Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:24-cv-00237
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 10, 2024 3:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Larry Cox
in his official capacity 200 Taylor Street 7th Floor
Fort Worth, TX 76196
Represented By
Kenneth E East
Law Office Of Kenneth E. East
contact info
Defendant
Tarrant County Sheriff's Office
200 Taylor Street 7th Floor
Fort Worth, TX 76196
Represented By
Melvin Keith Ogle
Tarrant County Criminal District Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
David Ukle
in his official capacity 200 Taylor Street 7th Floor
Fort Worth, TX 76196
Represented By
James T Jeffrey, Jr
Law Offices Of Jim Jeffrey
contact info
Plaintiff
Carolyn Rodriguez
Law Offices of CJ Grisham, PLLC 3809 S. General Bruce Dr. Suite 103-101
Temple, TX 76502
Represented By
CJ Grisham
Law Office Of Cj Grisham PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation Tue 07/02 12:59 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Tarrant County Sheriff's Office. (Ogle, Melvin)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Tue 07/02 1:29 PM
Civil Case Terminated Per Stipulation of Dismissal. (wxc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/15 3:38 PM
ORDER: the parties are ORDERED to file the appropriate settlement papersa stipulation of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) or an agreed motion with a corresponding proposed order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) (2)no later than July 12, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/15/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 05/13 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melvin Keith Ogle on behalf of Tarrant County Sheriff's Office. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ogle, Melvin)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 05/13 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth E East on behalf of Larry Cox. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (East, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Status Report Mon 05/13 9:36 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Tarrant County Sheriff's Office. (Ogle, Melvin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 04/22 1:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David Ukle. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 04/22 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James T Jeffrey, Jr on behalf of David Ukle. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jeffrey, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Returned Fri 04/19 3:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tarrant County Sheriff's Office. Waiver sent on 4/16/2024. (Grisham, CJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Returned Fri 04/19 2:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to David Ukle. Waiver sent on 4/17/2024. (Grisham, CJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
3 3 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Thu 03/14 4:06 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (bdb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 03/14 2:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carolyn Rodriguez. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Grisham, CJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/14 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Carolyn Rodriguez. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14465310) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Grisham, CJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet