 04/11/2024. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Tue 03/12 6:48 PM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/12 6:48 PM
Adversary case 24-01063 Complaint by Simon E. Rodriguez against American Express National Bank. Fee to be Deferred. Adversary Status Deadline 06/10/2024 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]